Mary Beavers v. Midland Funding LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 17-2543

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 13, 2017 at 11:22 PM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803264320 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mary Beavers - Joint Appendix - w/service 07/26/2017 [4561644] [17-2543] (CDM) [Entered: 07/26/2017 05:47 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 00803263743 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mary Beavers - w/service 07/26/2017. [4561396] [17-2543] (CDM) [Entered: 07/26/2017 12:57 PM]
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803263624 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mary Beavers. No Transcript[4561333] [17-2543] (CDM) [Entered: 07/26/2017 11:52 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803256468 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding LLC. - FOR CAL [4558203] [17-2543] (JEB) [Entered: 07/18/2017 11:03 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803256460 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          APPEARANCE filed by Jon E. Brightmire for Appellees Lloyd & McDaniel PLC, Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding LLC w/service 07/18/2017 [4558201] [17-2543] (JEB) [Entered: 07/18/2017 11:02 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803253657 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CLERK LETTER sent regarding case number correction from 17-3542 to 17-2543 due to computer error. [4557054] [17-2543] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:31 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803253539 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/22/2017 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4556818] [17-2543]--[Edited 07/14/2017 by CMW] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2017 09:36 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803253538 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Opinion and Order 6/13/17, Judgment 6/13/17, Order 6/20/17, docket entries, [4556812] [17-2543]--[Edited 07/14/2017 by CMW] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2017 09:31 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803253535 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Civil case docketed. [4556797] [17-2543]--[Edited 07/14/2017 by CMW] (AEV) [Entered: 07/13/2017 09:15 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 13 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?