724 Solutions IPO, et al v. 724 Solutions, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-05333
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 1, 2017 at 11:19 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Colbert Birnet, L.P., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
No Logo Gregory R. Hodges, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo JAMES ROBINSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Theodore Leonard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Wendy Wanderman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo 724 Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Christopher Erickson, Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gary Wolfond, Defendant
No Logo Karen Basian, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, & Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
No Logo Thomas Weisel Partners, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey A. Rosenthal +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499 jrosenthal@cgsh.com
No Logo Thomas Wolfond, Defendant
No Logo Andre Boysen, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Gregory Wolfond, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Kerry McLellen, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Joseph A. Derringer, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Leon Woody, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND JUDGMENT settling action as to 01 Civ. 5333. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 14 Amended Complaint filed by James Robinson, Gregory R. Hodges, Theodore Leonard, Wendy Wanderman.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [14-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:24 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER by Thomas Weisel, LLC to [14-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Jeffrey A. Rosenthal from the Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:45 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Gregory Wolfond by mail on 8/5/02 . . (sac) (Entered: 12/20/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Christopher Erickson by mail on 8/5/02 . . (sac) (Entered: 12/20/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Karen Basian by mail on 8/5/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/20/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Thomas Weisel, LLC by Kathleen Romeo, managing agent on 4/25/02. Answer due on 5/15/02 for Thomas Weisel, LLC. (sac) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Credit Suisse First by Tracy Del Duca, managing agent, on 4/25/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Fleet Boston, Inc. by Stephen Austin, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by Gregory R. Hodges, Theodore Leonard, Wendy Wanderman, James Robertson amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/15/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Thomas Weisel, LLC. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 1/18/02 at 5:22 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by pltf Leon Woody (01-cv-3941) on whose behalf Brodsky & Smith, LLC (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/29/2001 (Entered: 10/09/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Thomas Weisel, LLC. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/29/2001 (Entered: 10/09/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/29/2001 (Entered: 10/09/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER,... that all cases involving 724 Solutions in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-05852 and 1:01-cv-05941) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 5333. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 5333 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05333 Document No. 9. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-05852; 1:01-cv-05941] (dcap) (Entered: 10/29/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by 724 Solutions, Inc. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 8/27/01 at 5:04 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 08/29/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the time for defts Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. and BancBoston Robertson Stephens, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 60 days after (i) the assignment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 08/27/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Gregory R. Hodges in support of [4-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv5333(SAS), 01cv5852 and 01cv5941 into one action for all purposes, [4-2] motion appointing Movant to serve as lead plaintiff, [4-3] motion approving Movant's selection of counsel for the Class. (Received in Night Box on 8/13/01 at 6:45pm) [Original filed in 01cv5333(SAS) as Doc# 6 and docketed to 01cv5852 and 01cv5941.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Michael S. Egan, Esq. by Gregory R. Hodges in support of [4-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv5333(SAS), 01cv5852 and 01cv5941 into one action for all purposes, [4-2] motion appointing Movant to serve as lead plaintiff, [4-3] motion approving Movant's selection of counsel for the Class. (Received in Night Box on 8/13/01 at 6:45pm) [Original filed in 01cv5333(SAS) as Doc# 5 and docketed to 01cv5852 and 01cv5941.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Gregory R. Hodges to consolidate cases 01cv5333(SAS), 01cv5852 and 01cv5941 into one action for all purposes , appointing Movant to serve as lead plaintiff and approving Movant's selection of counsel for the Class . No return date indicated. (Received in Night Box on 8/13/01 at 6:44pm) [Original filed in 01cv5333(SAS) as Doc# 4 and docketed to 01cv5852 and 01cv5941.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Colbert Birnet, L.P. (db) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 408702. (db) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?