Simonca v. Mukasey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:08-cv-01453
District Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 22, 2017 at 11:16 PM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vasile Simonca, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jagdip Singh Sekhon +1 510 893 0697 +1 510 893 3712 jssekhon@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Carol Webster, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Audrey Benison Hemesath +1 916 554 2729 +1 916 554 2886 audrey.hemesath@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie S. Keiper +1 202 532 4112 melanie.keiper@usdoj.gov
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleeza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Audrey Benison Hemesath +1 916 554 2729 +1 916 554 2886 audrey.hemesath@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melanie S. Keiper +1 202 532 4112 melanie.keiper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Audrey Benison Hemesath +1 916 554 2729 +1 916 554 2886 audrey.hemesath@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melanie S. Keiper +1 202 532 4112 melanie.keiper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Audrey Benison Hemesath +1 916 554 2729 +1 916 554 2886 audrey.hemesath@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melanie S. Keiper +1 202 532 4112 melanie.keiper@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 540 - Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff entered pursuant to Order entered on *12/15/2008* and signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 12/15/2008. (Reader, L) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 12/15/2008 GRANTING 16 Defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's first amended complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this file. (Reader, L) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER by CRD M. Krueger for Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 12/8/08: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 16 is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. The hearing set for December 12, 2008 is VACATED. The Court will issue a written order. (TEXT ONLY) (Krueger, M) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY to 23 Opposition by Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Condoleeza Rice, Carol Webster. (Keiper, Melanie) Modified on 12/10/2008 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 12/05/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          OPPOSITION by Vasile Simonca to 16 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jagdip Sekhon in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Sekhon, Jagdip) (Entered: 11/28/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 11/25/08 DENYING 15 Motion Disqualify Counsel. (Donati, J) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MINUTE ORDER by CRD M. Krueger for Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 11/7/08: Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Counsel 15 is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument, and the hearing date of 11/14/08 is VACATED. The Court will issue a written order. (TEXT ONLY) (Krueger, M) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Defendants' REPLY in SUPPORT of 15 MOTION Disqualify Counsel. (Hemesath, Audrey) Modified on 11/7/2008 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  OPPOSITION by Vasile Simonca to 15 MOTION Disqualify Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Sekhon, Jagdip) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER by CRD M. Krueger for Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 10/17/08: In light of Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 15 , the Court CONTINUES the Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 16 to 12/12/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. Briefing for the Motion to Dismiss shall comply with the new hearing date. (TEXT ONLY). (Krueger, M) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      MOTION to DISMISS by Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Condoleeza Rice, Carol Webster. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Administrative Closure)(Keiper, Melanie) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        MOTION Disqualify Counsel by Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Condoleeza Rice, Carol Webster. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. (Hemesath, Audrey) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Order Requiring a Joint Status Report issued pursuant to 13 Order. (Benson, A) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 09/02/08 RELATING cases 2:06-cr-0058 FCD and 2:08-cv-1453 MCE GGH and ORDERING that 2:08-cv-1453 MCE GGH is REASSIGNED to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set are VACATED. The caption shall be shown as 2:08-cv-1453 FCD GGH; Clerk to issue an Order Requiring a Joint Status Report for the undersigned; pursuant to 12 Stipulation, the time for the government to file a dispositive pleading or answer the complaint is EXTENDED to 09/26/08 (cc: FCD, MCE). (Benson, A) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Condoleeza Rice, Carol Webster. (Hemesath, Audrey) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Melanie S. Keiper, GOVT on behalf of Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Condoleeza Rice, Carol Webster. Attorney Keiper, Melanie S. added. (Keiper, Melanie) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Audrey Benison Hemesath on behalf of Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Condoleeza Rice, Carol Webster. Attorney Hemesath, Audrey Benison added. (Hemesath, Audrey) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Vasile Simonca. Michael B. Mukasey served on 6/30/2008, answer due 7/21/2008. (Sekhon, Jagdip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: # 1 Corrected Image) (Marciel, M). Modified on 7/7/2008 (Marciel, M). (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Vasile Simonca. Michael Chertoff served on 6/30/2008, answer due 7/21/2008. (Sekhon, Jagdip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: # 1 Corrected Image) (Marciel, M). Modified on 7/7/2008 (Marciel, M). (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:06-cr-00058 by Vasile Simonca. (Sekhon, Jagdip) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by Vasile Simonca.(Sekhon, Jagdip) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms, # 2 VDRP Forms) (Carlos, K) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Condoleeza Rice, Carol Webster* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jagdip Sekhon* *1440 Broadway Street* *Suite 311* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Carlos, K) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET by plaintiff Vasile Simonca (Marciel, M) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  COMPLAINT against all defendants by Vasile Simonca.(Sekhon, Jagdip) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?