Razorfish, Inc. IPO, et al v. Razorfish, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-05427
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 7, 2017 at 12:37 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bennett Storfer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Guibard, Gaetan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Laura A. Cunningham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Michelle Kideys, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Wayne E. Taillon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Guibard, Gaetan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Carter F. Bales, Defendant
No Logo Craig M. Kanarick, Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas W. Henkin +1 212 408 2520 +1 212 259 2520 douglas.henkin@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP (NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David B. Gordon +1 917 546 7701 +1 917 546 7671 dbg@msk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Jeffrey A. Dachis, Defendant
No Logo John Wren, Defendant
No Logo Jonas S.A. Svensson, Defendant
No Logo Kjell A. Nordstrom, Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Moses Silverman +1 212 315 3082

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Emanuel Tauber +1 202 263 3324 +1 202 263 5324 ATauber@mayerbrownrowe.com
No Logo Per I.G. Bystedt, Defendant
No Logo Razorfish, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Susan Black, Defendant
No Logo Amelia E. Sarvinski, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Guibard, Gaetan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Bruce Nahorwey, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Guibard, Gaetan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Econor Investments, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gary Steven Jacobson +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4775 gsjacobson@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schaefer, Claus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Howard Barry Sirota +1 212 425 9055 +1 212 425 9055 howard.sirota@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stark & Stark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
No Logo George L. Vlahos, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Guibard, Gaetan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Judith Barclay, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gary Steven Jacobson +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4775 gsjacobson@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schaefer, Claus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Howard Barry Sirota +1 212 425 9055 +1 212 425 9055 howard.sirota@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stark & Stark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
No Logo Michael Paul Kelly, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Guibard, Gaetan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice... without costs as to defendants Per.I.G. Bystedt, Jonas S.A. Svensson and Kjell A. Nordstrom their whereabouts are unknown.. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/1/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-05427-SAS,1:01-cv-05617-SAS(jsa, ) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 26 Amended Complaint filed by Michelle Kideys, Laura A. Cunningham.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER by Deutsche Banc Alex. to [26-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Joel M. Mitnick from the Sidley, Austin, Brown & Wood, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [26-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:08 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER by Lehman Brothers Inc. to [26-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Moses Silverman from the Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by Lehman Brothers Inc. (sac) (Entered: 04/08/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Credit Suisse First by Tracy Del Duca, managing agent, on 4/25/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Lehman Brothers Inc. by Coleene Kinnen, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to BT Alex. Brown Inc. by Lars Stevens, managing agent, on 4/24/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Bancboston Robertson by Stephen Austin, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by Michelle Kideys, Laura A. Cunningham amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/15/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REVISED LIST OF CASES BY COUNSEL; purs. to Item I(A) of this Court's Order dated 8/8/01, Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP and Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to appear as counsel for Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. (jco) (Entered: 11/07/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Amelia E. Sarvinski, George L. Vlahos re: [10-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [10-2] motion to appoint Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Ameilia E. Sarvinski and George L. Vlahos to serve as Lead Plaintiffs, [10-3] motion to approve Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Amelia E. Sarvinski and George L. Vlahos' choice of Stull, Stull & Brody as Lead Counsel. (jco) (Entered: 11/07/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown (formerly known as BT Alex.Brown). (jco) (Entered: 11/07/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Lehman Brothers Inc. (jco) (Entered: 11/07/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER,... that all cases involving Razorfish in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-05617) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 5427. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 5427 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05427. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) (Entered: 11/02/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for Lehman Brothers Inc. by Andrew Tauber. (sac) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Michelle Kideys re: in further support of [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [5-2] motion to appoint Michelle Kideys to serve as lead plaintiff, [5-3] motion to approve Michelle Kideys' selection of Bernstein Liebhard as counsel for the Class and in opposition to [8-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [8-2] motion to appoint Econor Investments and Judith Barclay to serve as lead plaintiff, [8-3] motion to approve Econor Investments and Judith Barclay's selection Lovell & Stewart LLP and Sirota & Sirota LLP as lead for the Class, [10-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [10-2] motion to appoint Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Ameilia E. Sarvinski and George L. Vlahos to serve as Lead Plaintiffs, [10-3] motion to approve Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Amelia E. Sarvinski and George L. Vlahos' choice of Stull, Stull & Brody as Lead Counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-31-01 at 5:14 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05427 Document No. 17. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) (Entered: 09/06/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER; the time for defts Razorfish, Inc., Carter F. Bales, and John Wren to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is hereby extended from 8/27/01 to and including 30 days after the later of (i) the assignment of lead pltff and lead counsel; or (ii) service of an amended complaint in this action, if any. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) Modified on 09/07/2001 (Entered: 09/05/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER; the time for defts Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., BancBoston Robertson Stephens, Inc., BT Alex Inc. and Lehman Brothers Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 30 days after (i) the assignment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) Modified on 09/06/2001 (Entered: 08/30/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Amelia E. Sarvinski, George L. Vlahos in opposition to [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [5-2] motion to appoint Michelle Kideys to serve as lead plaintiff, [5-3] motion to approve Michelle Kideys' selection of Bernstein Liebhard as counsel for the Class, [8-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [8-2] motion to appoint Econor Investments and Judith Barclay to serve as lead plaintiff, [8-3] motion to approve Econor Investments and Judith Barclay's selection of Lovell & Stewart LLP and Sirota & Sirota LLP as lead counsel for the Class. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-28-01 at 9:59 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05427 Document No. 15. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) Modified on 09/06/2001 (Entered: 09/05/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Razorfish, Inc. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 8/27/01 at 5:04 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 08/29/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    DECLARATION of Tzivia Brody by Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Amelia E. Sarvinski, George L. Vlahos in support Re: [10-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [10-2] motion to appoint Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Ameilia E. Sarvinski and George L. Vlahos to serve as Lead Plaintiffs, [10-3] motion to approve Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Amelia Sarvinski and George L. Vlahos' choice of Stull, Stull & Brody as Lead counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-14-01 at 11:45 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05427 Document Number 12. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Amelia E. Sarvinski, George L. Vlahos in support of [10-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [10-2] motion to appoint Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Ameilia E. Sarvinski George L. Vlahos to serve as Lead Plaintiffs, [10-3] motion to approve Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Amelia E. Sarvinski and George L. Vlahos' choice of Stull, Stull & Brody as Lead Counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-14-01 Document Number 11. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) Modified on 08/22/2001 (Entered: 08/22/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Amelia E. Sarvinski, George L. Vlahos to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617 , and to appoint Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Ameilia E. Sarvinski and George L. Vlahos to serve as Lead Plaintiffs , and to approve Laura A. Cunningham, Michael Paul Kelly, Bruce Nahorwey, Amelia E. Sarvinski and George L. Vlahos' choice of Stull, Stull & Brody as Lead Counsel . No Return Date. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-14-01 at 11:45 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05427 Document Number 10. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) Modified on 08/22/2001 (Entered: 08/22/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Econor Investments, Judith Barclay in support of [8-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [8-2] motion to appoint Econor Investments and Judith Barclay to serve as lead plaintiff, [8-3] motion to approve Econor Investments and Judith Barclay's selection of Lovell & Stewart LLP and Sirota & Sirota LLP as lead counsel for the Class. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-14-01 at 7:24 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05427 Document Number 9. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION by Econor Investments, Judith Barclay to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617 , and to appoint Econor Investments and Judith Barclay to serve as lead plaintiff , and to approve Econor Investments and Judith Barclay's selection of Lovell & Stewart LLP and Sirota & Sirota LLP as lead counsel for the Class . No Return Date. The Affidavit of Gary S. Jacobson in support of motion is attached. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-14-01 at 7:24 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05427 Document Number 8. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Michael S. Egan by Michelle Kideys in support of [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [5-2] motion to appoint Michelle Kideys to serve as lead plaintiff, [5-3] motion to approve Michelle Kideys' selection of Bernstein Liebhard as counsel for the Class. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05427 Document Number 7. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Michelle Kideys in support of [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617, [5-2] motion to appoint Michelle Kideys to serve as lead plaintiff, [5-3] motion to approve Michelle Kideys' selection of Bernstein Liebhard as counsel for the Class. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05427 Document Number 6. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by Michelle Kideys to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05427 and 1:01-cv-05617 , and to appoint Michelle Kideys to serve as lead plaintiff , and to approve Michelle Kideys' selection of Bernstein Liebhard as counsel for the Class . No Return Date. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05427 Document Number 5. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05617] (dcap) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassinged to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 10/31/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Jed S. Rakoff . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Joseph H. Weiss, Tzivia Brody, Aaron Lee Brody, Jules Brody . (gmo) (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Bennett Storfer, Wayne E. Taillon. (db) (Entered: 06/15/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 408841. (db) (Entered: 06/15/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?