Arkansas Teacher Retirement System et al v. Musk et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00461-MN
District Judge Maryellen Noreika, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 5, 2018 at 7:17 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aaron Rocke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric L. Zagar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L. Zagar

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedlander & Gorris, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kristen Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Ross

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Curry +1 302 573 6956 tcurry@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ned C. Weinberger +1 302 573 6938 nweinberger@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee D. Rudy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee D. Rudy

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett, Jones & Elliott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Anthony Fioravanti, Jr. +1 302 888 6326 pafioravanti@prickett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robin Winchester

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Winchester

Toggle Switch Represented by Stakset, Allen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Hanrahan +1 302 888 6500 +1 302 658 8111 mhanrahan@prickett.com
No Logo Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric L. Zagar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L. Zagar

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedlander & Gorris, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kristen Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Ross

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Curry +1 302 573 6956 tcurry@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ned C. Weinberger +1 302 573 6938 nweinberger@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee D. Rudy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee D. Rudy

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett, Jones & Elliott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Anthony Fioravanti, Jr. +1 302 888 6326 pafioravanti@prickett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robin Winchester

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Winchester

Toggle Switch Represented by Stakset, Allen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Hanrahan +1 302 888 6500 +1 302 658 8111 mhanrahan@prickett.com
No Logo Boston Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric L. Zagar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L. Zagar

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedlander & Gorris, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kristen Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Ross

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Curry +1 302 573 6956 tcurry@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ned C. Weinberger +1 302 573 6938 nweinberger@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee D. Rudy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee D. Rudy

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett, Jones & Elliott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Anthony Fioravanti, Jr. +1 302 888 6326 pafioravanti@prickett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robin Winchester

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Winchester

Toggle Switch Represented by Stakset, Allen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Hanrahan +1 302 888 6500 +1 302 658 8111 mhanrahan@prickett.com
No Logo Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric L. Zagar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L. Zagar

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedlander & Gorris, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kristen Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Ross

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Curry +1 302 573 6956 tcurry@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ned C. Weinberger +1 302 573 6938 nweinberger@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee D. Rudy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee D. Rudy

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett, Jones & Elliott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Anthony Fioravanti, Jr. +1 302 888 6326 pafioravanti@prickett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robin Winchester

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Winchester

Toggle Switch Represented by Stakset, Allen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Hanrahan +1 302 888 6500 +1 302 658 8111 mhanrahan@prickett.com
No Logo Francis B. Freeman, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooch and Taylor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake A. Bennett +1 302 984 3889 bbennett@coochtaylor.com
No Logo KBC Asset Management NV, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric L. Zagar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L. Zagar

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedlander & Gorris, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kristen Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Ross

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Curry +1 302 573 6956 tcurry@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ned C. Weinberger +1 302 573 6938 nweinberger@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee D. Rudy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee D. Rudy

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett, Jones & Elliott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Anthony Fioravanti, Jr. +1 302 888 6326 pafioravanti@prickett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robin Winchester

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Winchester

Toggle Switch Represented by Stakset, Allen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Hanrahan +1 302 888 6500 +1 302 658 8111 mhanrahan@prickett.com
No Logo Marnie Walski McMahon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Marnie Walski McMahon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marnie Walski McMahon
No Logo Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric L. Zagar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L. Zagar

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedlander & Gorris, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kristen Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Ross

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Curry +1 302 573 6956 tcurry@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ned C. Weinberger +1 302 573 6938 nweinberger@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee D. Rudy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee D. Rudy

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett, Jones & Elliott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Anthony Fioravanti, Jr. +1 302 888 6326 pafioravanti@prickett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robin Winchester

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Winchester

Toggle Switch Represented by Stakset, Allen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Hanrahan +1 302 888 6500 +1 302 658 8111 mhanrahan@prickett.com
No Logo Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric L. Zagar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L. Zagar

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedlander & Gorris, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kristen Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Ross

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Curry +1 302 573 6956 tcurry@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ned C. Weinberger +1 302 573 6938 nweinberger@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee D. Rudy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee D. Rudy

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett, Jones & Elliott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Anthony Fioravanti, Jr. +1 302 888 6326 pafioravanti@prickett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robin Winchester

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Winchester

Toggle Switch Represented by Stakset, Allen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Hanrahan +1 302 888 6500 +1 302 658 8111 mhanrahan@prickett.com
No Logo Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric L. Zagar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L. Zagar

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedlander & Gorris, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Manuel +1 302 622 7097 +1 302 622 7100 mmanuel@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kristen Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Ross

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Curry +1 302 573 6956 tcurry@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ned C. Weinberger +1 302 573 6938 nweinberger@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee D. Rudy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee D. Rudy

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett, Jones & Elliott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Anthony Fioravanti, Jr. +1 302 888 6326 pafioravanti@prickett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robin Winchester

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Winchester

Toggle Switch Represented by Stakset, Allen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Hanrahan +1 302 888 6500 +1 302 658 8111 mhanrahan@prickett.com
v.
No Logo Gracias, Antonio J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Antonio J. Gracias"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
No Logo Buss, Brad W, Defendant
Officially listed as "Brad W. Buss"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cafepress.com, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Unknown Role, Cavium Networks
Unknown Role, Aecom Technology Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Ehrenpreis, Ira Ehrenpreis, Ira, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ira Ehrenpreis"

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Musk, Kimbal J. Musk, Kimbal J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Kimbal Musk"
Unknown Role, Big Green
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Denholm, Robyn M. Denholm, Robyn M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robyn M. Denholm"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Sun Microsystems, Inc. Unknown Role, Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Echelon Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Jurvetson, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Stephen T., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stephen T. Jurvetson"
Unknown Role, Athenahealth, Inc.
Unknown Role, Draper Associates, LP
Unknown Role, Draper Timothy C
Unknown Role, Fisher John H N
Unknown Role, Enernoc, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Neophotonics Corp
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Oral OrderCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER - The referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge is hereby WITHDRAWN. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/7/2018. (dlw)
    LREF
    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
    Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-MN-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-MN-CJB (rjb)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re Memorandum Opinion GRANTING consolidation of CA No. 17-461-VAC-CJB into Lead Case 17-317-VAC-CJB. (31 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB, 34 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Co-Lead Counsel appointed. Every subsequent pleading filed in this Consolidated Action, or in any separate action included herein shall bear the caption for CA 17-317: IN RE TESLA, INC. STOCKHOLDER LITIGATION.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/15/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB(mlc)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding consolidation and appointment of lead plaintiffs. An appropriate Order will follow. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/15/2018.This order has been emailed to local counsel. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB(mlc) Modified on 2/15/2018 (mlc). Unsealed on 2/20/2018 (dlb).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Create Case Association
          Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB. Hereafter, papers need only be filed in Consolidated Lead Action 17-317-VAC-CJB. (dlb)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Reply Brief
            REPLY BRIEF re [16] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions filed by Francis B. Freeman, Jr., Marnie Walski McMahon. (Bennett, Blake)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Redacted Document
              REDACTED VERSION of (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Pepijn Paanen on behalf of Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                  DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Roger LaDuke on behalf of Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                    DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Robert Jones on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                      DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Linda Demunter and Gert Rammeloo on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                        DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Magdalena Reischl and Gerold Permoser on behalf of Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H. by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                          DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, Timothy J. Smyth on behalf of Boston Retirement System by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Declaration
                            DECLARATION re (21 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, (24 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Brief (Combined Answering and Reply),, George Hopkins on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply)
                              [SEALED] BRIEF (Combined Answering and Reply) re[16] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions, [10] MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017, Terminated: 6/23/2017 Motion to seal
                                MOTION to Seal Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to the Individual Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs and Lead Counsel, and Reply Brief in Further Support of the Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs and Lead Counsel - filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  SO ORDERED
                                  SO ORDERED D.I. (23 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 20 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) MOTION to Seal Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to the Individual Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs and Lead Counsel, and Reply Brief in Further Support of the Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidati filed by Aaron Rocke, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, KBC Asset Management NV, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB(mlc)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Declaration
                                    DECLARATION re [16] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions by Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. (Bennett, Blake)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Declaration
                                      DECLARATION re [16] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions by Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Bennett, Blake)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Answering Brief in Opposition
                                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [16] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions filed by Francis B. Freeman, Jr..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/9/2017. (Bennett, Blake)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017, Terminated: 2/15/2018 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bottini & Bottini as Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Derivative Actions - filed by Francis B. Freeman, Jr.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bennett, Blake)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Remark
                                            Remark: If the parties jointly consent to have a Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, then when Judge Burke enters a case schedule he will enter the respective pre-trial conference and trial dates onto his calendar and will honor them. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued on May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), then upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be considered ready for reassignment to a visiting District Judge. Whether the pre-trial conference and trial dates will stand after reassignment will depend on the availability of those dates on the visiting District Judge's calendar. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB(dlb)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Remark re Newer Attorneys
                                              REMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB(dlb)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                SO ORDERED, re (15 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB, 18 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME and Set Briefing Schedule on Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff to June 2, 2017, June 23, 2017, and July 14, 2017 (see Stipulation for details) filed by Antonio J. Gracias, Tesla Inc., Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB(dlb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017, Terminated: 5/23/2017 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME and Set Briefing Schedule on Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff to June 2, 2017, June 23, 2017, and July 14, 2017 (see Stipulation for details) - filed by Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Tesla Inc.. (Moritz, Garrett)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Redacted Document
                                                    REDACTED VERSION of (12 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB) Opening Brief in Support,, (16 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) Opening Brief in Support,, of Motion for Consolidation and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Aaron Rocke. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 waiver of service executed
                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Boston Retirement System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, KBC Asset Management NV, Aaron Rocke, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund: For All Defendants. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                        SO ORDERED D.I. (11 in 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB, 15 in 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB) MOTION to Seal Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Consolidation and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Aaron Rocke, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, KBC Asset Management NV, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/5/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00461-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00317-VAC-CJB(mlc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Add Attorneys Pro Hac Vice
                                                          Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lee D. Rudy,Kristen Ross,Eric L. Zagar,Robin Winchester for Arkansas Teacher Retirement System,Lee D. Rudy,Kristen Ross,Eric L. Zagar,Robin Winchester for Boston Retirement System,Lee D. Rudy,Kristen Ross,Eric L. Zagar,Robin Winchester for Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H.,Lee D. Rudy,Kristen Ross,Eric L. Zagar,Robin Winchester for KBC Asset Management NV,Lee D. Rudy,Kristen Ross,Eric L. Zagar,Robin Winchester for Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System,Lee D. Rudy,Kristen Ross,Eric L. Zagar,Robin Winchester for Aaron Rocke,Lee D. Rudy,Kristen Ross,Eric L. Zagar,Robin Winchester for Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund,Lee D. Rudy,Kristen Ross,Eric L. Zagar,Robin Winchester for Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                            SO ORDERED D.I. [9] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lee D. Rudy, Eric L. Zagar, Robin Winchester, and Kristen L. Ross filed by Aaron Rocke, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, KBC Asset Management NV, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/5/2017. (mlc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                              SO ORDERED D.I. [8] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Randall J. Baron and Maxwell R. Huffman filed by Aaron Rocke, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Boston Retirement System, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, KBC Asset Management NV, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/5/2017. (mlc)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Opening Brief in Support
                                                                [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re [10] MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017, Terminated: 5/5/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                  MOTION to Seal Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Consolidation and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel - filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017, Terminated: 2/15/2018 Motion to consolidate cases
                                                                    MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel - filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017, Terminated: 5/5/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lee D. Rudy, Eric L. Zagar, Robin Winchester, and Kristen L. Ross - filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Manuel, Michael)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017, Terminated: 5/5/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Randall J. Baron and Maxwell R. Huffman - filed by Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Manuel, Michael)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Manuel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Manuel, Michael)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of [2] Complaint,, by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Verifications, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                                              SO ORDERED D.I. [5] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James J. Sabella and Kelly L. Tucker filed by Aaron Rocke, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, KBC Asset Management NV, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/27/2017. (dlk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  case referred to magistrate judge
                                                                                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) (rjb)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                  Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017, Terminated: 4/27/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James J. Sabella and Kelly L. Tucker - filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [1] Motion to Seal Complaint and Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/21/17. (etg)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Magistrate Consent FormsCourt Filing
                                                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Complaint
                                                                                          [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX027566.) - filed by Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., Boston Retirement System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, KBC Asset Management NV, Aaron Rocke, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Verifications, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017, Terminated: 4/21/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Complaint and Exhibit A - filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, Erste-Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft m.b.H., KBC Asset Management NV, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Aaron Rocke, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(nmg)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  No Summons Issued
                                                                                              No Summons Issued. (nmg)
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?