Michelle Tatis v. Allied Interstate LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 16-4022

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 8, 2017 at 1:45 AM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012718013 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [16-1994, 16-2244, 16-4022] (TLG)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012713165 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ECF FILER: Letter dated 08/29/2017 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellee Allied Interstate LLC. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. (JCM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012707190 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney James C. Martin, Esq. for Appellee Allied Interstate LLC. Certificate of Service dated 08/22/2017. Service made by ECF. (JCM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012705065 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James C. Martin on behalf of Appellee(s) Allied Interstate, LLC. (JCM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012697184 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Kellie A. Lavery, Esq. for Appellee Allied Interstate LLC. Certificate of Service dated 08/09/2017. Service made by ECF. (KAL)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012694464 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Ari H. Marcus, Esq. for Appellant Michelle Tatis. Certificate of Service dated 08/07/2017. Service made by ECF. (AHM)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012693185 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Oral Argument Notification for Tuesday, 09/05/2017. Courtroom & Time: Maris Courtroom/2pm. Location: Philadelphia, PA. (TLG)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 4 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?