United States v. $40,000.00 in U. S. Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-00398

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 11, 2019 at 11:25 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Appendix to the Statement of Facts
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 24 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery deadlines stayed pending the Court's decision on Claimant's motion for summary judgment. Discovery plan due 14 days after such decision, should the motion be denied. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/15/2018. (Collins, S.)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Stay
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Appendix to the Statement of Facts
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum In Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state claim. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/24/2018. (Collins, S.)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Withdrawal of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/22/2017, Entered: None Return of Property
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Warrant Issued
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?