FOOD AND WATER WATCH, INC. v. TRUMP
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01485

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 13, 2018 at 1:07 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Food & Water Watch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 1616 P Street, NW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary B. Corrigan +1 202 683 2451 zcorrigan@fwwatch.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Javier M. Guzman +1 202 448 9090 jguzman@democracyforward.org
Space Karianne Melissa Jones +1 202 448 9090 kjones@democracyforward.org
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SALVATORE T. ALFANO +1 973 743 9390 stalfano@aol.com
Space HUGH J. BRACKEN +1 610 565 4776 hjbracken@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER S. PANTALEO

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roxane Sokolove Marenberg +1 202 861 3900 +1 202 689 7415 roxane.marenberg@piperrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allyson Newton Ho +1 214 466 4180 +1 214 466 4001 aho@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J. SHANE CREAMER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. SHANE CREAMER

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN J. BARRY +1 973 622 4444

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred Fisher Fielding +1 202 739 5560 +1 202 739 3001 fred.fielding@morganlewis.com
Space Michael E. Kenneally +1 202 739 5893 michael.kenneally@morganlewis.com
Space Jason R. Scherr +1 202 373 6709 jr.scherr@morganlewis.com
Space Eric W. Sitarchuk +1 215 963 5840 +1 215 963 5001 eric.sitarchuk@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SPRAGUE & SPRAGUE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD A. SPRAGUE +1 215 561 7681 rasprague@spragueandsprague.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stark & Stark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 609 945 7638 jlaskey@stark-stark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph A. Darrow +1 202 598 2445 joseph.a.darrow@usdoj.gov
Space Ethan Price Davis +1 202 514 9242 +1 202 616 8470 ethan.p.davis@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
Space Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
Space David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher Robert Healy +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8470 christopher.healy@usdoj.gov
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Coby Healy Howell +1 503 727 1023 +1 503 727 1117 coby.howell@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
Space REBECCA M. KOPPLIN +1 202 514 3953 rebecca.m.kopplin@usdoj.gov
Space Jacqueline Margaret Leonard +1 202 305 0493 +1 202 305 0506 jacqueline.leonard@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
Space Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
Space SCOTT WEBSTER REID +1 215 861 8358 scott.reid@usdoj.gov
Space Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
Space Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
Space Nikhel Sus +1 202 514 2071 +1 202 616 8470 nikhel.s.sus@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Space Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Commerce United States Department of Commerce, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dena Michal Roth +1 202 514 5108 dena.m.roth@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Transportation United States Department of Transportation, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea McBarnette +1 202 514 7153 +1 202 514 8780 andrea.mcbarnette@usdoj.gov
Space Melissa Gaspar Rasmussen +1 202 305 9927 +1 202 514 8780 melissa.rasmussen@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § App.
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Interrogatories Propounded
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Reed S. Cordish, # 3 Declaration of James W. Uthmeier, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyer, Kathryn)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyer, Kathryn)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn L. Wyer on behalf of All Defendants (Wyer, Kathryn)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/1/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/30/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/1/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP served on 7/31/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 7/31/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 8/11/2017. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Proof of Service by FOOD AND WATER WATCH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karianne M. Jones, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553. Phone No. - 202-448-9090. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5049398. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FOOD AND WATER WATCH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      COMPLAINT against DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5046453) filed by FOOD AND WATER WATCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Guzman, Javier)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?