United States v. Jensen
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00756

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 21, 2019 at 1:39 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bank of America, Defendant
No Logo Hawk Holding, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William D. Darden +1 801 364 0123 wdarden@bowenlaw.com
No Logo Larry R. Jensen , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William D. Darden +1 801 364 0123 wdarden@bowenlaw.com
No Logo Pamela J. Jensen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William D. Darden +1 801 364 0123 wdarden@bowenlaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John K. Mangum +1 801 325 3216 john.mangum@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Landon M. Yost +1 202 307 2144 landon.m.yost@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint filed by Defendant Hawk Holding. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Hawk Holding, L.L.C.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer)(Darden, William)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Darden on behalf of Hawk Holding, Pamela J. Jensen, Larry R. Jensen (Darden, William) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Bank of America. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (lan) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Hawk Holding. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (lan) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Pamela J. Jensen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (lan) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Larry R. Jensen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (lan) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Landon M. Yost on behalf of United States of America (Yost, Landon) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants No Filing Fee filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet na) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Mangum, John) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff United States of America is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?