Allianz Versicherungs-Aktiengesellschaft et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-06519
District Judge George B. Daniels, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 10, 2018 at 5:34 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allianz Global Corporate and Specialty SE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company f/k/a Allianz Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo Allianz Insurance Company of Canada, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo Allianz Re, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo Allianz Versicherungs-Aktiengesellschaft, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo Assurances Generales De France, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo Assurances Generales De France I.A.R.T., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
v.
No Logo Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2333
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (rch) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Allianz Global Corporate and Specialty SE, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company f/k/a Allianz Insurance Company, Allianz Insurance Company of Canada, Allianz Re, Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft, Allianz Versicherungs-Aktiengesellschaft, Assurances Generales De France, Assurances Generales De France I.A.R.T., Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(Latto, Douglas) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Latto, Douglas) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Re; Corporate Parent Allianz SE for Allianz Global Corporate and Specialty SE, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company f/k/a Allianz Insurance Company, Allianz Insurance Company of Canada, Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft, Allianz Versicherungs-Aktiengesellschaft, Assurances Generales De France, Assurances Generales De France I.A.R.T., Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Document filed by Allianz Global Corporate and Specialty SE, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company f/k/a Allianz Insurance Company, Allianz Insurance Company of Canada, Allianz Re, Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft, Allianz Versicherungs-Aktiengesellschaft, Assurances Generales De France, Assurances Generales De France I.A.R.T., Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(Latto, Douglas) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Allianz Global Corporate and Specialty SE, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company f/k/a Allianz Insurance Company, Allianz Insurance Company of Canada, Allianz Re, Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft, Allianz Versicherungs-Aktiengesellschaft, Assurances Generales De France, Assurances Generales De France I.A.R.T., Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Latto, Douglas) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14059691)Document filed by Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft, Assurances Generales De France I.A.R.T., Allianz Global Corporate and Specialty SE, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Assurances Generales De France, Allianz Re, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company f/k/a Allianz Insurance Company, Allianz Versicherungs-Aktiengesellschaft, Allianz Insurance Company of Canada.(Latto, Douglas) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Space Space

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 22 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?