Lesnik v. Eisenmann SE
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-01120-LHK
District Judge Lucy H. Koh, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 19, 2021 at 10:34 PM DT (6.2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gregor Lesnik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo Stjepan Papes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie Lea Proctor +1 415 436 6730 +1 415 436 7169 Melanie.Proctor@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly Friday +1 202 305 4207 +1 415 436 6748 kimberly.i.friday@usdoj.gov
v.
Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bayerische Motoren Werke"
No Logo BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathaniel P. Bruhn +1 617 951 8651 nathaniel.bruhn@morganlewis.com
Space Aleksandr Markelov +1 650 843 7204 +1 650 843 4001 aleksandr.markelov@morganlewis.com
Space Daniel Scott Savrin +1 617 951 8674 +1 617 341 7701 daniel.savrin@morganlewis.com
Space Colin West +1 415 393 2000 colin.west@morganlewis.com
No Logo CiTic Dicastal Co., Ltd., Defendant
No Logo D2N Technologije d.o.o., Defendant
Daimler AG Daimler AG, Defendant
No Logo Dicastal North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Bass Scheiner +1 650 849 5371 nscheiner@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kaitlyn M. Murphy +1 510 874 1108 +1 510 874 1460 kmurphy@bsfllp.com
Space Quyen Le Ta +1 510 874 1000 +1 510 874 1460 qta@bsfllp.com
No Logo Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kaitlyn M. Murphy +1 510 874 1108 +1 510 874 1460 kmurphy@bsfllp.com
Space Quyen Le Ta +1 510 874 1000 +1 510 874 1460 qta@bsfllp.com
No Logo Eisenmann Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kaitlyn M. Murphy +1 510 874 1108 +1 510 874 1460 kmurphy@bsfllp.com
Space Quyen Le Ta +1 510 874 1000 +1 510 874 1460 qta@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Frost Brown Todd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron M. Bernay +1 513 651 6800 +1 513 651 6981 abernay@fbtlaw.com
Space Catherine Frost Burgett +1 614 464 1211 +1 614 464 1737 cburgett@fbtlaw.com
Space Kevin M Tierney +1 513 651 6859 +1 513 651 6981 ktierney@fbtlaw.com
No Logo Eisenmann Se, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kaitlyn M. Murphy +1 510 874 1108 +1 510 874 1460 kmurphy@bsfllp.com
Space Quyen Le Ta +1 510 874 1000 +1 510 874 1460 qta@bsfllp.com
No Logo Enterprise MDM Poland Sp. z.o.o., Defendant
No Logo Gregurec Ltd,, Defendant
No Logo HRD Mont d.o.o., Defendant
No Logo ISM Vuzem d.o.o., Defendant
No Logo ISM Vuzem USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ivan Vuzem, Defendant
No Logo John Deere, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr. +1 415 442 1000 +1 415 442 1001 michael.eagan@morganlewis.com
Space Tera Marie Heintz +1 415 442 1000 +1 415 442 1001 theintz@morganlewis.com
No Logo Keystone Automotive, Defendant
No Logo Lax Fabricating Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Regina A Petty +1 858 597 9600 +1 858 597 9601 rpetty@laborlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fisher & Phillips LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bailey Bifoss +1 415 490 9000 +1 415 490 9001 bbifoss@fisherphillips.com
No Logo LB Metal d.o.o., Defendant
No Logo Magma Services Gmbh, Defendant
No Logo Magma, d.o.o., Defendant
No Logo Magma, Intl, Defendant
No Logo MDM Polska sp. z.o.o., Defendant
Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc. Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEREMY S. BYRUM +1 804 775 4305 +1 202 857 1737 jbyrum@mcguirewoods.com
Space Nicholas James Giles +1 804 775 4760 +1 804 698 2040 ngiles@mcguirewoods.com
Space Sylvia Jihae Kim +1 310 315 8200 +1 310 315 8210 skim@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Moss Servis, d.o.o., Defendant
No Logo Phoenix Mechanical, Defendant
No Logo Primiko d.o.o., Defendant
No Logo Rehau Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Rehau Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEREMY S. BYRUM +1 804 775 4305 +1 202 857 1737 jbyrum@mcguirewoods.com
Space Nicholas James Giles +1 804 775 4760 +1 804 698 2040 ngiles@mcguirewoods.com
Space Sylvia Jihae Kim +1 310 315 8200 +1 310 315 8210 skim@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo RIMSA Plus Sp. z.o.o., Defendant
No Logo Robert Vuzem, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Telsa Motors, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Hueston Henningan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Padraic William Foran +1 213 788 4340 +1 888 775 0898 pforan@hueston.com
Space John C Hueston +1 949 229 8640 +1 888 775 0898 jhueston@hueston.com
Volkswagen AG Volkswagen AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Volkswagen"
Officer/Director, Volkswagen Truck & Bus GmbH

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Eiselstein +1 423 785 8352 +1 423 321 1517 kyle.eiselstein@millermartin.com
Space Charles Bruce Lee +1 423 785 8214 +1 423 321 1541 chuck.lee@millermartin.com
Space Jessica Malloy-Thorpe +1 423 756 6600 jessica.malloy-thorpe@millermartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jesse L Miller +1 415 543 8700 +1 415 391 8269 jessemiller@reedsmith.com
Space James Mark Neudecker +1 510 763 2000 +1 510 273 8832 jneudecker@reedsmith.com
No Logo Volvo Car Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Vuzem USA, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo VV Mont, Defendant
No Logo We-Kr d.o.o., Defendant
Office San Jose
Filed 3/7/2016
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 375 - Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729 False Claims Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ADRMOP
  Entries (616) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 10/19/2021, Entered: None Appendix
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 10/19/2021, Entered: None Default Judgment - by the Court
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Case Management Statement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 9/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Brief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Brief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Brief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 575 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 574 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 4/11/2021, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 4/11/2021, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 4/11/2021, Entered: None Default Judgment - by the Court
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Default Judgment - by the Court
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Default Judgment - by the Court
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Set Aside Default
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Enforce Judgment
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Set Aside Default
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Default Judgment - by the Court
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Default Judgment - by the Court
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Default Judgment - by the Court
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Motion for Default Judgment - by the CourtCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Class Wage and Hour Claims filed by Stjepan Papes. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/8/2020. Replies due by 5/15/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Katherine Fiester, # (2) Declaration of William C. Dresser, # (3) Proposed Order)(Pyle, Hunter) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event. Re:[488] MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Stjepan Papes (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                      ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment on Class Wage and Hour Claims filed by Stjepan Papes. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Katherine Fiester, # (2) Declaration of William C. Dresser, # (3) Proposed Order)(Pyle, Hunter) (Filed on 4/23/2020) Modified text on 4/24/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 487 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 motion to certify classCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Class filed by Stjepan Papes. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/7/2020. Replies due by 5/14/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Hunter Pyle, # (2) Declaration of William C. Dresser, # (3) Declaration of Radmilo Bozinovic, # (4) Proposed Order)(Pyle, Hunter) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter Pyle (Pyle, Hunter) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 485 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying as Moot [422] Motion to Quash in light of ECF No. [484] Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting [483] Stipulation of Dismissal as to Eisenmann Defendants and Tesla Defendants. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/6/2020. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims against Specified Defendants by Gregor Lesnik (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Quyen L. Ta in Support of [472] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents designated by Defendants as Confidential filed byEisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Mark West, # (2) Proposed Order)(Related document(s)[472]) (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik re [468] MOTION for Default Judgment on Causes of Action 9 and 10:individual trafficking claims under federal and California state law - Amended Proof of Service (Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stjepan Papes re [470] Plaintiff Stjepan Papes' MOTION as an Individual for Default Judgment on Causes of Action 2 and 3: FLSA wages claims and on Causes of Action 4 through 8: California wages claims - Amended Proof of Service (Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik re [461] MOTION for Default Judgment on Cause of Action 1: False Claims Act - Amended Proof of Service (Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 478 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  **AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING HEARING DATES** Hearing on [468] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) for coerced labor claims, causes of action 9 and 10, and [470] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on Wages claims, by Papes individually are SET for 7/9/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 477 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING HEARING DATES** Hearing on [461] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on C-A 1 - FCA is SET for 7/2/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 476 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE ECF NO. 478** **CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING HEARING DATES** Hearing on [468] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) for coerced labor claims, causes of action 9 and 10, and [470] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on Wages claims, by Papes individually are SET for 7/9/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) Modified on 3/3/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/3/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***Corrected hearing time on [468] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) for coerced labor claims, causes of action 9 and 10 and [470] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on Wages claims, by Papes individually. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:[461] MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by Gregor Lesnik (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***Corrected hearing time on [461] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on C-A 1 - FCA. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik re [470] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on Wages claims, by Papes individually (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik re [468] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) for coerced labor claims, causes of action 9 and 10 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik re [461] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on C-A 1 - FCA (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents designated by Defendants as Confidential filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Unredacted proposed Suppl Decl with Documents)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [470] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on Wages claims, by Papes individually by Stjepan Papes. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Motion for Default Judgment - by the CourtCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff Stjepan Papes' MOTION as an Individual for Default Judgment on Causes of Action 2 and 3: FLSA wages claims and on Causes of Action 4 through 8: California wages claims filed by Gregor Lesnik. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 3/16/2020. Replies due by 3/23/2020. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re [468] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) for coerced labor claims, causes of action 9 and 10 by Gregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Motion for Default Judgment - by the CourtCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Default Judgment on Causes of Action 9 and 10:individual trafficking claims under federal and California state law filed by Gregor Lesnik. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 3/16/2020. Replies due by 3/23/2020. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re [461] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on C-A 1 - FCA by Gregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of William Dresser in Support of [461] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on C-A 1 - FCA filed byGregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Part 2, # (2) Declaration Part 3)(Related document(s)[461]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Jack "Jay" Palmer in Support of [461] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on C-A 1 - FCA filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[461]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Danijel Travancic in Support of [461] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on C-A 1 - FCA filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[461]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Gregor Lesnik in Support of [461] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on C-A 1 - FCA filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[461]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration in Support of [461] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on C-A 1 - FCA Decl of Papes filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[461]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Motion for Default Judgment - by the CourtCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Default Judgment on Cause of Action 1: False Claims Act filed by Gregor Lesnik. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 3/13/2020. Replies due by 3/20/2020. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/28/2020) Modified on 3/3/2020 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Continuing Further Case Management Conference; Denying as Moot [459] Motion to Appear by Telephone. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings per [460] Order: Further Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 3/4/2020 to 5/20/2020 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020, Terminated: 2/27/2020 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear by Telephone REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DEFENDANT EISENMANN CORPORATIONS COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT MARCH 4, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Amending Schedule For Filing Motions for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/19/2020. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement re [451] Order Plaintiffs Statement Regarding Motions for Default Judgment by Gregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Re: Motions for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 02/11/2020. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 454 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting (as modified by the Court) [453] Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/3/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020, Terminated: 2/3/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order for Litigation Involving Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and Trade Secrets filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Redline with Changes Made to Model Protective Order for Litigation Involving Highly Sensitive Confidential Information)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 452 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Settlement Conference Report by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 451 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Re: Motions for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 01/21/2020. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 450 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Settlement Conference held on 1/17/2020. Plaintiffs Lesnik and Papes and defendants Tesla and the Eisenmann entities have settled the claims and counterclaims between them. FTR Time: 7:24-7:30. Plaintiff Attorney: William Dresser. Also present: Gregor Lesnik and Stjepan Papes.Defendant Attorney: Padraic Foran; Quyen Ta, Alexander Holtzman, Aaron Bernay. Also present: Shannon Barnes; Alexis Bettis. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to LB METAL D.O.O. (Dkt. 388). (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to D2N TEHNOLOGIJE D.O.O. (Dkt. 387). (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ROBERT VUZEM (Dkt. 386). (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to IVAN VUZEM (Dkt. 385). (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ISM VUZEM, D.O.O. (Dkt. 384). (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to HRID-MONT, D.O.O. (Dkt. 383). (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MAGNA, D.O.O (Dkt. 382). (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: 12/27/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/30/2019 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Gregor Lesnik, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-30-19, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [436] Transcript Order, [417] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2020. (Related documents(s) [436], [417]) (las, ) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re [422] MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process of Third Amended Complaint ) filed byEisenmann SE, Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 5, # (2) Exhibit 6)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 439 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A Settlement Conference is hereby set for January 17, 2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. A Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference call with counsel only is set for January 14, 2020 3:00 PM. The parties shall comply with Judge DeMarchi's Standing Order re Settlement Conference Procedures at http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkdorders, which includes instructions and deadlines for the submission of Settlement Conference Statements and Confidential Settlement Letters in advance of the conference.Conference Call information for the January 14, 2020 call will be emailed to counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim by Tesla, Inc. byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Counterclaim by Eisenmann Corporation byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/30/2019 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Eisenmann Corporation, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: 11/14/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [422] MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process of Third Amended Complaint ) Declaration in Opposition to Renewed Motion to Quash filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: 11/14/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [422] MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process of Third Amended Complaint ) filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to WE-KR D.O.O. (Related documents(s) [428])(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MOS SERVIS, D.O.O. (Related documents(s) [427])(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ISM VUZEM USA,INC. (Related documents(s) [426])(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to VUZEM USA, INC. (Related documents(s) [425])(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 429 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement re [415] Order List of Defendants and Claims by Gregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019, Terminated: 11/7/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Entry of Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant We-Kr d.o.o. filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of William C. Dresser inSupport of Request to Clerk to EnterDefault on the Third Amended Complaintagainst Defendant We-Kr d.o.o.)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019, Terminated: 11/7/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Entry of Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant Mos Servis, d.o.o. filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of William C. Dresser in Support of Request to Clerk to Enter Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant Mos Servis, d.o.o.)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019, Terminated: 11/7/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Entry of Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant ISM Vuzem USA, Inc. filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of William C. Dresser in Support of Request to Clerk to Enter Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant ISM Vuzem USA, Inc.)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019, Terminated: 11/7/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Entry of Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant Vuzem USA, Inc. filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of William C. Dresser in Support of Request to Clerk to Enter Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant Vuzem USA, Inc.)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 424 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Setting a Settlement Conference Scheduling Telephone Call. Telephone call set for 11/19/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Dial in information for this call will be emailed to counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. MOS Servis d.o.o. by post - FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 422 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019, Terminated: 3/6/2020 motion to quashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process of Third Amended Complaint filed by Eisenmann SE, Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 11/14/2019. Replies due by 11/21/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Proposed Order)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Justin Holtzman Notice of Special Appearance of Alexander J. Holtzman (Holtzman, Alexander) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Keystone Automotive and Phoenix Mechanical by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Magna International, Inc., and Magna Automotive Services GmbH by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Settlement. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Settlement. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 418 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/30/2019 from 2:02 PM - 2:57 PM (55 minutes). [415] Case Management Order memorializes all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Total Time in Court: 55 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Counsel for Gregor Lesnick and Stjepan Papes: William Dresser. Counsel for Eisenmann Corporation and Eisenmann SE: Quyen Le Ta, Aaron Bernay, Alexander Holtzman. Counsel for Defendant Tesla: Lauren Johnson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/30/2019 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Eisenmann Corporation, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Padraic William Foran ON BEHALF OF LAUREN MCGRORY JOHNSON (Foran, Padraic) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 30, 2019. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 413 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying [411] Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik re [411] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re [409] Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019, Terminated: 9/30/2019 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re [409] Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 9/27/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A- proposed Motion, # (3) Exhibit B - proposed Declaration, # (4) Proposed Order On Administrative Motion)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/17/2019 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Gregor Lesnik, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying [406] Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Extend Time to File Proof of Service; Dismissing Unserved Defendants without Prejudice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Nelson Tucker in Support of [406] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re [405] Order, [404] Brief - TO EXTEND TIME TO SEPTEMBER 30, 2019 filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[406]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of [406] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re [405] Order, [404] Brief - TO EXTEND TIME TO SEPTEMBER 30, 2019 filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[406]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 9/2/2019, Entered: 9/2/2019, Terminated: 9/10/2019 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re [405] Order, [404] Brief - TO EXTEND TIME TO SEPTEMBER 30, 2019 filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 9/6/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 9/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Setting Deadline for Service of Process. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/22/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 8/16/2019, Entered: 8/16/2019 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief re [403] Order, Identifying Remaining Defendants and Status of Service filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[403]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reset Deadlines/Hearings pursuant to ECF No. [403]:Further Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 8/7/2019 to 10/30/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2019. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Identify the Remaining Defendants and to Clarify the Status of Service of Process on the Remaining Defendants; and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/1/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting [401] Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel is directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019, Terminated: 8/1/2019 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear by Telephone REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DEFENDANT EISENMANN CORPORATIONS COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT AUGUST 7, 2019 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michelle Lo (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Alexander Justin Holtzman (Holtzman, Alexander) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-17-19, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [396] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2019. (Related documents(s) [396]) (las, ) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/17/2019 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Eisenmann Corporation, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Tesla, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Third), COUNTERCLAIM for Breach of Contract against Gregor Lesnik byTelsa Motors, Inc.. (Foran, Padraic) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/17/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 392 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on April 17, 2019 from 2:01 PM - 2:37 PM (36 minutes). [394] Case Management Order memorializes all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Further Case Management Conference SET for 8/7/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Total Time in Court: 36 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: William Dresser. Special appearance by Peter Koenig. Defendant Attorney: Quyen Ta and Aaron Bernay for Eisenmann Corporation; Padriac Foran for Tesla Motors, Inc. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/17/2019 (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/17/2019 (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 391 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying as Moot [343] Motion to Quash Purported Service of Process of Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to [394] Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/17/2019 (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/17/2019 (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 390 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Order on Motion to Set Aside DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting [344] Motion to Set Aside Default Pursuant to [394] Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/17/2019 (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/17/2019 (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Entry of Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant LB Metal, d.o.o. filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Supporting Entry of Default)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Entry of Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant D2N Tehnologije d.o.o. filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Supporting Entry of Default)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Entry of Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant Robert Vuzem filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration Supporting Entry of Default)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Entry of Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant Ivan Vuzem filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration Supporting Entry of Default)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Entry of Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant ISM Vuzem, d.o.o. filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration Supporting Entry of Default)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Entry of Default on the Third Amended Complaint against Defendant Magna, d.o.o. filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration in Support of Entry of Default)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Entry of Default against Magna, d.o.o. filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration Supporting Entry of Default)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. HRD Mont d.o.o. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (2) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Eisenmann Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Gregor Lesnik byEisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bernay, Aaron) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 379 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying [378] Administrative Motion.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 378 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019, Terminated: 4/11/2019 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration re [361] Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit proposed Motion for Reconsideration, # (2) Exhibit proposed Request for Judicial Notice, # (3) Proposed Order proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting [375] Revised Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/3/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Revised Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Bernay, Aaron) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 374 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: 4/2/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Denying Stipulation [373] to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/2/19. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. ISM Vuzem d.o.o. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (2) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Robert Vuzem served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (2) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Magna, d.o.o. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (2) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Ivan Vuzem served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (2) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. LB Metal d.o.o. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (2) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Robert Vuzem served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service English translation, # (2) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (3) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. D2N Technologije d.o.o. served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service English translation, # (2) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (3) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. LB Metal d.o.o. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service English translation, # (2) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (3) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. HRD Mont d.o.o. served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service Translated from Slovenian to English, # (2) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (3) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. ISM Vuzem d.o.o. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service Translated from Slovenian to English, # (2) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (3) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Moss Servis, d.o.o. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. FRCP Rule 4(f)(2)(A); Zakon o pravdnem postopku clen 132 to 150 (Contentious Civil Procedure Act, articles 132 to 150 ZPP) (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service Translation from Slovenian to English, # (2) Supplement Slovenian Statute For Service, # (3) Supplement English Translation Statute For Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 361 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: 3/20/2019 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part [300] Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. ISM Vuzem USA, Inc. served on 2/9/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. Proof of Service by Certified Mail Receipt on ISM Vuzem USA, Inc. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Vuzem USA, Inc., served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Record of Service of Process on Vuzem USA, iNC. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 358 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **CLERK'S NOTICE** VACATING hearing set for 3/14/19 on [300] Motion to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Matter to be determined on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: 3/5/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Eisenmann Corporation Notice of Withdrawal of Kaitlyn Murphy as Counsel for Defendant Eisenmann Corporation (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: 3/5/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Justin Holtzman (Holtzman, Alexander) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. We-Kr d.o.o. served on 2/18/2018, answer due 3/11/2018. Proof of Service on We-Kr d.o.o. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support of ( [344] Specially Appearing Defendants' MOTION to Set Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default ) filed by Eisenmann SE, Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 2/21/2019) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of ( [343] MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process of Third Amended Complaint ) filed by Eisenmann SE, Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 2/21/2019) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [344] MOTION to Set Aside Default Specially Appearing Defendants' Motion to Set Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default ) filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [343] MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process of Third Amended Complaint ) filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of William C Dresser in Opposition to [344] MOTION to Set Aside Default Specially Appearing Defendants' Motion to Set Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default, [343] MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process of Third Amended Complaint filed byGregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits to Opposition)(Related document(s)[344], [343]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 349 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement re [300] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint Statement of Interest by United States of America. (Friday, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting [346] Administrative Motion.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting [345] Administrative Motion.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/2/2019, Entered: 2/2/2019, Terminated: 2/5/2019 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to serve on Secretary of State re [269] Amended Complaint, [271] Summons Issued,,, on Vuzem USA, Inc. filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 2/6/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/2/2019, Entered: 2/2/2019, Terminated: 2/5/2019 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to serve by certified mail re [269] Amended Complaint, [271] Summons Issued,,, on ISM Vuzem USA, Inc. filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 2/6/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 2/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion to Set Aside DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Specially Appearing Defendants' MOTION to Set Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Eisenmann SE, Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/14/2019. Replies due by 2/21/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 1/31/2019) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 motion to quashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process of Third Amended Complaint filed by Eisenmann SE, Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/14/2019. Replies due by 2/21/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of B. Hickman, # (2) Declaration of O. Seiler, # (3) Declaration of M. West, # (4) Proposed Order)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re [300] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint ) filed byEisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GREGUREC, LTD (Related documents(s) [333])(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EISENMANN ANLAGENBAU VERWALTUNG GMBH (Related documents(s) [331])(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EISENMANN ANLAGENBAU GMBH & CO. KG (Related documents(s) [329])(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EISENMANN SE (Related documents(s) [327])(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 337 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The 1/9/2019 Case Management Conference is continued to 4/17/2019 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019, Terminated: 1/4/2019 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear by Telephone REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DEFENDANT EISENMANN CORPORATIONS COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT JANUARY 9, 2019 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of [333] MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Gregurec Ltd filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[333]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018, Terminated: 1/4/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Gregurec Ltd filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of [331] MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Eisenmann Anlagenbau Verwaltung GmbH filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[331]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018, Terminated: 1/4/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Eisenmann Anlagenbau Verwaltung GmbH filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration in Support of [329] MOTION for Entry of Default against Eisenmann Anlagenbau GmbH & Co. KG filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[329]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018, Terminated: 1/4/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Entry of Default against Eisenmann Anlagenbau GmbH & Co. KG filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of William Dresser in Support of [327] MOTION for Entry of Default against Eisenmann SE filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[327]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018, Terminated: 1/4/2019 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Entry of Default against Eisenmann SE filed by Gregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting [323] Administrative Motion.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [323] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re [269] Amended Complaint to amend heading to First Cause of Action ) Eisenmann Corporation and Tesla Motors, Inc.'s Statement of Non-Opposition filed byEisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [300] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint ) filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018, Terminated: 12/21/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re [269] Amended Complaint to amend heading to First Cause of Action filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 12/24/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Rehau by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of LaX by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Deere & Company by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Volvo by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of VW by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of BMW by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Mercedes by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Dicastal by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by United States of America re [304] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Notice of Consent to Dismissal Without Prejudice (Friday, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice class claims of 12th CA _ California Anti-trafficking by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice class claims - 11th CA - TVPRA by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice class claims against specified defendants - 8th CA - Cal wages - Waiting Time by Stjepan Papes (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice class claims against specified defendants - 7th CA - Cal wages - Statements by Stjepan Papes (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice class claims against specified defendants - 6th CA - Cal wages - rest periods by Stjepan Papes (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice class claims against specified defendants - 5th CA - Cal wages - OT by Stjepan Papes (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice class claims against specified defendants - 4th CA - Cal wages by Stjepan Papes (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice class claims of 3d CA - FLSA Overtime by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 305 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice class claims of 2d CA - FLSA by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice against Specified Defts First CA - FCA by Gregor Lesnik (Dresser, William) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying as Moot [233] Motion to Quash.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Volvo Car Corporation, Volvo Car US Operations, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zhejiang Geely Holding Group Co. Ltd. for Volvo Car Corporation, Volvo Car US Operations, Inc.. (Zirogiannis, Lewis) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [300] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018, Terminated: 3/20/2019 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Eisenmann Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 12/19/2018. Replies due by 1/7/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Volvo Car Corporation, Volvo Car US Operations, Inc. (Zirogiannis, Lewis) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Gregurec Ltd, served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying [296] Stipulation.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018, Terminated: 11/27/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Extension of Time for Deft Volvo Car Corp. and Volvo Car US Operations Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Volvo Car Corporation, Volvo Car US Operations, Inc.. (Zirogiannis, Lewis) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Del Proc title 10, ch 31, sec 3111 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Del Proc title 10, ch 31, sec 3111 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann SE served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Del Proc title 10, ch 31, sec 3111 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Volvo Car Corporation served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. Delaware Courts and Judicial Procedure, title 10, chapter 31, section 3111 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Ill CCP 2-204 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Ill CCP 2-204 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann SE served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Ill CCP 2-204 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann SE served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Calif Corp Code 416.10 & Corp Code 2110 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Calif Corp Code 416.10 & Corp Code 2110 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis Zirogiannis as Counsel for Defendant Volvo Car Corp. and Volvo Car US Operations, Inc. (Zirogiannis, Lewis) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event Summons Returned Executed. Re:[278] Certificate of Service filed by Gregor Lesnik, [283] Certificate of Service filed by Gregor Lesnik, [281] Certificate of Service filed by Gregor Lesnik, [277] Certificate of Service filed by Gregor Lesnik, [275] Certificate of Service filed by Gregor Lesnik, [284] Certificate of Service filed by Gregor Lesnik, [279] Certificate of Service filed by Gregor Lesnik, [282] Certificate of Service filed by Gregor Lesnik, [280] Certificate of Service filed by Gregor Lesnik, [276] Certificate of Service filed by Gregor Lesnik (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik Volvo Car US Operations Inc. Delaware Courts and Judicial Procedure, title 10, chapter 31, section 3111 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik Eisenmann Anlagenbau Verwaltung GmbH Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Del Proc title 10, ch 31, sec 3111 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik Eisenmann Anlagenbau GmbH & Co. KG Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Del Proc title 10, ch 31, sec 3111 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik Eisenmann SE Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Del Proc title 10, ch 31, sec 3111 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik Eisenmann Anlagenbau Verwaltung GmbH Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Ill CCP 2-204 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik Eisenmann Anlagenbau GmbH & Co. KG Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Ill CCP 2-204 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik Eisenmann SE Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110; Ill CCP 2-204 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik Eisenmann SE Calif CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik Eisenmann_AnlagGmbH Calif Corp Code 416.10 & Corp Code 2110 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik re [269] Amended Complaint Eisenmann_Anlag_Verwaltung_GmbH CCP 416.10 & Corp Code 2110 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Page Limits of a Consolidated Motion to Dismiss by Judge Lucy H. Koh, and finding as moot [272] Administrative Motion.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [272] Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO PERMIT THE FILING OF ONE CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE, EXCEED PAGE LIMITS IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONSOLIDATED MOTION, AND ALTER TIME LIMITS TO ALLOW FOR ONE CONSOLIDA ) filed byGregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018, Terminated: 11/12/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO PERMIT THE FILING OF ONE CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE, EXCEED PAGE LIMITS IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONSOLIDATED MOTION, AND ALTER TIME LIMITS TO ALLOW FOR ONE CONSOLIDATED MOTION, RESPONSE, AND REPLY re [269] Amended Complaint filed by Eisenmann Corporation. Responses due by 11/9/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kaitlyn M. Murphy, # (2) Proposed Order)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, D2N Technologije d.o.o., Daimler AG,, Deere & Company, Dicastal North America, Inc., Eisenmann Corporation, Eisenmann SE, Enterprise MDM Poland Sp. z.o.o., Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Gregurec Ltd,, HRID-MONT d.o.o., ISM Vuzem USA, Inc., ISM Vuzem d.o.o., Keystone Automotive, LB Metal d.o.o., Lax Fabricating Ltd., MDM Poland Sp. z.o.o., MDM Polska sp. z.o.o., Magna, d.o.o., Magna Automotive Services GmbH, Magna International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc., Moss Servis, d.o.o., Phoenix Mechanical, Primiko d.o.o., RIMSA Plus Sp. z.o.o., Rehau Incorporated, Telsa Motors, Inc., VV Mont, d.o.o., Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH, Volkswagen, Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga Operations, LLC, Volvo Car Corporation, Volvo Car US Operations, Inc., Ivan Vuzem, Robert Vuzem, Vuzem USA, Inc.,, We-Kr d.o.o.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Summons. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 269 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended against All Defendants. Filed byGregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying [266] Stipulation.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [265] Administrative Motion.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018, Terminated: 10/29/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [255] Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of William Dresser, # (2) Declaration of Kaitlyn Murphy, # (3) Proposed Order)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/21/2018, Entered: 10/21/2018, Terminated: 10/29/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re [255] Order on Motion to Dismiss to add Volvo Car US Operations Inc filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 10/25/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 10/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 264 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING DATE*** The previously scheduled Motion to Quash [233] is hereby ADVANCED to 12/13/2018 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 263 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 10/17/2018 Further Case Management Conference is HEREBY CONTINUED to 1/09/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [260] Jeremy S. Byrum's Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018, Terminated: 10/10/2018 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear by Telephone at October 17, 2018 Case Management Conference filed by Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc., Rehau Incorporated. (Byrum, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [258] Deere & Company's Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 10/9/2018 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear by Telephone REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DEFENDANT DEERE & COMPANY'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT OCTOBER 17, 2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by John Deere. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [256] Bailey K. Bifoss' Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance.(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 10/9/2018 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Lax Fabricating Ltd. OF REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT OCTOBER 17, 2018 CMC (Bifoss, Bailey) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/9/2018 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:[256] NOTICE filed by Lax Fabricating Ltd. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 255 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part [219] Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 254 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh DENYING [218] and [242] Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 253 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 9/26/2018 Further CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 10/17/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 251 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Consolidated Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. [219]) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously noticed for 9/13/18 at 1:30 PM has been taken under submission without oral argument. The 9/13/18 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 250 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING DATE*** The previously scheduled Motion to Quash [233] is hereby ADVANCED to 1/3/2019 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [242] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Moving Defendants' Reply in Support of Omnibus Motion to Dismiss ) Memorandum filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [242] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Moving Defendants' Reply in Support of Omnibus Motion to Dismiss ) Declaration filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to re [240] Opposition/Response to Motion Plaintiffs' and Relators' Request for Judicial Notice by Eisenmann SE, Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re [233] MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process ) filed byEisenmann SE, Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eisenmann Corporation re [242] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Moving Defendants' Reply in Support of Omnibus Motion to Dismiss (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to re [234] Opposition/Response to Motion, Plaintiffs' Further Request for Judicial Notice by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re [219] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs' Second Amended Complaint ) filed byEisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kaitlyn M. Murphy)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018, Terminated: 10/1/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Moving Defendants' Reply in Support of Omnibus Motion to Dismiss filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kaitlyn M. Murphy, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Reply Brief in Support of Omnibus Motion to Dismiss, # (4) Unredacted Version of Reply Brief in Support of Omnibus Motion to Dismiss, # (5) Redacted Version of Declaration in Support of Reply Brief, # (6) Unredacted Version of Declaration in Support of Reply Brief)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [233] MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process ) Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byStjepan Papes. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [233] MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process ) Request for Judicial Notice filed byStjepan Papes. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [233] MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process ) Declaration of William C. Dresser in Opposition to Specially Appearing Defendants Eisenmann SE, Eisenmann Anlagenbau Verwaltung GmbH, and Eisenmann Anlagenbau GmbH & Co. KGs Motion to Quash Purported Service of Process filed byStjepan Papes. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [219] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs' Second Amended Complaint ) Memorandum filed byStjepan Papes. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [219] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs' Second Amended Complaint ) Dresser Declaration filed byStjepan Papes. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [219] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs' Second Amended Complaint ) Gregor Lesnik Decl filed byStjepan Papes. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [219] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs' Second Amended Complaint ) Declaration filed byStjepan Papes. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [219] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs' Second Amended Complaint ) Further Request for Judicial Notice filed byStjepan Papes. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018, Terminated: 12/4/2018 motion to quashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process filed by Eisenmann SE, Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG, Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/17/2018. Replies due by 8/24/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of B. Hickman, # (2) Declaration of H. Salow, # (3) Declaration of O. Seiler, # (4) Proposed Order)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG identifying Corporate Parent Eisenmann SE for Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH identifying Corporate Parent Eisenmann SE for Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Eisenmann SE identifying Corporate Parent Grubenhaus AG for Eisenmann SE. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Quyen Le Ta Notice of Special Appearance of Quyen L. Ta (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [223] Administrative Motion to Substitute.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [222] Administrative Motion to Substitute.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik re [37] Document E-Filed Under Seal on ISM Vuzem USA, Inc (Dresser, William) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [218] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss ) filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 224 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to [219] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Reason: Correcting an error) filed byEisenmann Corporation. Responses due by 8/9/2018. Replies due by 8/23/2018. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 7/26/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re [37] Document E-Filed Under Seal to amend complaint to true name of LB Metal d.o.o. filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 7/16/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 7/26/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to amend complaint to state true name re [37] Document E-Filed Under Seal of Mos Servis d.o.o. filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 7/16/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bayerische Motoren Werke for BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC. DEFENDANT BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLCS (Markelov, Aleksandr) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eisenmann Corporation re [218] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 10/1/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Eisenmann Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/26/2018. Replies due by 8/2/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Proposed Order)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 10/1/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Moving Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kaitlyn M. Murphy, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs Second Amended Complaint, # (4) Unredacted Version of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs Second Amended Complaint, # (5) Redacted Version of Exhibit D-Supporting Declaration of Mark West, # (6) Unredacted Version of Exhibit D-Supporting Declaration of Mark West)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [214] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [215] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 7/12/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Daniel S. Savrin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12505682.) filed by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC. (Savrin, Daniel) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 7/12/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Nathaniel P. Bruhn ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12505666.) filed by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC. (Bruhn, Nathaniel) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksandr Markelov and Colin C. West (Markelov, Aleksandr) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying [208] Administrative Motion For Leave to File Separate Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Vuzem USA, Inc., served on 5/16/2018, answer due 6/6/2018. Record of Service of Process on VUZEM USA INC.in San Pedro, California (Dresser, William) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:[210] Proposed Order, filed by Lax Fabricating Ltd. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order Granting [208] Defendant LaX Fabricatings Motion for Administrative Relief to Submit Motion to Dismiss by Lax Fabricating Ltd.. (Bifoss, Bailey) (Filed on 6/28/2018) Modified on 6/29/2018 linking entry to document #208(dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Bailey K. Bifoss in Support of [208] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Submit Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relators' Complaint filed byLax Fabricating Ltd.. (Related document(s)[208]) (Bifoss, Bailey) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018, Terminated: 7/9/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Submit Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relators' Complaint filed by Lax Fabricating Ltd.. Responses due by 7/2/2018. (Bifoss, Bailey) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Order on Motion to SeverCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying [73] Motion to Sever.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/30/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by John Deere, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED. SEE DOCKET ENTRY #206*** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05-30-18 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by John Deere, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2018) Modified text on 6/15/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-30-18, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [193] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2018. (Related documents(s) [193]) (las, ) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Dicastal North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CiTic Dicastal Co., Ltd. for Dicastal North America, Inc.. (Scheiner, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Bass Scheiner and Benjamin Wagner (Scheiner, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [188] Administrative Motion to Substitute.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [189] Administrative Motion to Substitute.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Robert Vuzem served on 5/30/2018, answer due 6/20/2018. Summons and Second Amended Complaint on Robert Vuzem (Dresser, William) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. Eisenmann Anlagenbau GmbH in Illinois (Dresser, William) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. Eisenmann Anlagenbau Verwaltung GmbH, State of Illinois (Dresser, William) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann SE served on 4/17/2018, answer due 5/8/2018. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 6/11/2018) Modified text on 6/12/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann SE served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. Affidavit of Service on Eisenmann Anlagenbau GmbH, State of Illinois (Dresser, William) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/30/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Gregor Lesnik, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/30/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Eisenmann Corporation, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: [119] [120] [121] [123] [125] [126] [127] [132] [145] [157]. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 191 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/30/2018 from 4:10 - 4:50 PM (40 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 9/26/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): William C. Dresser. For Defendant(s): Quyen Le Ta, Aaron Micah Bernay, Kaitlyn M. Murphy, Padraic W. Foran, Sylvia J. Kim, Charles B. Lee, James M. Neudecker, Michael Q. Eagan, Jr., Colin C. West, Benjamin B. Wagner, and Nicholas Scheiner, all personally present. Tera M. Heintz, Regina A. Petty, and Jeremy S. Byrum, appearing telephonically. (Date Filed: 5/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Ivan Vuzem served on 3/14/2018, answer due 4/4/2018. Certificate of Service on Ivan Vuzem, (Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018, Terminated: 6/12/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re [37] Document E-Filed Under Seal to substitute "Magma" entities with "Magna" entities filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 6/4/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018, Terminated: 6/12/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re [37] Document E-Filed Under Seal to substitute HRD / Mont d.o.o. with HRID-MONT d.o.o. filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 6/4/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [186] Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc. and Rehau Inc.'s Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018, Terminated: 5/24/2018 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear by Telephone at May 30, 2018 Case Management Conference filed by Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc., Rehau Incorporated. (Byrum, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [184] Deere & Company's Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance.(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018, Terminated: 5/23/2018 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear by Telephone REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DEFENDANT DEERE & COMPANY'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT MAY 30, 2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by John Deere. (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 183 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 5/23/2018 Initial CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 5/30/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [181] Joint Case Management Statement by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Gregor Lesnik and Stjepan Papes Civil Local Rule 3-15 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [147] Administrative Motion Re: Service.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [146] Administrative Motion Re: Service.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [166] Lax Fabricating Ltd.'s Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance.(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [173] Tesla Inc.'s Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to re [136] Request for Judicial Notice, Cited in Opposition to Notice of Joinder and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Volkswagen. (Neudecker, James) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re [132] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Joinder and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) filed byVolkswagen. (Neudecker, James) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 5/14/2018 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear by Telephone and Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from May 23 CMC with [Proposed] Order filed by Telsa Motors, Inc.. (Foran, Padraic) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 ADR Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR Clerk's Notice of Withdrawal of Notice re: Non-Compliance (re: [171] Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:[166] Proposed Order filed by Lax Fabricating Ltd. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 170 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING DATE*** The previously scheduled Motion to Dismiss [132] is hereby ADVANCED to 9/20/2018 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 169 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING DATES*** The previously scheduled Motions to Dismiss and Joinder (ECF Nos. [125], [126], and [127]) are hereby ADVANCED to 9/13/2018 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 168 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING DATES*** The previously scheduled Motions to Dismiss ECF Nos. [121] and [123] are hereby ADVANCED to 9/6/2018 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 167 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING DATE*** The previously scheduled Motion to Dismiss [119] is hereby ADVANCED to 8/30/2018 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order with Request to Appear Telephonically at the May 23, 2018 Case Management Conference by Lax Fabricating Ltd.. (Petty, Regina) (Filed on 5/8/2018) Modified on 5/9/2018 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/6/2018, Entered: 5/6/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [132] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Joinder and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) - opposition to VW Group of America mtn - filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG served on 4/4/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. Actual answer due date is 4/25/2018. CCP 416.10; Corp Code 2110, in Delaware (Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann SE served on 4/19/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. Actual due date is 5/10/2018, CCP 416.10; Corp Code 2110, in Illinois (Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. CCP 416.10; Corp Code 2110, in Illinois (Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. CCP 416.10;Corp Code 2110, in Illinois (Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Gregurec Ltd, served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018. - actual date answer due is 3/27/2018 (Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/3/2018) Modified text on 5/4/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregor Lesnik. Gregurec Limited - signed after entity was personally served (Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG served on 4/4/2018, answer due 4/25/2018. service under CCP 416.10; Corp Code 2110, in Delaware - state of incorporation (Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to substitute defendants re [37] Document E-Filed Under Seal to substitute BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 5/7/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 156 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re [125] MOTION to Dismiss ) Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed byTelsa Motors, Inc.. (Foran, Padraic) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 155 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY Memorandum in Support of ( [123] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) filed by John Deere. (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 5/1/2018) Modified on 5/2/2018 linking entry to document #123 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to re [136] Request for Judicial Notice, by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re [121] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint ) filed byEisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron M. Bernay, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Declaration of A. Bernay)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 152 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re [127] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byLax Fabricating Ltd.. (Petty, Regina) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re [126] MOTION for Joinder to Eisenmann Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Second Amended Complaint ) filed byLax Fabricating Ltd.. (Petty, Regina) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 150 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re [119] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byMercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc., Rehau Incorporated. (Giles, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [126] MOTION for Joinder to Eisenmann Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Second Amended Complaint, [123] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Deere & Company's Notice of Joinder and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, [119] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, [121] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, [127] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , [125] MOTION to Dismiss ) CertificateOfServiceOfOppositions filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik of Standing Order and of Guidelines (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re [37] Document E-Filed Under Seal to serve Vuzem USA Inc by service on California Secretary of State filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 5/4/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re [37] Document E-Filed Under Seal to allow svs on ISM Vuzem USA Inc by certified mail, return receipt filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 5/4/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to substitute defendants re [37] Document E-Filed Under Seal -replace CiTic Dicastal Co., Ltd. with Dicastal North America, Inc. filed by Gregor Lesnik. Responses due by 5/4/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann Corporation served on 4/4/2018, answer due 4/25/2018. Served Eisenmann Anlagenbau Verwaltung GmbH (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregor Lesnik. Eisenmann SE served on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. Proof of Service on Eisenmann SE in DE (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Bailey Bifoss (Bifoss, Bailey) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [140] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018, Terminated: 4/25/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Malloy-Thope ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12300515.) filed by Volkswagen. (Miller, Jesse) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [123] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Deere & Company's Notice of Joinder and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [127] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) to LaX motion filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [121] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint ) by Eisenmann Corporation filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice re [135] Opposition/Response to Motion, [134] Opposition/Response to Motion and to all motions to dismiss filed byGregor Lesnik. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Index to Workers Compensation Verifications, # (2) Exhibit Ex 1 - 418 Workers Compensation Verifications, # (3) Exhibit Ex 501 - 503, US v Infosys)(Related document(s)[135], [134]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [119] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) by Mercedes and Rehau filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [125] MOTION to Dismiss ) by Tesla filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Dresser in Opposition to [121] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed byGregor Lesnik. (Related document(s)[121]) (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Joinder and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Volkswagen. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/7/2018. Replies due by 5/14/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment 1, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Notice of Joinder and Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint)(Neudecker, James) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregor Lesnik re [37] Document E-Filed Under Seal Proof of Service of Eisenmann Corporation (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [120] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Motion to Dismiss ) Declaration in Support of Opposition filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [120] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Motion to Dismiss ) filed byGregor Lesnik. (Dresser, William) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eisenmann Corporation re [120] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Motion to Dismiss (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lax Fabricating Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/24/2018. Replies due by 5/1/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # (2) Declaration of John Mitchell, # (3) Proposed Order)(Petty, Regina) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Joinder to Eisenmann Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Second Amended Complaint filed by Lax Fabricating Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # (2) Proposed Order)(Petty, Regina) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss filed by Telsa Motors, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/24/2018. Replies due by 5/1/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Foran, Padraic) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re [123] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Deere & Company's Notice of Joinder and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by John Deere. (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 123 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Deere & Company's Notice of Joinder and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by John Deere. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/24/2018. Replies due by 5/1/2018. (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 122 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [121] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint by Eisenmann Corporation. (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by Eisenmann Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/24/2018. Replies due by 5/1/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert Keller, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration of R. Keller, # (3) Exhibit B to Declaration of R. Keller, # (4) Declaration of Luanne Flavin, # (5) Exhibit A to Declaration of L. Flavin, # (6) Declaration of Mark West)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kaitlyn M. Murphy, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Eisenmann Corporations Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, # (4) Unredacted Version of Eisenmann Corporations Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, # (5) Redacted Version of Supporting Declaration of Mark West, # (6) Unredacted Version of Supporting Declaration of Mark West)(Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 4/10/2018) Modified on 4/11/2018 to correct typographical errors (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc., Rehau Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/24/2018. Replies due by 5/1/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Giles, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [117] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018, Terminated: 4/9/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Aaron M. Bernay ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12256673.) filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Bernay, Aaron) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [115] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 954 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?