Unknown
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-mj-01052
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 11, 2017 at 1:04 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857, Defendant (1)
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 9 Motion to Unseal Case as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857 (1) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Search Warrant Returned Executed on 7/5/17 at 1PM in case as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857 (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Unseal Case as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857 by USA. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Search and Seizure Warrant Issued ON 7/5/2017 @12:00PM in case as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER to Service Provider as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: SEALED ORDER OF AUTHORIZATION as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER on application for Pen Register (to obtain location data) as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPLICATION for Pen Register as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857. (Telephone number to be intercepted: 617-817-9857). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil Sullivan) (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 1 Motion to Seal as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857 (1)Allowed (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION to Seal as to Telephone Number XXX-XXX-9857 by USA. (Catino3, Theresa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/5/2017) (Catino3, Theresa). (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 22 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?