PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01669
District Judge Christopher R. Cooper, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 23, 2019 at 2:20 AM EDT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Public Citizen, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen Litigation Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adina Rosenbaum +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 arosenbaum@citizen.org
Space Adina Rosenbaum +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 arosenbaum@citizen.org
v.
No Logo UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Straus Harris +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 julie.strausharris@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
            Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Elizabeth)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 14 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC..(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Brad P. Rosenberg on behalf of All Defendants (Rosenberg, Brad) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Memorandum in opposition to re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Amended) filed by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Declaration of Robert P. Buster, # 3 Declaration (Amended) of William Willson, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE re 8 Memorandum in Opposition, (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (md) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (md) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Declaration of Robert P. Buster, # 3 Declaration of William Willson, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Rule 65.1 Certificate, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of All Defendants (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5078404) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Rule 7.1 Certificate, # 3 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 4 Summons US Attorney Summons, # 5 Summons Secret Service Summons, # 6 Designation of Related Case)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 56 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?