Ward v. Stephen Dunn & Asoc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-00216-HFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Michael Ward, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Stephen Dunn & Associates c/o Baltimore Symphony Orchestra, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge, LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Christopher Papson +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 tpapson@mckennalong.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/25/1991
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2003 Job Discrimination
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Baltimore City
Terminated 6/12/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 6/13/1991, Entered: 6/17/1991, Terminated: 6/13/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 6/12/91, granting [9-1] joint motion to Dismiss; "Dismissing" case with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, as set forth ( signed by Senior Judge Herbert F. Murray )(c/m 6/13/91 pjc)(MICROFILMED 6/17/91) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 6/13/1991, Entered: 6/17/1991, Terminated: 6/13/1991 Motion to Dismiss
    JOINT MOTION by Michael Ward, Stephen Dunn & Asoc. to Dismiss (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/12/1991, Entered: 7/8/1991 Terminated Case
      Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 5/9/1991, Entered: 5/16/1991 Remark
        Letter from Plaintiff requesting the court to move forward with these proceedings and not dismiss the case (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 5/6/1991, Entered: 5/7/1991 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 8/19/91 ; Pretrial conference for 4:00 10/24/91 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 10/18/91 ; Jury trial set for 10:00 11/25/91 ( signed by Senior Judge Herbert F. Murray )(c/m by chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 5/1/1991, Entered: 5/7/1991 Summons Returned Executed
            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Stephen Dunn & Asoc. 4/11/91 Answer due on 5/1/91 for Stephen Dunn & Asoc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 5/1/1991, Entered: 5/2/1991 Remark
              Local Rule 103.3 Statement of Defendant (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 5/1/1991, Entered: 5/2/1991 Answer
                ANSWER to Complaint by Stephen Dunn & Asoc. (Attorney Thomas C. Papson), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/4/1991, Entered: 2/4/1991 Summons Issued
                  SUMMONS(ES) (20) issued for Stephen Dunn & Asoc. (c/d to U.S.M. for service)( (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/29/1991, Entered: 2/4/1991 Description not available
                    Motion by Michael Ward to proceed in forma pauperis, affidavit and order dated 1/29/91, signed by Magistrate Daniel E. Klein Jr. granting leave. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/25/1991, Entered: 2/4/1991 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT & Exhibit A filed; (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/04/1991
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 83 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?