Seungtae Kim v. BMW Financial Services
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 15-56801

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 11:36 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Robert F. Brennan for Appellee Seungtae Kim. [10497587] [15-56801] (Brennan, Robert) [Entered: 07/05/2017 12:21 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Ms. Julia B. Strickland for Appellant BMW Financial Services NA LLC. [10497306] [15-56801] (Strickland, Julia) [Entered: 07/05/2017 10:56 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephanie Renee Tatar for Appellee Seungtae Kim. Date of service: 06/22/2017. [10485166] [15-56801] (Brennan, Robert) [Entered: 06/22/2017 04:42 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) Appellant BMW Financial Services NA LLC Correspondence: Regarding availability for oral argument. Date of service: 03/29/2017 [10376468] [15-56801] (Strickland, Julia) [Entered: 03/29/2017 04:05 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed (ECF) Appellee Seungtae Kim Correspondence: Respondent's Counsel Robert F. Brennan is available during the week of July 10 through July 14, 2017, for oral argument in this matter.. Date of service: 03/27/2017 [10372497] [15-56801] (Brennan, Robert) [Entered: 03/27/2017 12:24 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 54 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?