Schwartz v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 17-2212

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 7:56 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Bruce Schwartz, FILED. Service date 09/07/2017 by CM/ECF.[2118665] [17-2212] [Entered: 09/07/2017 09:42 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NEW CASE 17-2309, on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, N.A., FILED.[2088564] [17-2212] [Entered: 07/28/2017 11:30 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2088514] [17-2309] [Entered: 07/28/2017 11:07 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 02/09/2016, RECEIVED.[2088513] [17-2309] [Entered: 07/28/2017 11:06 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant HSBC Bank USA, N.A., district court receipt # 0208-13945210, FILED.[2088509] [17-2309] [Entered: 07/28/2017 11:05 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant HSBC Bank USA, N.A., FILED. [2088505] [17-2309] [Entered: 07/28/2017 11:02 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              FORM D, on behalf of Appellant HSBC Bank USA, N.A. in 17-2309, FILED. Service date 08/09/2017 by CM/ECF.[2096783] [17-2212, 17-2309] [Entered: 08/09/2017 12:30 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                FORM C, on behalf of Appellant HSBC Bank USA, N.A. in 17-2309, FILED. Service date 08/09/2017 by CM/ECF.[2096780] [17-2212, 17-2309]--[Edited 08/10/2017 by TT] [Entered: 08/09/2017 12:28 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Bruce Schwartz in 17-2212, informing Court of proposed due date 10/30/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 08/02/2017 by CM/ECF.[2092371] [17-2212, 17-2309] [Entered: 08/02/2017 08:55 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    FORM C, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Bruce Schwartz in 17-2212, FILED. Service date 07/31/2017 by CM/ECF.[2090464] [17-2212, 17-2309] [Entered: 07/31/2017 07:12 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2081791] [17-2212] [Entered: 07/19/2017 10:44 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        FORM D, on behalf of Appellant - Cross-Appellee Bruce Schwartz in 17-2212, FILED. Service date 07/31/2017 by CM/ECF.[2090398] [17-2212, 17-2309] [Entered: 07/31/2017 05:02 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/19/2017, RECEIVED.[2081786] [17-2212] [Entered: 07/19/2017 10:43 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant HSBC Bank USA, N.A. in 17-2212, Appellant HSBC Bank USA, N.A. in 17-2309, FILED. Service date 07/31/2017 by CM/ECF. [2089838] [17-2212, 17-2309] [Entered: 07/31/2017 12:17 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/11/2017, RECEIVED.[2081784] [17-2212] [Entered: 07/19/2017 10:42 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant HSBC Bank USA, N.A. in 17-2212, Appellant HSBC Bank USA, N.A. in 17-2309, FILED. Service date 07/31/2017 by CM/ECF.[2089831] [17-2212, 17-2309] [Entered: 07/31/2017 12:13 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 01/09/2017, RECEIVED.[2081783] [17-2212] [Entered: 07/19/2017 10:40 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CAPTION, to reflect lead case, AMENDED.[2088597] [17-2309] [Entered: 07/28/2017 11:39 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CAPTION, cross appeal added, AMENDED.[2088582] [17-2212] [Entered: 07/28/2017 11:34 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Schwartz, FILED. [2081764] [17-2212] [Entered: 07/19/2017 10:35 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?