Rodriguez v. RMK World Wide Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:17-cv-60921

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2019 at 5:05 AM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zoila Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Norell +1 954 617 6017 +1 954 617 6018 robnorell@aol.com
v.
No Logo RMK World Wide Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Nolan Klein, PA - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Nolan Keith Klein +1 954 745 0588 +1 305 397 1924 klein@nklegal.com
, Hector Virgilio Ramirez +1 954 745 0588 ramirez@nklegal.com
No Logo Robert Knobel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Patrick Siebott +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 csiebott@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
, , , , Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Nolan Klein, PA - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Nolan Keith Klein +1 954 745 0588 +1 305 397 1924 klein@nklegal.com
, Hector Virgilio Ramirez +1 954 745 0588 ramirez@nklegal.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 0201
Nature of Suit Labor: Fair Standards
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Adopting 35 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Costs filed by Zoila Rodriguez. Recommending that Robert S. Norell, P.A.'s Verified Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Reasonable Expenses of Litigation (DE 31) be GRANTED in PART. The total amount of attorney's fees and litigation costs recommended is $23,012.35. Objections to R&R due by 9/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 9/12/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Costs filed by Zoila Rodriguez. (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Costs filed by RMK World Wide Inc.. Replies due by 8/29/2018. (Roderman, Barry) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING 31 Robert S. Norell, P.A.'s Verified Motion for Attorney's Fees and Reasonable Expenses of Litigation to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 08/11/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Attorney Fees
              Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Costs by Zoila Rodriguez. Responses due by 8/23/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Detailed Billing Records, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Robert S. Norell)(Norell, Robert)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ENDORSED ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Approve Settlement, to Deem Plaintiff the Prevailing Party, and to Retain Jurisdiction to Award Attorney's Fees and Litigation Expenses. The parties' settlement is approved as fair and reasonable. Plaintiff is the prevailing party in this action and is entitled to reasonable attorney's fees and litigation expenses. Plaintiff shall proceed in accordance with Local Rule 7.3 with regard to determining the amount of Plaintiff's attorney's fees and litigation expenses. The Court retains jurisdiction over the Parties and this action to determine attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Settlement
                  Unopposed MOTION for Settlement (FLSA Approval) by Zoila Rodriguez. Responses due by 6/13/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norell, Robert)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPORT REGARDING Settlement (Second Supplemental) by Zoila Rodriguez (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPORT REGARDING Settlement (Supplemental) by Zoila Rodriguez (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPORT REGARDING Settlement by Zoila Rodriguez (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Administrative Order Closing Case in light of the parties' representations at the status conference. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 30, 2018, regarding settlement. Either party may move to reopen the matter if the case is not resolved. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Darrin P. Gayles: Status Conference held on 4/18/2018. Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hs01) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ENDORSED ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/18/2018 at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall enter their appearances telephonically using the following dial-in information: Dial-in Number 888-273-3658; Access Code 7032614; Security Code 5170. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the Status Conference begins and wait until your case is called. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Statement of: Undisputed Facts by Zoila Rodriguez re 21 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law by Zoila Rodriguez. Responses due by 4/5/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Attachment A - Robert Knobel, # 2 Deposition Attachment B - Dawn Knobel, # 3 Attachment C - Exhibit 1 to Depositions of Robert and Dawn Knobel, # 4 Attachment D - Exhibit 2 to Depositions of Robert and Dawn Knobel, # 5 Attachment E - Exhibit 3 to Depositions of Robert and Dawn Knobel, # 6 Attachment F - Declaration of Zoila Rodriguez, # 7 Attachment G - Sunbiz Report for RMK Worldwide Properties, Inc.)(Norell, Robert)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Robert Knobel, RMK World Wide Inc. (Roderman, Barry) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Zoila Rodriguez, John W. Salmon. Mediation Hearing set for 4/19/2018 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER Setting Discovery Procedure. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 12/19/2017. (ccy)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. (vjk) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Status Conference set for 4/25/2018 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Jury Trial set for 7/23/2018 at 12:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 7/18/2018 at 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Amended Pleadings due by 12/27/2017., Expert Discovery due by 3/16/2018., Fact Discovery due by 2/23/2018., Joinder of Parties due by 12/27/2017., Mediation Deadline 4/20/2018., In Limine Motions due by 5/21/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2018., Motions due by 5/21/2018., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/22/2018. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/15/2017. (ail) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE by Zoila Rodriguez Joint Proposed Scheduling Order Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. On or before November 13, 2017, the parties shall prepare and file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Zoila Rodriguez (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Robert Knobel, RMK World Wide Inc.. (Klein, Nolan) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 10, 2017. No default has been entered in this case. As a result, Defendants' request to vacate the default is denied as moot. Plaintiff is not required to move for a clerk's default and subsequent default judgment unless Defendants fail to respond in accordance with this Court's order. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 7 Notice of Court Practice,,, 1 Complaint, Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default by Robert Knobel, RMK World Wide Inc.. (Klein, Nolan)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hector Virgilio Ramirez on behalf of Robert Knobel, RMK World Wide Inc.. Attorney Hector Virgilio Ramirez added to party Robert Knobel(pty:dft), Attorney Hector Virgilio Ramirez added to party RMK World Wide Inc.(pty:dft). (Ramirez, Hector) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nolan Keith Klein on behalf of Robert Knobel, RMK World Wide Inc.. Attorney Nolan Keith Klein added to party Robert Knobel(pty:dft), Attorney Nolan Keith Klein added to party RMK World Wide Inc.(pty:dft). (Klein, Nolan) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ENDORSED ORDER on Default Procedure. Plaintiff effectuated service of the summons and complaint on Defendants on May 10, 2017. Defendants, however, have failed to plead or otherwise defend this action after being served with process. Accordingly, within three (3) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file for entry of default by the Clerk as to the Defendants. Within five (5) days of entry of default by the Clerk, Plaintiff shall file a motion for final default judgment, accompanied by a proposed final default judgment attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and duly supported by affidavits and other documentation. Plaintiffs failure to file a Motion for Final Default Judgment on or before the date set forth above may result in dismissal of the instant action. Plaintiff shall immediately provide Defendants with a copy of this Order via certified mail. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 07/23/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Zoila Rodriguez. Robert Knobel served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017. (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Zoila Rodriguez. RMK World Wide Inc. served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017. (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Summons Issued as to Robert Knobel, RMK World Wide Inc. (lrz1) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lrz1) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lrz1) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9718166, filed by Zoila Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) RMK World Wide Inc., # 3 Summon(s) Robert Knobel)(Norell, Robert) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER CANCELLING STATUS CONFERENCE set for April 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?