BIER v. ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-03711
District Judge Timothy J. Savage, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 8, 2021 at 12:46 PM EDT (4.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo BRANDON BIER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 ROBERT A. HOFFMAN +1 973 297 1484 +1 215 963 0838 rhoffman@barrack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Kelly Ernst Bielli & Wallen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RYAN M. ERNST +1 302 778 4000 +1 302 295 2873 rernst@oeblegal.com
v.
No Logo ALAN G LEVIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo ARTHUR J. HIGGINS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo BLAINE T DAVIS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo DANIEL A RUDIO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo DAVID P HOLVECK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Ellis Brandt +1 212 906 1278 +1 212 751 4864 james.brandt@lw.com
Space Thomas James Giblin +1 212 906 1665 +1 212 751 4864 thomas.giblin@lw.com
Space Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
Space Miles Norman Ruthberg +1 212 906 1688 +1 212 751 4864 miles.ruthberg@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. +1 215 963 4806 +1 215 963 5001 gordon.cooney@morganlewis.com
Space LAURA HUGHES MCNALLY +1 215 963 5257 lmcnally@morganlewis.com
No Logo IVAN GERGEL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo JILL D. SMITH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo JOHN J. DELUCCA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo JULIE H MCHUGH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 James Ellis Brandt +1 212 906 1278 +1 212 751 4864 james.brandt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Thomas James Giblin +1 212 906 1665 +1 212 751 4864 thomas.giblin@lw.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Miles Norman Ruthberg +1 212 906 1688 +1 212 751 4864 miles.ruthberg@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. +1 215 963 4806 +1 215 963 5001 gordon.cooney@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 LAURA HUGHES MCNALLY +1 215 963 5257 lmcnally@morganlewis.com
No Logo MATTHEW DAVIS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 James Ellis Brandt +1 212 906 1278 +1 212 751 4864 james.brandt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Thomas James Giblin +1 212 906 1665 +1 212 751 4864 thomas.giblin@lw.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Miles Norman Ruthberg +1 212 906 1688 +1 212 751 4864 miles.ruthberg@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. +1 215 963 4806 +1 215 963 5001 gordon.cooney@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 LAURA HUGHES MCNALLY +1 215 963 5257 lmcnally@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Paul J. Cummings +1 317 885 0041 +1 317 885 0506 Paul.Cummings@HHCFirm.com
No Logo MATTHEW W DAVIS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo MICHAEL HYATT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo NANCY J HUTSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo PAUL V. CAMPANELLI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo RAJIV KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo ROGER H. KIMMEL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo SHANE M. COOKE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo SUKETU P. UPADHYAY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo SUSAN HALL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
Space Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
Space Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
Space Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Amy Fallow +1 212 854 9600 +1 212 854 7997 Katie.Fallow@knightcolumbia.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Ellis Brandt +1 212 906 1278 +1 212 751 4864 james.brandt@lw.com
Space Thomas James Giblin +1 212 906 1665 +1 212 751 4864 thomas.giblin@lw.com
Space Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
Space Miles Norman Ruthberg +1 212 906 1688 +1 212 751 4864 miles.ruthberg@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. +1 215 963 4806 +1 215 963 5001 gordon.cooney@morganlewis.com
Space LAURA HUGHES MCNALLY +1 215 963 5257 lmcnally@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seale, Marsal & Seale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Edgar Tompkins, IV +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 ctompkins@shulaw.com
No Logo TERRANCE J. COUGHLIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 James Ellis Brandt +1 212 906 1278 +1 212 751 4864 james.brandt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Thomas James Giblin +1 212 906 1665 +1 212 751 4864 thomas.giblin@lw.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Miles Norman Ruthberg +1 212 906 1688 +1 212 751 4864 miles.ruthberg@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. +1 215 963 4806 +1 215 963 5001 gordon.cooney@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 LAURA HUGHES MCNALLY +1 215 963 5257 lmcnally@morganlewis.com
No Logo WILLIAM F. SPENGLER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo WILLIAM P. MONTAGUE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Jeff G. Hammel +1 212 906 1260 +1 212 751 4864 jeff.hammel@lw.com
No Logo BOILERMAKER-BLACKSMITH NATIONAL PENSION TRUST, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARY L. AZORSKY +1 267 479 5702 +1 267 207 3401 gazorsky@cohenmilstein.com
No Logo JOHN REAM, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , TERMINATED: 10/31/2017, TERMINATED: 10/31/2017 Jacob Alexander Goldberg +1 215 600 2817 jgoldberg@rosenlegal.com
No Logo MAQSOOD SHEIKH, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Kelly Ernst Bielli & Wallen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Ryan Morris Ernst +1 302 295 4905 +1 302 295 2873 rernst@oebwlegal.com
No Logo RA CONSULTING APS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Kelly Ernst Bielli & Wallen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Ryan Morris Ernst +1 302 295 4905 +1 302 295 2873 rernst@oebwlegal.com
No Logo STRATHCLYDE PENSION FUND, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 ROBERT A. HOFFMAN +1 973 297 1484 +1 215 963 0838 rhoffman@barrack.com
No Logo YONGSEOK PARK, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , TERMINATED: 10/31/2017, TERMINATED: 10/31/2017 Jacob Alexander Goldberg +1 215 600 2817 jgoldberg@rosenlegal.com
No Logo YUHAI DING, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Kelly Ernst Bielli & Wallen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Ryan Morris Ernst +1 302 295 4905 +1 302 295 2873 rernst@oebwlegal.com
No Logo SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naumon Amjed +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 namjed@ktmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 dcheck@ktmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Thomas Degnan +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 rdegnan@ktmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnston De F Whitman, Jr. +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 jwhitman@ktmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret E. Mazzeo +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 mmazzeo@ktmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle M. Newcomer +1 610 667 7706 +6 106 677 0556 mnewcomer@ktmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharan Nirmul +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 snirmul@ktmc.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Approval
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Docket Call
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/2/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/2/2019, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/2/2019, Entered: None Approval
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Settlement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Docket Call
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Report Of
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Order
                                                                                                          ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR 9/26/2018 10:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/10/18. 9/10/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 9/10/2018 (rf, ).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                            Letter by SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB re 40 Notice (Other), Ressponse to Notice of Recent Decision in In: Re Egalet Corporation Securities Litigation 17-390. (NIRMUL, SHARAN) Modified on 8/23/2018 (md).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                              NOTICE by PAUL V. CAMPANELLI, SHANE M. COOKE, BLAINE T DAVIS, MATTHEW W DAVIS, RAJIV KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, JOHN J. DELUCCA, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, IVAN GERGEL, SUSAN HALL, ARTHUR J. HIGGINS, DAVID P HOLVECK, NANCY J HUTSON, MICHAEL HYATT, ROGER H. KIMMEL, ALAN G LEVIN, JULIE H MCHUGH, WILLIAM P. MONTAGUE, DANIEL A RUDIO, JILL D. SMITH, WILLIAM F. SPENGLER, SUKETU P. UPADHYAY re 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Recent Decision in In: Re Egalet Corporation Securities Litigation 17-390 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(HAMMEL, JEFF)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PAUL V. CAMPANELLI, SHANE M. COOKE, BLAINE T DAVIS, MATTHEW W DAVIS, RAJIV KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, JOHN J. DELUCCA, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, IVAN GERGEL, SUSAN HALL, ARTHUR J. HIGGINS, DAVID P HOLVECK, NANCY J HUTSON, MICHAEL HYATT, ROGER H. KIMMEL, ALAN G LEVIN, JULIE H MCHUGH, WILLIAM P. MONTAGUE, DANIEL A RUDIO, JILL D. SMITH, WILLIAM F. SPENGLER, SUKETU P. UPADHYAY. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HAMMEL, JEFF)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/5/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Table of Misstatements, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(NIRMUL, SHARAN) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                        MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PAUL V. CAMPANELLI, SHANE M. COOKE, BLAINE T DAVIS, MATTHEW W DAVIS, RAJIV KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, JOHN J. DELUCCA, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, IVAN GERGEL, SUSAN HALL, ARTHUR J. HIGGINS, DAVID P HOLVECK, NANCY J HUTSON, MICHAEL HYATT, ROGER H. KIMMEL, ALAN G LEVIN, JULIE H MCHUGH, WILLIAM P. MONTAGUE, DANIEL A RUDIO, JILL D. SMITH, WILLIAM F. SPENGLER, SUKETU P. UPADHYAY.memorandum of law in support. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Text of Proposed Order, # 33 Certificate of Service)(HAMMEL, JEFF) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against PAUL V. CAMPANELLI, SHANE M. COOKE, TERRANCE J. COUGHLIN, BLAINE T DAVIS, MATTHEW W DAVIS, RAJIV KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, JOHN J. DELUCCA, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, IVAN GERGEL, SUSAN HALL, ARTHUR J. HIGGINS, DAVID P HOLVECK, NANCY J HUTSON, MICHAEL HYATT, ROGER H. KIMMEL, ALAN G LEVIN, JULIE H MCHUGH, WILLIAM P. MONTAGUE, DANIEL A RUDIO, JILL D. SMITH, WILLIAM F. SPENGLER, SUKETU P. UPADHYAY, filed by SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB., JURY TRIAL DEMAND, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(rf, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/6/2018) (nd, ). (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Order
                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT NO LATER THAN 2/5/18 LEAD PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AND SERVE A CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT. ALL OTHER SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/21/17. 12/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET E. MAZZEO on behalf of SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB with Certificate of Service(MAZZEO, MARGARET)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by JOHNSTON DEFOREST WHITMAN, JR on behalf of SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB with Certificate of Service(WHITMAN, JOHNSTON)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE MARIE NEWCOMER on behalf of SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB with Certificate of Service(NEWCOMER, MICHELLE)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by SHARAN NIRMUL on behalf of SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB with Certificate of Service(NIRMUL, SHARAN)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF (DOC. 10) IS DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED THAT HEARING ON THE PENDING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/17 IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/4/17. 12/4/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Main Document 30 replaced on 12/5/2017) (rf, ).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT MOTION OF SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB (DOC. 11) IS GRANTED. PURSUANT TO 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(E), SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB IS APPOINTED LEAD PLAINTIFF. KESSLER TOPAZ MELTZER & CHECK, LLP IS APPROVED AS LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE CLASS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/4/17. 12/4/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by BOILERMAKER-BLACKSMITH NATIONAL PENSION TRUST of Withdrawal of 10 Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel (AZORSKY, GARY)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT MOTION HEARING SET FOR 12/13/2017 08:45 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/27/17. 11/29/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 11 MOTION of SEB Investment Management AB For Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Counsel filed by SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB. (AMJED, NAUMON)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by YUHAI DING, RA CONSULTING APS, MAQSOOD SHEIKH of Non-Opposition to Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ERNST, RYAN)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by YONGSEOK PARK, JOHN REAM of Withdrawal of 9 MOTION for appointment as lead plaintiffs and approval of selection of counsel. (GOLDBERG, JACOB) Modified on 11/1/2017 (md).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Order Appointing Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust as Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Lead Counsel, 8 MOTION of Maqsood Sheikh, Yuhai Ding, and RA Consulting Aps for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, 9 MOTION for appointment as lead plaintiffs and approval of selection of counsel, 11 MOTION of SEB Investment Management AB For Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Counsel, 7 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Class Counsel filed by BOILERMAKER-BLACKSMITH NATIONAL PENSION TRUST. (AZORSKY, GARY)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of 7 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Class Counsel filed by STRATHCLYDE PENSION FUND, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HOFFMAN, ROBERT) Modified on 10/25/2017 (md).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MILES N. RUTHBERG IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/20/17. 10/20/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JEFF G. HAMMEL IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/20/17. 10/20/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JAMES E. BRANDT IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/20/17. 10/20/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF THOMAS J. GIBLIN (DOC. 12) IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/20/17. 10/20/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by DARREN J. CHECK on behalf of SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB with Certificate of Service(CHECK, DARREN) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS DEGNAN on behalf of SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB with Certificate of Service(DEGNAN, RYAN) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of James E. Brandt ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12401625.) filed by TERRANCE J. COUGHLIN, MATTHEW DAVIS, KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, SUSAN HALL.Certification of Counsel; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of James E. Brandt, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES MCNALLY, LAURA) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeff G. Hammel ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12401609.) filed by TERRANCE J. COUGHLIN, MATTHEW DAVIS, KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, SUSAN HALL.Certification of Counsel; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Jeff G. Hammel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES MCNALLY, LAURA) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Miles N. Ruthberg ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12401598.) filed by TERRANCE J. COUGHLIN, MATTHEW DAVIS, KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, SUSAN HALL.Certification of Counsel; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Miles N. Ruthberg, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES MCNALLY, LAURA) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas J. Giblin ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12401559.) filed by TERRANCE J. COUGHLIN, MATTHEW DAVIS, KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, SUSAN HALL.Certification of Counsel; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Thomas J. Giblin, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES MCNALLY, LAURA) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Counsel filed by SEB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT AB, Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Naumon A. Amjed, # 3 Exhibit A - Certification, # 4 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, # 5 Exhibit C - Notice of Pendency, # 6 Exhibit D - Firm Resume of Kessler Topaz, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(AMJED, NAUMON) Modified on 10/19/2017 (md). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Lead Counsel filed by BOILERMAKER-BLACKSMITH NATIONAL PENSION TRUST, Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Lometti Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A to Lometti Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Lometti Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Lometti Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Lometti Declaration, # 7 Proposed Order)(AZORSKY, GARY) Modified on 10/19/2017 (md). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Appointment as lead plaintiffs and approval of selection of counsel filed by YONGSEOK PARK, JOHN REAM, Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support of motion, # 2 Declaration of Goldberg in Support of Motion, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Goldberg Decl, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Goldberg Decl, # 5 Exhibit 3 Goldberg Decl, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Goldberg Decl, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Goldberg Decl, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(GOLDBERG, JACOB) Modified on 10/19/2017 (md) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by YUHAI DING, RA CONSULTING APS, MAQSOOD SHEIKH, Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration of Ryan Ernst, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Certificate of Service, # 9 Proposed Order)(ERNST, RYAN) Modified on 10/19/2017 (md). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Class Counsel filed by STRATHCLYDE PENSION FUND, Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Robert A. Hoffman, # 3 Exhibit A - Notice, # 4 Exhibit B - Certification with Transactions, # 5 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 6 Exhibit D - Firm Biography, # 7 Certificate of Service, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(HOFFMAN, ROBERT) Modified on 10/19/2017 (md). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Disclosure Statement Form
                                                                                                                                                                                        Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC.(HUGHES MCNALLY, LAURA) Modified on 9/26/2017 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 10/17/17 IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/21/17. 9/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/17/2017 08:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/18/17. 9/19/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA HUGHES MCNALLY on behalf of TERRANCE J. COUGHLIN, MATTHEW DAVIS, KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, SUSAN HALL with Certificate of Service(HUGHES MCNALLY, LAURA) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by J. GORDON COONEY, JR on behalf of TERRANCE J. COUGHLIN, MATTHEW DAVIS, KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, SUSAN HALL with Certificate of Service(COONEY, J.) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against TERRANCE J. COUGHLIN, MATTHEW DAVIS, KANISHKA LIYANAARCHCHIE DE SILVA, ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, SUSAN HALL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 164341.), filed by BRANDON BIER.(tj, ) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?