United States of America v. Thomas et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-02284
Magistrate Judge David D. Noce, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2019 at 5:43 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Mokodean +1 202 307 6554 gregory.l.mokodean@usdoj.gov
Space Gregory Mokodean +1 202 307 6554 gregory.l.mokodean@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Carol Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Michael R. Thomas, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT against defendant Carol Thomas, Michael R. Thomas Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Original Filing Form, # 3 Waiver of Service, # 4 Waiver of Service)(Mokodean, Gregory) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
      LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 22 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?