Amy Cox v. LB Lending, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-01580

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 2:54 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING DISMISISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 107 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Errata
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Remand Case to State CourtCourt Filing
                            MINUTES OF MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT 65 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 70 held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The Court hears argument on the motions. The Motion to Remand (Doc. No. 65) is DENIED. The Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. No. 70) is GRANTED. A separate order will issue. Court Reporter: Adele C Frazier. (jp)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None For Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None For Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Remand Case to State Court
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Enforce
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/5/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?