MRI Software LLC v. Entrata Inc.
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:17-mc-00050
District Judge Edmund A Sargus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 18, 2019 at 12:39 PM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Mri Software LLC, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Calfee Halter & Griswold, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason J. Blake +1 614 621 7789 jblake@calfee.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Georgia E Yanchar +1 216 622 8233 +1 216 241 0816 gyanchar@calfee.com
v.
No Logo Entrata, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruki Ireland & Cox P.L.L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A Miltner +1 513 632 0308 kmiltner@ficlaw.com
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Mediation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Seal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A Miltner for Respondent Entrata Inc. (Miltner, Katherine) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Petitioner MRI Software LLC. (Blake, Jason) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION to Quash ( Filing fee $ 47 paid - receipt number: 0648-6101626), filed by MRI Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit 2: Dokhanchy Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3: MRI's Objections, # 4 Exhibit 4: E-mail Chain, # 5 Exhibit 5: Letter to J. Lanham, # 6 Exhibit 6: Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 7: Carner Declaration) (Blake, Jason) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?