USA v. Medina
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-mj-01097
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 28, 2017 at 11:30 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Evelyn Medina, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Brad Bailey Law, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Bradford Bailey +1 781 589 2828 brad@bradbaileylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Scott Lauer +1 617 223 8061 Scott_Lauer@fd.org
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Scott Lauer as to Evelyn Medina. (Lauer, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ELECTRONIC NOTICE CANCELING Detention Hearing as to Evelyn Medina. Hearing scheduled in error. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Evelyn Medina Preliminary Examination set for 8/11/2017 11:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 15 Motion to Continue as to Evelyn Medina (1) (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Assented to MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing & Preliminary Examination to August 11, 2017 at 11:30 AM as to Evelyn Medina. (Bailey, R.) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: R. Bradford Bailey appearing for Evelyn Medina. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Bailey, R.) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/2/17 as to Evelyn Medina. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference as to Evelyn Medina held on 8/3/2017. Government argues that defendant was not forthcoming at initial appearance, alleges discrepancies relative defendant's actual age, as well as frequency of travel to Dominican Republic. Defendant argues that there is some question as to her actual birth date, and that her answers regarding travel may not have been complete; however, that defendant takes seriously the business of the court. In addition to current conditions of release, Court orders electronic monitoring and an 11:00 p.m. to 7:00 a.m. curfew. (Attorneys present: Carris, Lauer.) Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Appearance Bond Entered as to Evelyn Medina in amount of $ 50,000. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Evelyn Medina. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Initial Appearance as to Evelyn Medina held on 8/2/2017. Court advises defendant of her rights and charges against her. Government states maximum penalties. Defendant submits financial affidavit, court appoints counsel. Defendant sworn, answers all bail questions. Defendant released on bond and conditions. ( Detention Hearing and Preliminary Examination set for 8/8/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.) (Attorneys present: Carris, Lauer.)Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Evelyn Medina Status Conference set for 8/3/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Evelyn Medina Initial Appearance set for 8/2/2017 03:15 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Evelyn Medina; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell as to Evelyn Medina. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SEALED COMPLAINT as to Evelyn Medina (1). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Anthony P. Russo, Jr., # 2 JS45)(Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 1 Motion to Seal Case as to Evelyn Medina (1) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Seal Case as to Evelyn Medina by USA. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?