- Adversary Proceeding
State Civil Lawsuit Nebraska Supreme Court, Case No. 95-04073
District Judge John C. Minahan Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 12:22 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Blue Dane Simmental Corporation, Plaintiff
No Logo Dennis Behrhorst, Plaintiff
No Logo Roland Nuss, Plaintiff
No Logo Ron Vlasin, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo American Simmental Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of R. Murray Ogborn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY R. Murray Ogborn +1 402 434 3000
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Tom Risinger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jefferson Downing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jefferson Downing +402 402 475 8230
No Logo John Caviness, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 81607

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Danene J. Tushar +402 402 438 2500
No Logo Paul Cole, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 81607

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Danene J. Tushar +402 402 438 2500
No Logo Iowa River Simmental, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven D. Burns

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven D. Burns +1 402 474 1513
No Logo John Brenni, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven D. Burns

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven D. Burns +1 402 474 1513
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/29/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order Granting [17-1] Recommendations to D.C. Report. This action is restored to the active trial docket of the District Court. The parties shall confer and report to the D. Court in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 26[f] within 30 days of this date. ; CM. [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 10/29/1996)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Report and Recommendations to the District Court RE: [14-2] Motion To Remand to District Court by American Simmental Association. Donald Cole has been dismissed as a party-defendant to this action without prejudice by separate order [#16]. The Bankruptcy Court recommends that this adversary proceeding be withdrawn to the US District Court to proceed respecting the remaining parties; cm [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 08/16/1996)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Journal Entry Granting [14-1] Motion To Dismiss, Donald Cole by American Simmental Association. IT IS THEREFORE, ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss Donald Cole as a party-defendant is sustained without prejudice. ; CM. [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 08/16/1996)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice/Crt. of Svc. pursuant to Neb. R. Bankr. P. 9014 filed by Defendant American Simmental Association RE: [14-2] Motion To Remand to District Court by American Simmental Association, [14-1] Motion To Dismiss, Donald Cole by American Simmental Association . Objections due: 08/01/96 [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 07/09/1996)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Motion By Defendant American Simmental Association To Dismiss, Donald Cole , and To Remand to District Court [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 07/09/1996)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Journal Entry Deferring [12-2] Motion Remand To District Court by American Simmental Association, Deferring [12-1] Motion To Dismiss Donald Cole by American Simmental Association. The Motions [#12] shall proceed under 9014 Ntc. with 21 days to object. If no objections are filed the Motion [#12] will be granted ; CM. [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 04/19/1996)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Motion By Defendant American Simmental Association To Dismiss Donald Cole , and to Remand To District Court ; j [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 03/29/1996)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Notice of Non Compliance with Neb. R. Bankr. P. RE: [10-1] Motion For Remand To The District Court by Dennis Behrhorst, Ron Vlasin, Roland Nuss, Blue Dane Simmental Corporation ; cm. [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 02/21/1996)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Motion by Plaintiff Blue Dane Simmental Corporation, Plaintiff Roland Nuss, Plaintiff Ron Vlasin, and Plaintiff Dennis Behrhorst For Remand To The District Court ; j [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 02/21/1996)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Journal Entry Granting [8-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Answer To Counterclaim Until 12/15/95 by Iowa River Simmental, John Brenni ; CM. [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 11/15/1995)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Motion By Cross-Defendant John Brenni, Cross-Defendant Iowa River Simmental To Extend Time To File Answer To Counterclaim Until 12/15/95 ; j [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 11/09/1995)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Status Report filed by Defendant American Simmental Association RE: [2-1] Order ;j [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 11/07/1995)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Motion by Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants, except Donald Cole To Revise And Establish A Progression Order ; j [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 11/06/1995)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Motion by Defendant Tom Risinger To Withdraw Adversary Complaint From the US Bankruptcy Court and Refer Adversary Complaint Back To the US District Court ; j [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 10/19/1995)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Motion By Counter-Defendant Paul Cole To Extend Time To Answer or Respond to Counterclaim of Defendant American Simmental Association - asking for additional 23 days until 10/13/95 ;j [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 09/20/1995)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Motion By Counter-Defendant John Caviness To Extend Time To Answer or Respond to CounterClaim of American Simmental Association - asking for additional 30 days ; j [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 09/20/1995)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Order RE: [1-1] Complaint NOS 459 Application For Removal. This adversary proceeding was transferred from the District Court. Each party is ordered to file a status report by 11/06/95. See Order For Specific Details. ; CM. [Previous,Employee] (Entered: 09/20/1995)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Case as Transfered from District Court of Nebraska Complaint [95-4073] Blue Dane Simmental Corporation vs. American Simmental Association . NOS 459 Application For Removal . [Thoman,Jan] (Entered: 09/18/1995)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?