Walker v. Credit Acceptance Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00128

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 4:03 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carla Walker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Easley & Houseal, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Michael Easley +1 870 633 1447 mike@ehtriallawyers.com
v.
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Meyer Brick, Jr. +1 501 370 3361 +1 501 537 2941 pbrick@fridayfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin A. Kasten +1 501 376 2011 +1 501 376 2147 mkasten@fridayfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Compel Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion to Stay All Proceedings Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's the Court's Inquiry Regarding Motions to Compel Arbitration, to Dismiss, Et Al filed by Carla Walker. (Easley, B.) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Letter to Clerk, St. Francis County Circuit Court forwarding case file pursuant to remand. (mcz) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to immediately remand this case to the Circuit Court of St. Francis County, Arkansas. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/30/2017. (mcz) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        LETTER ORDER. If you choose not to file a response to the Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay All Proceedings by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, 8/31/2017, I will grant the motion. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/28/2017. (mef) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 8 Response to Motion Brief in Support of Credit Acceptance Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Kasten, Martin) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            RESPONSE to Motion re 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Credit Acceptance Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Kasten, Martin) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 6 Motion to Compel Brief in Support of Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion to Stay All Proceedings filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Kasten, Martin) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Compel Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kasten, Martin) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 4 Remand to State Court filed by Carla Walker. (Easley, B.) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carla Walker (Easley, B.) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/12/2017. Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/26/2017. Jury Trial set for 6/5/2018 at 9:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 8/8/17. (mmb) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT AT LAW with Jury Demand against Credit Acceptance Corporation filed by Carla Walker.(mef)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Credit Acceptance Corporation from St. Francis County Circuit Court, Case Number 62CV-2017-146-3. (Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT063084.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mef) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 255 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?