Bobby Dutta v. State Farm Insurance Company
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-17216

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 26, 2017 at 1:41 AM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed clerk order: The reply brief [34] submitted by Bobby S. Dutta is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10524616] (LA) [Entered: 07/27/2017 04:44 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 34 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Bobby S. Dutta. Date of service: 07/26/2017. [10522829] [16-17216] (Soumilas, John) [Entered: 07/26/2017 04:16 PM]
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Micah S. Adkins for Appellant Bobby S. Dutta. Date of service: 07/25/2017. [10519744] [16-17216] (Adkins, Micah) [Entered: 07/25/2017 08:22 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed clerk order: The answering brief [23] submitted by State Farm Insurance Company is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [28] submitted by State Farm Insurance Company. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10480909] (GV) [Entered: 06/20/2017 12:23 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 11 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?