Donas et al v. deBlasio et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-06520

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 13, 2017 at 1:44 AM DT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anonymous, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anonymous

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anonymous
No Logo Fritzner Remy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fritzner Remy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fritzner Remy
No Logo Harry Donas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harry Donas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Donas
No Logo Kevin Goyette, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Goyette

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Goyette
No Logo Matthew H Goldsmith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew H Goldsmith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew H Goldsmith
No Logo Michael Golden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Golden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Golden
No Logo Mike Cassar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mike Cassar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mike Cassar
No Logo Nicholas Giacia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nicholas Giacia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Giacia
No Logo Pierre St. Louis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierre St. Louis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pierre St. Louis
No Logo Rether Davis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rether Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rether Davis
No Logo Stacey Moriates, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stacey Moriates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacey Moriates
No Logo Susan Thomas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Susan Thomas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Thomas
No Logo Viktor Berlyavsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldsmith & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Harris Goldsmith +1 212 419 0388 mhgoldsmith@mgaplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Viktor Berlyavsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Viktor Berlyavsky
v.
No Logo 1199/seiu, United Healthcare Workers East, Defendant
No Logo Aaron Feinstein, Defendant
No Logo Alfonzo Lopez, Defendant
No Logo Algin Management Co. Llc, Defendant
No Logo Alison L Andrews, Defendant
No Logo Allure Group of New York Inc., Defendant
No Logo American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations, Defendant
No Logo American Federation of State, County and Municipal Organizations, Defendant
No Logo Angela Delillo, Defendant
No Logo Angela Licata, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Maracic, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Scotto, Defendant
No Logo Arcadis North America/USA Inc., Defendant
No Logo Aristedes Georgelis, Defendant
No Logo Berlin Rosen, Ltd, Defendant
De Blasio, Bill De Blasio, Bill, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bill deBlasio"
No Logo Bill Hyers, Defendant
No Logo Bob Aviltroni, Defendant
No Logo Brian Swarthout, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Ratner, Defendant
No Logo Carl Toth, Defendant
No Logo Carla Lowenheim, Defendant
No Logo Carter H Strickland, Defendant
No Logo Castle Oil Corp, Defendant
No Logo Caswell Holloway IV, Defendant
No Logo Cecil McMaster, Defendant
No Logo Charlene Graff, Defendant
No Logo Christopher O Ward, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Pastore, Defendant
No Logo David Lichtenstein, Defendant
No Logo David M Cohen, Defendant
No Logo David Olton, Defendant
No Logo DDG Partners LLC, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Singer, Defendant
No Logo Denise Dyce, Defendant
No Logo Diana Ritter, Defendant
No Logo Diane Hammerman, Defendant
No Logo District Council 37, Defendant
No Logo Eddie Rodriguez, Defendant
No Logo Edward Coleman, Defendant
No Logo Edward Timbers, Defendant
No Logo Elio Paradis, Defendant
No Logo Emily Lloyd, Defendant
No Logo Emma Wolfe, Defendant
No Logo Eric Eichenholtz, Defendant
No Logo Faye Jacques, Defendant
No Logo Gerould McCoy, Defendant
No Logo Gregg C Costa, Defendant
No Logo Gregory Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Henry Baranczak, Defendant
No Logo Henry Garrido, Defendant
No Logo Herbert Roth, Defendant
No Logo Howard G Lane, Defendant
No Logo James Caggiano, Defendant
No Logo James Hanratty, Defendant
No Logo James Mueller, Defendant
No Logo James Roberts, Defendant
No Logo James Tucciarelli, Defendant
Kushner, Jared C. Kushner, Jared C., Defendant
Officially listed as "Jared C Kushner"
No Logo Jed Walentas, Defendant
No Logo Jeremy Reichberg, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Volgende, Defendant
No Logo Jesse C Rose, Defendant
No Logo Joe McMillan, Defendant
No Logo Joel Landau, Defendant
No Logo Johannes W Weber, Defendant
No Logo John Catsimatidis, Defendant
No Logo John English, Defendant
No Logo John Kantor, Defendant
No Logo John Petito, Defendant
No Logo John Rousakis, Defendant
No Logo Jona Rechnitz, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Gray, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Rosen, Defendant
No Logo Jordan S Mazur, Defendant
No Logo Jorge Villacis, Defendant
No Logo Judith Enck, Defendant
No Logo Kathryn Garcia, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Moriarty, Defendant
No Logo Kushner Companies LLC, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence S Knipel, Defendant
No Logo Leonard Sibrizzi, Defendant
No Logo Maf Misbah Uddin, Defendant
No Logo Mark Levine, Defendant
No Logo Martha Osseni, Defendant
No Logo Mathilde McLean, Defendant
No Logo Mayra Bell, Defendant
No Logo Members & Associates of the Profaci/Colombo, Luciano/Genovese, and other New York City Organized Crime Families of the Italian American Mafia, Defendant
No Logo Michael Farnan, Defendant
No Logo Michael Gilsenan, Defendant
No Logo Michael McGregor, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R Bloomberg"
No Logo Naudet Joasil, Defendant
No Logo Nicholas Minunni, Defendant
No Logo Oscar Medina, Defendant
No Logo Pamela Elardo, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Jagessar, Defendant
No Logo Paul Herzfeld, Defendant
No Logo Paul Kiskorna, Defendant
No Logo Paul Rush, Defendant
No Logo Paul Smith, Defendant
No Logo Paul Vallone, Defendant
No Logo Persis Luke, Defendant
No Logo Peter F Vallone, Defendant
No Logo PETER STEIN, Defendant
No Logo Peter Vallone, Defendant
No Logo Peter Williamsen, Defendant
No Logo Pravin Patel, Defendant
No Logo Ralph Marchitelli, Defendant
No Logo Richard Mantellino, Defendant
No Logo Robert Groppe, Defendant
No Logo Robert J Peters, Defendant
No Logo Robert McHale, Defendant
No Logo Robert Ortiz, Defendant
No Logo Robin Levine, Defendant
No Logo Roy Tysvaer, Defendant
No Logo Russ Offinger, Defendant
No Logo Shay McAtamney, Defendant
No Logo Sibrizzi Fuel Oil Enterprise Inc., Defendant
No Logo SL Green Realty Group, Defendant
No Logo Slate Property Group LLC, Defendant
No Logo Steve Koller, Defendant
No Logo Steven Lawitts, Defendant
No Logo Steven Sykes, Defendant
No Logo The Blackstone Group Lp, Defendant
No Logo The Lightstone Group, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Custance, Defendant
No Logo Tina Johnstone, Defendant
No Logo Toll Brothers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Trikham Patel, Defendant
No Logo Two Trees Management Co., Llc, Defendant
No Logo Veolia North America, Defendant
No Logo Vilhelmina Guthrie, Defendant
No Logo Vincent Sapienza, Defendant
No Logo Virginia Gziki, Defendant
No Logo Virginia Smyth, Defendant
No Logo Walthene Primus, Defendant
No Logo William Kelly, Defendant
No Logo William Lewinsky, Defendant
No Logo William Yulinsky, Defendant
No Logo Ydanis Rodriguez, Defendant
No Logo Zoe Ann Campbell, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Government Officials, Companies and Persons, ADR Provider
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331ra
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (1) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a case is administratively closed, a filing party may move to reopen the case after any such deficiency is cured. Administrative Reopening due by 11/6/2017. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (laq) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF

    Statistics

    This case has been viewed 159 times.

    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
    Space
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
     
    PlainSite
    Sign Up
    Need Password Help?