United States v. Bagdasarian
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-06008

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2018 at 12:58 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Matthew Bagdasarian, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Show Cause Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              PETITION to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration in Support Thereof; Exhibits (Redacted for Personal Information) No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Betty Huerta, # 2 Proposed Order to Show Cause) (Attorney Andrew Pribe added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 65 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?