Venice PI, LLC v. Doe 1
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01164
District Judge Thomas S. Zilly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 11:28 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Venice PI, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 701 Fifth Ave.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Lowe +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 Lowe@lowegrahamjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowe Graham Jones, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Lowe +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 Lowe@lowegrahamjones.com
v.
No Logo Aaryn Bradley, Defendant
No Logo Adam Gundel, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Davis, Defendant
No Logo Deandre Jones, Defendant
No Logo Doe #1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel A. Bushnell +1 561 835 9400
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cigel Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Rick Alan Cigel +1 424 901 8513 +1 424 901 8514 rick.cigel@cigellawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Jacksonville, Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Craig D. Feiser +1 904 630 1834 +1 904 630 1316 cfeiser@coj.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Manuel J Dominguez - NOT SWORN +1 561 578 6850 +1 202 408 4699 jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe #1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 1

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric J. Menhart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Eric J. Menhart

Toggle Switch Represented by Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Ansel Jay Halliburton +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 ansel@krinternetlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Karl Stephen Kronenberger +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 karl@KRInternetlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 Jeff@KRInternetlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of DAVID H MADDEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David Hamlin Madden +1 503 679 1671 +1 503 512 6113 ecf@mersenne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Kelley Marie Blasa Fox +1 213 281 5280 +1 213 250 7900 kelley.fox@lewisbrisbois.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NEELEMAN LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jennifer L Neeleman +1 425 212 4800 jneeleman@expresslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Novation Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Erin R. Christison +1 503 390 2044 +1 971 216 4990 erinc@novationlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Wyoming Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jeremy A Gross +1 307 777 6946 +1 307 777 3542 jeremy.gross@wyo.gov
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John H Ridge +1 307 777 7862 +1 307 777 8920 john.ridge@wyo.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by The Pietz Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Morgan E. Pietz +1 310 424 5557 +1 310 546 5301 mepietz@pietzlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 10

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Doe 10

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Lory R Lybeck +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 4255 lory@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Charles P. LaPolla +1 212 382 0700 +1 212 382 0888 clapolla@ostrolenk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perry, Krumsiek & Jack, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Timothy M. Cornell +1 617 720 4300 tcornell@pkjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tishler & Wald, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Alexander D. Kerr, Jr. +1 312 876 3800 +1 312 876 3816 akerr@tishlerandwald.com
No Logo Doe #11, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguero Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Matthew Bryan Aguero +1 720 325 6787 maguero@aguerolawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Byrd and Byrd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Timothy Patrick Leahy +1 301 464 7448 +1 301 805 5178 tleahy@byrdandbyrd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tishler & Wald, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alexander D. Kerr, Jr. +1 312 876 3800 +1 312 876 3816 akerr@tishlerandwald.com
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CHAVEZ LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Robert H Chavez +1 206 789 1614 roberthchavez@chavezlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Theodore R. Bynum, III +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 t.r.bynum@huschblackwell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mestemaker Straub

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Karl Van Gardner +1 713 626 8900 vgardner@msandz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mestemaker Straub Zumwalt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 David Kent Mestemaker +1 713 626 8900 dkm@mestemakerstraub.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHER & ASSOCIATES PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Arnold Richer
No Logo Doe 13, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by atlawip.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Jeffrey Thomas Breloski +1 404 495 3681 +1 404 365 9532 jbreloski@atlawip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Norman Rocco Cerullo +1 516 663 6600 +1 516 663 6835 ncerullo@rmfpc.com
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Jennifer Leigh Hartmann +1 516 663 6600 +1 516 663 6743 jhartmann@rmfpc.com
No Logo Doe 14, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 14

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Doe 14

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kent L Greenberg PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent L. Greenberg +1 410 363 1020 +1 410 363 1022 kent@klgreenberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven C Vondran PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Charles Vondran +1 877 276 5084 +1 888 551 2252 law@attorneysteve.net

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean T. Carnathan +1 781 359 9002 +1 781 359 9001 scarnathan@ocmlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E Whitaker +1 206 436 8500 john@whitaker.law
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel A. Bushnell +1 561 835 9400
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Booth Sweet LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel G. Booth +1 617 250 8602 +1 617 250 8883 dbooth@boothsweet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Jacksonville, Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Craig D. Feiser +1 904 630 1834 +1 904 630 1316 cfeiser@coj.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Manuel J Dominguez - NOT SWORN +1 561 578 6850 +1 202 408 4699 jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe #2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 2

Toggle Switch Represented by Parks Bauer Sime & Winkler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Billy M. Sime +1 503 371 3502 +1 503 371 0429 bsime@pbswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John E Whitaker +1 206 436 8500 john@whitaker.law
No Logo Doe #3, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Dale J Montpelier +1 865 673 0330 dalemontpelier@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Stephen K Perry +1 865 673 0330 +1 865 673 0440 stephenkperry@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ali Law Practice LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Tawfiq Innas Ali +1 312 546 5081 tali@alilawpractice.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Ankur V Shah +1 312 724 7807 ashah@alilawpractice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 3

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 3
No Logo Doe 4, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cashman Law Firm, Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert Z. Cashman +1 713 364 3476 rzcashman@cashmanlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 4

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 4

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Schubert Barer (Anch)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John Crosetto jcrosetto@gsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scot Sikes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 William R. Wohlsifer +1 850 219 8888 +1 866 829 8174 william@wohlsifer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Molari, Edward R.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Edward R. Molari +1 617 942 1532 +1 815 642 8351 edward@molarilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE RUSSELL FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Erin Kathryn Russell +1 312 994 2424 +1 312 706 9766 erin@russellfirmchicago.com
No Logo Doe #5, Defendant
No Logo Doe 6, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David J. McGuire +1 860 586 8900 dmcguire@acluct.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel Mach +1 202 637 6313 dmach@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Americans United for Sep of Church & State (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alex J. Luchenitser +1 202 466 3234 luchenitser@au.org
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert S.H. Shapiro +1 202 466 3234 shapiro@au.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Public Representation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Sandra J. Staub +1 413 586 6024 +1 413 586 5711 sstaub@cpr-ma.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 6

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 6
No Logo Doe 7, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John M Kuranty +1 630 322 8548 +1 708 430 1119 jkurantylaw@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David J. McGuire +1 860 586 8900 dmcguire@acluct.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel Mach +1 202 637 6313 dmach@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Americans United for Sep of Church & State (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alex J. Luchenitser +1 202 466 3234 luchenitser@au.org
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert S.H. Shapiro +1 202 466 3234 shapiro@au.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Public Representation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Sandra J. Staub +1 413 586 6024 +1 413 586 5711 sstaub@cpr-ma.org

Toggle Switch Represented by MORSE BRATT ANDREWS & TERRY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John Carlson Terry +1 360 213 2040 jterry@mbavancouverlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Swider Medeiros & Haver LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jessica L. McKie +1 503 226 8122 +1 503 295 2737 jmckie@smhllaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 TTAB Attorney Placeholder robert@smhllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VRP Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David N. Oskin +1 312 854 7090 david@caliberip.com
No Logo Doe #8, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguero Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Matthew Bryan Aguero +1 720 325 6787 maguero@aguerolawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaheen Guerrera & O'Leary, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Nicholas S. Guerrera +1 978 689 0800 +1 978 794 0890 nguerrera@sgolawoffice.com
No Logo Doe 9, Defendant
No Logo Jessica Griffin, Defendant
No Logo Logan Baskett, Defendant
No Logo Matt Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Tristan Stanley, Defendant
No Logo Victor Taduran, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 46 Motion to Resume Cases; directing plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE on or before 11/16/2018, why the Court should not, in light of Cobbler, dismiss the amended complaint. Any objection by a defendant to plaintiff's response to this show cause order shall be filed by 12/7/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of unavailability
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Leave
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Response (Non-Motion)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Jessica Griffin, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Deandre Jones on 11/8/2017, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Matt Bennett on 11/15/2017, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Logan Baskett on 11/15/2017, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Anthony Davis on 11/8/2017, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - attempted upon defendant Jessica Griffin. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Aaryn Bradley on 11/14/2017, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Adam Gundel on 11/11/2017, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Victor Taduran on 11/11/2017, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Logan Baskett, Matt Bennett, Aaryn Bradley, Anthony Davis, Jessica Griffin, Adam Gundel, Deandre Jones, Victor Taduran (main document). (Attachments: # 1 Summons issued for A Gundel, # 2 Summons issued for A Bradley, # 3 Summons issued for J Griffin, # 4 Summons issued for A Davis, # 5 Summons issued for L Baskett, # 6 Summons issued for M Bennett, # 7 Summons issued for D Jones)(SWT) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Tristan Stanley by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER striking deadlines for a Rule 26(f) conference, exchange of initial disclosures, and submission of a Joint Status Report; granting plaintiff's 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve, deadline for plaintiff to effect service EXTENDED to 11/20/2017; striking deadlines for defendants to file responsive pleadings or motions; If summons has not yet been issued with respect to particular defendants, plaintiffs counsel shall provide to the Clerk, within three (3) days of the date of this Minute Order, a list of addresses for such defendants. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/23/2017, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Victor Taduran, Adam Gundel, Aaryn Bradley, Jessica Griffin, Tristan Stanley, Anthony Davis, Logan Baskett, Matt Bennett, Deandre Jones with JURY DEMAND, filed by Venice PI LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 5, Doe 7, Doe 13 and Doe 3, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 10 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant Doe 10. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/17/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/1/2017, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC. (Copy sent to Register of Copyrights via U.S. Postal Service) (ST) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          DECLARATION of Daniel Arheidt filed by Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Lowe, David) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION to Expedite Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/31/2017, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC, Corporate Parent Lost Dog Productions, LLC for Venice PI, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Venice PI, LLC (Lowe, David) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-4963018) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party Venice PI, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Venice PI, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Lowe, David) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?