POW Nevada, LLC v. Doe 1
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01213
District Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 2:09 AM EDT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo POW Nevada, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowe Graham Jones, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Lowe +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 Lowe@lowegrahamjones.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Lowe +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 Lowe@lowegrahamjones.com
v.
No Logo Doe #1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Erin R. Christison +1 503 390 2044 +1 971 216 4990 erinc@novationlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jennifer L Neeleman +1 425 212 4800 jneeleman@expresslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel A. Bushnell +1 561 835 9400
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cigel Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Rick Alan Cigel +1 424 901 8513 +1 424 901 8514 rick.cigel@cigellawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Jacksonville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Craig D. Feiser +1 904 630 1834 +1 904 630 1316 cfeiser@coj.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Manuel J Dominguez - NOT SWORN +1 561 578 6850 +1 202 408 4699 jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe #1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 1

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric J. Menhart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Eric J. Menhart

Toggle Switch Represented by Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Ansel Jay Halliburton +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 ansel@krinternetlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Karl Stephen Kronenberger +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 karl@KRInternetlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 Jeff@KRInternetlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Kelley Marie Blasa Fox +1 213 281 5280 +1 213 250 7900 kelley.fox@lewisbrisbois.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mersenne Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David Hamlin Madden +1 503 679 1671 +1 503 512 6113 ecf@mersenne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Wyoming Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jeremy A Gross +1 307 777 6946 +1 307 777 3542 jeremy.gross@wyo.gov
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John H Ridge +1 307 777 7862 +1 307 777 8920 john.ridge@wyo.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 206

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Morgan E. Pietz +1 310 424 5557 +1 310 546 5301 mepietz@pietzlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 10

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Doe 10

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Lory R Lybeck +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 4255 lory@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Charles P. LaPolla +1 212 382 0700 +1 212 382 0888 clapolla@ostrolenk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perry, Krumsiek & Jack, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Timothy M. Cornell +1 617 720 4300 tcornell@pkjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tishler & Wald, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Alexander D. Kerr, Jr. +1 312 876 3800 +1 312 876 3816 akerr@tishlerandwald.com
No Logo Doe #11, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguero Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Matthew Bryan Aguero +1 720 325 6787 maguero@aguerolawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Byrd and Byrd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Timothy Patrick Leahy +1 301 464 7448 +1 301 805 5178 tleahy@byrdandbyrd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tishler & Wald, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alexander D. Kerr, Jr. +1 312 876 3800 +1 312 876 3816 akerr@tishlerandwald.com
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CHAVEZ LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Robert H Chavez +1 206 789 1614 roberthchavez@chavezlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Theodore R. Bynum, III +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 t.r.bynum@huschblackwell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mestemaker Straub

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Karl Van Gardner +1 713 626 8900 vgardner@msandz.com
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 David Kent Mestemaker +1 713 626 8900 dkm@mestemakerstraub.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHER & ASSOCIATES PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Arnold Richer
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel A. Bushnell +1 561 835 9400
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Booth Sweet LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel G. Booth +1 617 250 8602 +1 617 250 8883 dbooth@boothsweet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Jacksonville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Craig D. Feiser +1 904 630 1834 +1 904 630 1316 cfeiser@coj.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Manuel J Dominguez - NOT SWORN +1 561 578 6850 +1 202 408 4699 jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 2

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Billy M. Sime +1 503 371 3502 +1 503 371 0429 bsime@pbswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John E Whitaker +1 206 436 8500 john@whitaker.law
No Logo Doe #3, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ali Law Practice LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Tawfiq Innas Ali +1 312 546 5081 tali@alilawpractice.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Ankur V Shah +1 312 724 7807 ashah@alilawpractice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Stephen K Perry +1 865 673 0330 +1 865 673 0440 stephenkperry@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe #3

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe #3 +1 818 292 4863

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Montpelier & Young, P.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Dale J Montpelier +1 865 673 0330 dalemontpelier@gmail.com
No Logo Doe 4, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cashman Law Firm, Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert Z. Cashman +1 713 364 3476 rzcashman@cashmanlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 4

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 4

Toggle Switch Represented by GARVEY SCHUBERT BARER (WA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 john.crosetto@gsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 302

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Edward R. Molari +1 617 942 1532 +1 815 642 8351 edward@molarilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE RUSSELL FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Erin Kathryn Russell +1 312 994 2424 +1 312 706 9766 erin@russellfirmchicago.com

Toggle Switch Represented by William R. Wohlsifer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 William R. Wohlsifer +1 850 219 8888 +1 866 829 8174 william@wohlsifer.com
No Logo Doe #5, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
No Logo Doe 6, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel Mach +1 202 637 6313 dmach@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union - CT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David J. McGuire +1 860 586 8900 dmcguire@acluct.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Americans United For Separation of Church and State

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alex J. Luchenitser +1 202 466 3234 luchenitser@au.org
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert S.H. Shapiro +1 202 466 3234 shapiro@au.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Public Representation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Sandra J. Staub +1 413 586 6024 +1 413 586 5711 sstaub@cpr-ma.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 6

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 6

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
No Logo Doe 7, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John M Kuranty +1 630 322 8548 +1 708 430 1119 jkurantylaw@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel Mach +1 202 637 6313 dmach@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union - CT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David J. McGuire +1 860 586 8900 dmcguire@acluct.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Americans United For Separation of Church and State

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alex J. Luchenitser +1 202 466 3234 luchenitser@au.org
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert S.H. Shapiro +1 202 466 3234 shapiro@au.org

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jessica L. McKie +1 503 226 8122 +1 503 295 2737 jmckie@smhllaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John Carlson Terry +1 360 213 2040 jterry@mbavancouverlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Public Representation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Sandra J. Staub +1 413 586 6024 +1 413 586 5711 sstaub@cpr-ma.org

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 304

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David N. Oskin +1 312 854 7090 david@caliberip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Swider Medeiros Haver LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 TTAB Attorney Placeholder robert@smhllaw.com
No Logo Doe #8, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguero Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Matthew Bryan Aguero +1 720 325 6787 maguero@aguerolawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaheen Guerrera & O'Leary, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Nicholas S. Guerrera +1 978 689 0800 +1 978 794 0890 nguerrera@sgolawoffice.com
No Logo Doe 9, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Judgment by Court
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Default Judgment Against Willis Stevenson signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Declaration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Default -Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for default
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER SEVERING DEFENDANTS AND DISMISSING CLAIMS. The Court rejects POW's swarm joinder theory. POW's claims against Defendants Thomas Caldwell, Carol Legaspi, and Dunlap Burell are accordingly SEVERED and DISMISSED from this case. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly serve a copy of this Order on any defendant who has not yet appeared; proofs of service shall be filed by Plaintiff by February 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff to show cause within 10 days as to why the Court should not (1) sever all defendants except the first defendant in this case; and (2) dismiss the remaining defendants for improper joinder. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 20 Motion for an extension of time to serve its Amended Complaint. POW must serve its Amended Complaint by November 22, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Extension of the Initial Scheduling Dates. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/17/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/1/2017, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 12/1/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(PM)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/20/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/27/2017, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights via U.S. Postal Service. (ST) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            DECLARATION of Daniel Arheidt filed by Plaintiff POW Nevada, LLC re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION to Expedite Discovery, filed by Plaintiff POW Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/10/2017, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC for POW Nevada, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by POW Nevada, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff POW Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiff POW Nevada, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-4975535) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party POW Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), filed by POW Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Lowe, David) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?