Bucceri et al v. Cumberland Farms, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-13955
District Judge Indira Talwani, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 4, 2020 at 8:18 AM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dianne Bucceri, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burr & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loren B. Donnell +1 813 253 2010 +81325483 813 325 4839 ldonnell@burrandsmithlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Jones Smith +1 813 253 2010 +1 813 253 0695 ssmith@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fair Work, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen S. Churchill +1 617 607 3260 steve@fairworklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 607 3260 hillary@fairworklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel J. Smit +1 617 603 1672 rachel@fairworklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamra Carsten Givens +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 tgivens@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Palitz +1 914 934 9200 +1 914 934 9220 mpalitz@shavitzlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg I. Shavitz +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 gshavitz@shavitzlaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/07/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Hilary Stern +1 561 447 8888 +1 516 447 8831 sstern@shavitzlaw.com
No Logo Elinor Fronheiser, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burr & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loren B. Donnell +1 813 253 2010 +81325483 813 325 4839 ldonnell@burrandsmithlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Jones Smith +1 813 253 2010 +1 813 253 0695 ssmith@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fair Work, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen S. Churchill +1 617 607 3260 steve@fairworklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 607 3260 hillary@fairworklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel J. Smit +1 617 603 1672 rachel@fairworklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamra Carsten Givens +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 tgivens@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Palitz +1 914 934 9200 +1 914 934 9220 mpalitz@shavitzlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg I. Shavitz +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 gshavitz@shavitzlaw.com
No Logo Janet Charak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burr & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loren B. Donnell +1 813 253 2010 +81325483 813 325 4839 ldonnell@burrandsmithlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Jones Smith +1 813 253 2010 +1 813 253 0695 ssmith@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fair Work, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen S. Churchill +1 617 607 3260 steve@fairworklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 607 3260 hillary@fairworklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel J. Smit +1 617 603 1672 rachel@fairworklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamra Carsten Givens +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 tgivens@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Palitz +1 914 934 9200 +1 914 934 9220 mpalitz@shavitzlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg I. Shavitz +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 gshavitz@shavitzlaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/07/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Hilary Stern +1 561 447 8888 +1 516 447 8831 sstern@shavitzlaw.com
No Logo Jill Harrower, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burr & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loren B. Donnell +1 813 253 2010 +81325483 813 325 4839 ldonnell@burrandsmithlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Jones Smith +1 813 253 2010 +1 813 253 0695 ssmith@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fair Work, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen S. Churchill +1 617 607 3260 steve@fairworklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 607 3260 hillary@fairworklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel J. Smit +1 617 603 1672 rachel@fairworklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamra Carsten Givens +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 tgivens@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Palitz +1 914 934 9200 +1 914 934 9220 mpalitz@shavitzlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg I. Shavitz +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 gshavitz@shavitzlaw.com
No Logo Lisa Sanders, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burr & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loren B. Donnell +1 813 253 2010 +81325483 813 325 4839 ldonnell@burrandsmithlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Jones Smith +1 813 253 2010 +1 813 253 0695 ssmith@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fair Work, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen S. Churchill +1 617 607 3260 steve@fairworklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 607 3260 hillary@fairworklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel J. Smit +1 617 603 1672 rachel@fairworklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamra Carsten Givens +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 tgivens@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Palitz +1 914 934 9200 +1 914 934 9220 mpalitz@shavitzlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg I. Shavitz +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 gshavitz@shavitzlaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/07/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Hilary Stern +1 561 447 8888 +1 516 447 8831 sstern@shavitzlaw.com
No Logo Peter Stafford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burr & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loren B. Donnell +1 813 253 2010 +81325483 813 325 4839 ldonnell@burrandsmithlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Jones Smith +1 813 253 2010 +1 813 253 0695 ssmith@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fair Work, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen S. Churchill +1 617 607 3260 steve@fairworklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 607 3260 hillary@fairworklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel J. Smit +1 617 603 1672 rachel@fairworklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamra Carsten Givens +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 tgivens@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Palitz +1 914 934 9200 +1 914 934 9220 mpalitz@shavitzlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg I. Shavitz +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 gshavitz@shavitzlaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/07/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Hilary Stern +1 561 447 8888 +1 516 447 8831 sstern@shavitzlaw.com
No Logo Robert C. Herrick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burr & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loren B. Donnell +1 813 253 2010 +81325483 813 325 4839 ldonnell@burrandsmithlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Jones Smith +1 813 253 2010 +1 813 253 0695 ssmith@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fair Work, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen S. Churchill +1 617 607 3260 steve@fairworklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 607 3260 hillary@fairworklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel J. Smit +1 617 603 1672 rachel@fairworklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamra Carsten Givens +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 tgivens@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Palitz +1 914 934 9200 +1 914 934 9220 mpalitz@shavitzlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg I. Shavitz +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 gshavitz@shavitzlaw.com
No Logo Vincent Price, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burr & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loren B. Donnell +1 813 253 2010 +81325483 813 325 4839 ldonnell@burrandsmithlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Jones Smith +1 813 253 2010 +1 813 253 0695 ssmith@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fair Work, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen S. Churchill +1 617 607 3260 steve@fairworklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Schwab +1 617 607 3260 hillary@fairworklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel J. Smit +1 617 603 1672 rachel@fairworklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamra Carsten Givens +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 tgivens@burrandsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Palitz +1 914 934 9200 +1 914 934 9220 mpalitz@shavitzlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg I. Shavitz +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 gshavitz@shavitzlaw.com
v.
No Logo Cumberland Farms, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Schauer Lieberman +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 Jessica.s.lieberman@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Alfred +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 ralfred@seyfarth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Molly A. Clayton +1 617 946 4833 mmooney@seyfarth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Fisher +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 rfisher@seyfarth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Hickey Silveira +1 617 946 4808 asilveira@seyfarth.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 206
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (158) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Procedural Order re pretrial/trial
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 155 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 90 MOTION to Strike 81 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue, 83 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue by Cumberland Farms, Inc.(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STATUS REPORT by Cumberland Farms, Inc.. (Silveira, Alison) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs by Dianne Bucceri. (Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 149 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production Nos. 4 and 17, and Memorandum in Support Thereof, 150 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production No. 29 and Memorandum in Support Thereof, 151 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents for Relevant ESI and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Counsel who filed the document are requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by August 15, 2017. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents for Relevant ESI and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Dfdts Amended RFP Answers, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Palitz 022416 ltr re ESI conferral, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Palitz 041417 email, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Palitz 042417 ltr re. ESI conferral, # 5 Exhibit 5 - D Clark 082714 email re SM job description, # 6 Exhibit 6 - D Clark 080813 email re Job Analysis for SM, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Bellrose Depo Excerpts, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Mooney 032317 ltr re ESI, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Mirriam Depo Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Sousa Depo Excerpts)(Donnell, Loren) (Attachment 8 replaced on 8/11/2017 due to filing error) (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production No. 29 and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Dfdts Amended RFP Response, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Merriam Depo Excerpts)(Donnell, Loren) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production Nos. 4 and 17, and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Dfdts Amended RFP Responses, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Beissner Depo Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Email)(Donnell, Loren) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/11/2017 due to filing error) (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders.(Donnell, Loren) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 146 Motion to Continue. Status Conference set for 8/7/17 IS RESET for 8/14/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference set for August 7, 2017 to August 14, 2017 or later by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Silveira, Alison) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 144 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 3, 2017 to Complete Discovery filed by Dianne Bucceri. (Status Conference set for July 12, 2017 RESET for 8/7/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Discovery to be completed by 8/3/2017)(MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 3, 2017 to Complete Discovery by Dianne Bucceri.(Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Susan Stern terminated (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders.(Stern, Susan) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE by Dianne Bucceri of Withdrawal of Motion to Modify Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action (Dkt. 126) (Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Transcript of Status Conference held on May 4, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 6/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 5/4/2017. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Discovery to be completed by 7/3/2017). Status Conference set for 7/12/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.) (Attorneys present: Palitz, Givens, Smit, Mooney, Fisher) (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Status Conference set for 5/4/2017 03:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. PLEASE NOTE CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Transcript of Hearing on Discovery Matter held on April 21, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 5/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Transcript of Motion Hearing held on April 27, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 5/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 131 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Loren B. Donnell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Loren B. Donnell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6604765 by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Loren B. Donnell, Esq.)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Motion Hearing held on 4/27/2017 re 126 MOTION to Quash /Modify the Deposition Subpoena to Change Deposition Location to Islip, New York filed by Dianne Bucceri. Case called. Court hears argument from counsel. Court states the motion is improper and should be filed in New York, unless counsel all agree to keep it in this court; parties agree. Parties state the deposition set for May 1, 2017, will be reset in a week so parties can confer. If issue is not resolved, counsel shall contact the court. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Palitz, Givens, Fisher) (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 126 MOTION to Quash /Modify the Deposition Subpoena to Change Deposition Location to Islip, New York : Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel appearing telephonically are instructed to call 888-808-6929 and enter code 8523158# five minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Opposition re 126 MOTION to Quash /Modify the Deposition Subpoena to Change Deposition Location to Islip, New York filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join, # 2 Exhibit B - Discovery Selections, # 3 Exhibit C - Emails re Marquette, # 4 Exhibit D - Marquette Resume, # 5 Exhibit E - Map to Huntington Station, # 6 Exhibit F - Email re Mastic Beach, # 7 Exhibit G - Map to Mastic Beach, # 8 Exhibit H - Marquette RFP Responses)(Fisher, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2017. Case called. Discovery issue is addressed. Parties to alert clerk if additional conference needed. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Palitz, Givens, Smit, Mooney, Fisher) (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION to Quash /Modify the Deposition Subpoena to Change Deposition Location to Islip, New York by Dianne Bucceri. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C)(Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 4/21/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel appearing telephonically are instructed to call 888-808-6929 and enter code 8523158# five minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Status Conference set for 4/25/17 is RESET for 5/4/2017 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel J. Smit on behalf of Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Elinor Fronheiser, Jill Harrower, Robert C. Herrick, Vincent Price, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford (Smit, Rachel) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 121 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for opt-in Plaintiffs Jennie Senac and Anthony Marquette to respond to Defendant's discovery. The deadline is extended to March 30, 2017. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to March 30, 2017 to for opt-in Plaintiffs Jennie Senac and Anthony Marquette to respond to Defendant's discovery Unopposed by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders.(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 119 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 23, 2017 to Complete Discovery (Responding to Previously Served Requests). (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 23, 2017 to Complete Discovery (Responding to Previously Served Requests) by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Silveira, Alison) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Transcript of Status Conference held on February 14, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 3/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiffs Motion for Brief Stay of Discovery and for Protective Order 66 and Defendants Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Lift Stay of Discovery 100 . The stay is lifted as to claims of Phase I Plaintiffs and defenses to such claims, and discovery deadlines for such claims and defenses are extended as set forth in the Amended Scheduling Order 115 . The stay remains in place as to claims of the remaining Plaintiffs and the defenses to such claims pending further court order lifting stay and setting further discovery deadlines. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SEE ATTACHED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/25/2017 02:30 PM before Judge Indira Talwani. Phase I Discovery to be completed by 5/15/2017. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 2/14/2017. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Orders to follow. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Churchill, Givens, Silveira, Fisher) (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            BRIEF by Cumberland Farms, Inc. Memorandum Regarding Defendant's Case on Liability. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Mooney, Molly) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            BRIEF by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders Regarding Proposal to Efficiently Resolve Liability. (Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 2/14/2017 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Transcript of Status Conference held on January 26, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 2/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 1/26/2017. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. By February 10, 2017, counsel are to submit papers regarding how to resolve the liability issue in an effective way. Discovery is stayed; deadlines to be extended. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Churchill, Givens, Silveira, Fisher) (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 100 MOTION for Discovery to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Lift Stay, 102 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 103 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 106 Letter/request (non-motion). Counsel who filed the document are requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by January 30, 2017. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Cumberland Farms regarding scope of discovery . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed written discovery to opt in plaintiffs, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Alison Silveira, with exhibits)(Silveira, Alison) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen S. Churchill on behalf of Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Elinor Fronheiser, Jill Harrower, Robert C. Herrick, Vincent Price, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford (Churchill, Stephen) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Dianne Bucceri re 65 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue of Withdrawal of Consent to Join of Ellen Hicks (Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 100 MOTION for Discovery to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Lift Stay filed by Dianne Bucceri. (Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 100 MOTION for Discovery to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Lift Stay filed by Dianne Bucceri. (Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re 100 MOTION for Discovery to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Lift Stay filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Lift Stay of Discovery no later than January 24, 2017(MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Discovery to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Lift Stay by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Silveira, Alison) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 1/26/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Joint Letter/request (non-motion) from All Parties For A Status Conference. (Silveira, Alison) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Hickey Silveira on behalf of Cumberland Farms, Inc. (Silveira, Alison) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ALLOWING 95 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. See Attached Order (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order [Stipulated] by Cumberland Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information)(Mooney, Molly) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 90 MOTION to Strike 81 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue, 83 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue filed by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 89 MOTION to Strike 81 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Unnoposed) (Dkt. No. 81-1, Ex. 1). (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Dianne Bucceri. (Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re: 90 MOTION to Strike 81 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue, 83 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc.. Removed as an exhibit and docketed as a separate entry. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike 81 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue, 83 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue by Cumberland Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: # 2 Affidavit of Robert A. Fisher, # 3 Exhibit A to Fisher Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit B to Fisher Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit C to Fisher Affidavit, # 6 Exhibit D to Fisher Affidavit)(Mooney, Molly) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike 81 Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Unnoposed) (Dkt. No. 81-1, Ex. 1) by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Mooney, Molly) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 87 Motion for Extension of Time to November 21, 2016 to Comply with Court's September 29, 2016 Order. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 21, 2016 to Comply with Court's September 29, 2016 Order by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Clayton, Molly) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Hearing on Motions held on September 20, 2016, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 10/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Judge Indira Talwani: SEE attached ORDER entered re 66 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion For Brief Stay of Discovery and for Protective Order, and Memorandum in Support Thereof. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - R Vadehra CTJ)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2016 re 66 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion For Brief Stay of Discovery and for Protective Order, and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Lisa Sanders, Janet Charak, Dianne Bucceri. Case called. Court hears argument from counsel. Motion taken under advisement; stay remains in effect. Status report due 11/2/16. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Schwab, Fisher) (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJs Consent to Join Form as to Mark Anthony Turner has been stricken from the record per Order #93 )(Givens, Tamra) (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 09/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Lyons C CTJ)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJs)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 66 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion For Brief Stay of Discovery and for Protective Order, and Memorandum in Support Thereof : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani.(MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 66 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion For Brief Stay of Discovery and for Protective Order, and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert A. Fisher, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert A. Fisher, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Robert A. Fisher, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Robert A. Fisher, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Robert A. Fisher, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Robert A. Fisher, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Robert A. Fisher, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Robert A. Fisher, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Robert A. Fisher, # 10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Robert A. Fisher, # 11 Affidavit of David Merriam, # 12 Affidavit of Stephen G. Bronars, PhD)(Fisher, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join Forms)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJs)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to October 11, 2016 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Brief Stay of Discovery and for Protective Order by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Fisher, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJs)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Supplemental Authorities re 66 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion For Brief Stay of Discovery and for Protective Order, and Memorandum in Support Thereof Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Exemplar Copy of Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING IN PART 66 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion For Brief Stay of Discovery and for Protective Order, and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Discovery is stayed pending resolution of plaintiffs' motion for a protective order. Plaintiffs shall supplement their motion for a protective order with an exemplar copy of the 5 interrogatories and 34 requests for production of documents served by Defendant. Defendant's opposition to the motion for a protective order shall be filed by September 8, 2016. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered 50 MOTION for Clarification re: 41 Order Regarding 216(b) Notice is ALLOWED as follows: Order Regarding 216(b) Notice is clarified as follows: Class members' inquiries which the claims administrator is unable to address shall be responded to by the claims administrator with the following response: "The notice that was provided to you (further copy enclosed/attached) includes all of the legal information the administrator can provide to you. You may direct further inquiry to Plaintiffs' counsel at [add contact information]. You may also request that the Administrator forward your inquiry to Plaintiffs' counsel for a response." (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion For Brief Stay of Discovery and for Protective Order, and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJ)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJ)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJs)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJs)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Craig W CTJ)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - C Foley CTJ)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - D Bushek CTJ)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJs 081216)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJs)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJs)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 54 Opposition to Motion of Robert A. Fisher in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification of Order Regarding 216(b) Notice by Cumberland Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fisher, Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 50 MOTION for Clarification re 41 Order Regarding 216(b) Notice filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc.. (Fisher, Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJs)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE as to 50 MOTION for Clarification re 41 Order Regarding 216(b) Notice. Response is due by 7/29/2016. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Clarification re 41 Order Regarding 216(b) Notice by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CTJ Myers, Marquette)(Givens, Tamra) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/21/2016) (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Hogan L CTJ)(Givens, Tamra) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/21/2016) (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Fisher on behalf of Cumberland Farms, Inc. (Fisher, Robert) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Molly A. Clayton on behalf of Cumberland Farms, Inc. (Clayton, Molly) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jessica Schauer Lieberman (Lieberman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 42 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand) by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Lieberman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand against Cumberland Farms, Inc., filed by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders.(Smith, Sam) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Indira Talwani: Order entered regarding 216(b) NOTICE 40 Stipulation, filed by Elinor Fronheiser, Peter Stafford, Vincent Price, Jill Harrower, Lisa Sanders, Janet Charak, Robert C. Herrick, Dianne Bucceri (adminn, ) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed} Order Regarding 216(b) Notice by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Elinor Fronheiser, Jill Harrower, Robert C. Herrick, Vincent Price, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - Consent to Join form, # 3 Exhibit C - Postcard)(Smith, Sam) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference SET for 3/20/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/30/2016. Discovery to be completed by 3/15/2017. See Attached Order. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford Regarding 29 U.S.C. s. 216(b) Notice Standard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by Cumberland Farms, Inc. REGARDING § 216(b) NOTICE STANDARD. (Alfred, Richard) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's ANSWER to 30 Amended Complaint Collective and Class Action Complaint, and Jury Demand by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Lieberman, Jessica) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 2/24/2016. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Parties to jointly report to clerk any request for ADR or Consent to Magistrate. Parties to submit briefs less than 5 pages each in regard to notices to potential plaintiffs. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Schwab, Lieberman, Alfred) (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Palitz, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Cumberland Farms, Inc.. (Lieberman, Jessica) (Main Document 32 replaced on 2/23/2016 with hand signed version) (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cumberland Farms, Inc., filed by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 02/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Plaintiff Peter Stafford. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Plaintiff Lisa Sanders. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Plaintiff Janet Charak. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Plaintiff Dianne Bucceri. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, Cumberland Farms, Inc. answer due 2/17/2016. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 17, 2016 to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Lieberman, Jessica) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Alfred on behalf of Cumberland Farms, Inc. (Alfred, Richard) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CTJs of Herrick, Harrower, Price, Fronheiser)(Givens, Tamra) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2016 02:40 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. SEE attached Notice. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Indira Talwani added. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Lima, Christine) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, Cumberland Farms, Inc. answer due 2/3/2016. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to February 3, 2016 to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Lieberman, Jessica) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael J. Palitz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Susan H. Stern. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gregg I. Shavitz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tamra Givens. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sam J. Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Palitz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5901469 by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Michael Palitz, Esq.)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Susan H. Stern Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5901460 by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Susan H. Stern, Esq.)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Gregg I. Shavitz re 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gregg I. Shavitz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5901451 by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gregg I. Shavitz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5901451 by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford.(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tamra Givens Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5901447 by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Tamra Givens, Esq.)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sam J. Smith Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5901439 by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Sam J. Smith, Esq.)(Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Cumberland Farms, Inc. served on 12/14/2015, answer due 1/4/2016. (Schwab, Hillary) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Cumberland Farms, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Cumberland Farms, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5862861 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Dianne Bucceri, Janet Charak, Lisa Sanders, Peter Stafford. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Form)(Schwab, Hillary) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/25/2015) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/25/2015) (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?