Vieira v. Korda et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Vermont District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00160
District Judge John M. Conroy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 8, 2018 at 2:35 PM EDT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Felipe Accioly Vieira, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barr & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell D. Barr +1 802 253 6272 +1 802 253 6055 russ@barrlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chandler W. Matson ,. +1 802 253 6272 chandler@barrlaw.com
v.
No Logo Anthony Korda, Defendant
No Logo Korda Law Firm, The, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Stipulated Discovery Letter Sent
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Consent to Direct Assignment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Felipe Accioly Vieira. (hbc) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        COMPLAINT against Anthony Korda, The Korda Law Firm filed by Felipe Accioly Vieira. Summonses and LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hbc) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?