Ciatti v. Carite, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01629-DAP
District Judge Dan Aaron Polster, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 1:22 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo C. Thomas Auto Group, Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Green +1 216 831 5100 +1 216 831 9467 bgreen@shaperolaw.com
Space James A Marx +1 216 831 5100 +1 216 831 9467 jmarx@shaperolaw.com
No Logo Thomas Ciatti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Green +1 216 831 5100 +1 216 831 9467 bgreen@shaperolaw.com
Space James A Marx +1 216 831 5100 +1 216 831 9467 jmarx@shaperolaw.com
No Logo American Dealer Funding Group, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Lockshaw, Jr. +1 614 744 2945 +1 248 433 7274 dlockshaw@dickinsonwright.com
Space Jonathan Rea Secrest +1 614 744 2572 +1 248 433 7274 jsecrest@dickinsonwright.com
No Logo Carite Capital, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Lockshaw, Jr. +1 614 744 2945 +1 248 433 7274 dlockshaw@dickinsonwright.com
Space Jonathan Rea Secrest +1 614 744 2572 +1 248 433 7274 jsecrest@dickinsonwright.com
No Logo Carite, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Lockshaw, Jr. +1 614 744 2945 +1 248 433 7274 dlockshaw@dickinsonwright.com
Space Jonathan Rea Secrest +1 614 744 2572 +1 248 433 7274 jsecrest@dickinsonwright.com
v.
No Logo American Dealer Funding Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Lockshaw, Jr. +1 614 744 2945 +1 248 433 7274 dlockshaw@dickinsonwright.com
Space Jonathan Rea Secrest +1 614 744 2572 +1 248 433 7274 jsecrest@dickinsonwright.com
No Logo Carite Capital, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Lockshaw, Jr. +1 614 744 2945 +1 248 433 7274 dlockshaw@dickinsonwright.com
Space Jonathan Rea Secrest +1 614 744 2572 +1 248 433 7274 jsecrest@dickinsonwright.com
No Logo Carite, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Lockshaw, Jr. +1 614 744 2945 +1 248 433 7274 dlockshaw@dickinsonwright.com
Space Jonathan Rea Secrest +1 614 744 2572 +1 248 433 7274 jsecrest@dickinsonwright.com
No Logo John Does, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Rea Secrest +1 614 744 2572 +1 248 433 7274 jsecrest@dickinsonwright.com
No Logo C. Thomas Auto Group, Ltd., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Green +1 216 831 5100 +1 216 831 9467 bgreen@shaperolaw.com
Space James A Marx +1 216 831 5100 +1 216 831 9467 jmarx@shaperolaw.com
No Logo Thomas Ciatti, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Green +1 216 831 5100 +1 216 831 9467 bgreen@shaperolaw.com
Space James A Marx +1 216 831 5100 +1 216 831 9467 jmarx@shaperolaw.com
Office Cleveland
Filed 8/3/2017
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $75000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Medina
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 17CIV0636[Medina County Common Pleas]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags Baughman,Cat04,Standard
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017, Terminated: 12/28/2017 Motion for Extension of Time - Other
    Motion for extension of time until 01/08/2018 to Amend Pleadings filed by C. Thomas Auto Group, Ltd., Thomas Ciatti. (Green, Brian)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Order on motion for extension of time
      Order [non-document] granting Plaintiffs [18] Motion for Extension of until 01/08/2018 to Amend Pleadings. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/28/2017.(W,CM)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Notice of Service
        Notice of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Green, Brian)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Notice
          Notice of Issuing Subpoena Duces Tecum Upon Credit Acceptance Corporation filed by C. Thomas Auto Group, Ltd., Thomas Ciatti. (Green, Brian)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Telephone Conference
              Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Scheduled teleconference held on 10/17/2017. Attending were Plaintiff Thomas Ciatti and Attorney Brian Green, attending for Defendants were Mike Cavanaugh and Attorney Jonathan Secrest. At that time, counsel reported that they still needed to conduct discovery before they could settle the case. Accordingly, nothing further was scheduled as the Court concluded that the parties will either settle the case on their own or litigate the case pursuant to the case management plan. (Court Reporter: n/a.)Time: 10 minutes. (K,K)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                  Minutes of proceedings [non-document] On Oct. 2, 2017, the Court held a scheduled teleconference attended by Plaintiff Thomas Ciatti, Plaintiff's counsel Brian J. Green, Defendant Carite, Inc.'s Mike Cavanaugh, and Defendant's counsel David A. Lockshaw, Jr. The parties indicated that they were in the process of working out a settlement agreement. A follow-up teleconference was scheduled for Oct. 17, 2017 at 1:30PM. The parties should use the same call-in instructions as the previous teleconference. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 15 minutes. (K,K)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 response
                    Reply to Counterclaim filed by C. Thomas Auto Group, Ltd., Thomas Ciatti. Related document(s)[6]. (Green, Brian)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Case Management Conference Plan/OrderCourt Filing
                      Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 7/6/2018. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 12/29/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 8/3/2018. Telephone Conference, with clients participating, is set for 10/2/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/5/2017. (K,K)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: 9/1/2017 Initial Disclosures
                        Initial Disclosures Notice of Filing filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Green, Brian)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
                          Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) and LR 16.3(b)(3), filed by All Defendants. Related document(s)[8].(Secrest, Jonathan)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Initial Disclosures
                            Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Green, Brian)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Initial Disclosures
                              Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) filed by All Defendants. (Secrest, Jonathan)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to respond to Counterclaim. C. Thomas Auto Group, Ltd. answer due 9/28/2017. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/21/2017.(K,K)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: 8/18/2017, Terminated: 8/21/2017 Motion for extension of time to answer
                                  Motion for extension of time until 09/28/2017 to answer , Motion for extension of time until 09/28/2017 to Reply to Counterclaim filed by C. Thomas Auto Group, Ltd., Thomas Ciatti. Related document(s)[6]. (Green, Brian)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Case Management Conference Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 9/5/2017 at 09:00 AM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting is due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 8/31/2017. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/11/2017. (K,K)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Remark
                                      Remark: Copy of state court record received from Medina County Clerk of Courts, case no. 17CIV0636. (P,WL)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 Answer
                                        Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim against C. Thomas Auto Group, Ltd., Thomas Ciatti filed by American Dealer Funding Group, Inc., Carite, Inc., Carite Capital, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Dealership Agreement, # (2) Exhibit B - First Financing Agreement, # (3) Exhibit C - Second Financing Agreement)(Secrest, Jonathan) Modified text on 8/11/2017 (G,TH).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Magistrate Consent Form Issued
                                        Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,SR)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Carite Capital, LLC. (Secrest, Jonathan)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by American Dealer Funding Group, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Carite, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 notice of removal
                                                Notice of Removal from Medina Court of Common Pleas, Ohio, case number 17CIV0636 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8270121. Filed All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Complaint, # (2) Notice of Removal, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet) (Secrest, Jonathan) Modified text on 8/3/2017 (S,SR). M
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
                                                Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,SR)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Utility Event
                                                  Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (S,SR)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?