Paint Sundries Solutions, Inc v. Landmark Technology, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01073
District Judge Thomas S. Zilly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 5:58 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Paint Sundries Solutions, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 3000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Thomas Black +1 206 381 3300 rich.black@foster.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J Hodges +1 206 447 6282 ben.hodges@foster.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED kevin.ormiston@foster.com
v.
No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Landmark Technology, LLC. (DJ) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent. E-mailed to the U.S. Patent Office. (DJ) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Paint Sundries Solutions, Inc. (Hodges, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Unfair Competition against defendant(s) Landmark Technology, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-4944630) Attorney Benjamin J Hodges added to party Paint Sundries Solutions, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Paint Sundries Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), # 5 Summons to Landmark Technology, LLC)(Hodges, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 179 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?