UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KNOX, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01604
District Judge Tanya S. Chutkan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 16, 2017 at 12:38 AM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Olga L. Tobin +1 202 737 4700 +1 202 514 6866 olga.l.tobin@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo BARBARA H. KNOX, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM J. KNOX, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to BARBARA H. KNOX, WILLIAM J. KNOX. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 17-740. (sth) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT against BARBARA H. KNOX, WILLIAM J. KNOX (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Related Case Form)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 16 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?