Predictive Syst. IPO, et al v. Predictive Systems, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-10059
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 7, 2017 at 12:37 AM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Jagjit On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY ROBERT J. BERG +1 914 920 7400 +1 914 761 1900 rberg@denleacarton.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo Wayne Gilbert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY RANDY MICHAEL MASTRO +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 5219 rmastro@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Defendant
No Logo Donaldson, Lufkin & Jenrette Securities Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gerard E. Dorsey, Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gandolfo V. Diblasi +1 212 558 4992 +5583 558 558 3588 diblasig@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John Louis Hardiman +1 212 558 4070 +1 212 558 3588 hardimanj@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY David Maxwell James Rein +1 212 558 3035 +1 212 558 3588 reind@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo Predictive Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Belau, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Ronlad G. Pettengil, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action as to 01 Civ. 10059. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ANSWER to Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Donaldson Lufkin & Jenrette Securities Corporation. Related document: 15 Amended Complaint filed by Wayne Gilbert.(sac, ) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER by Goldman Sachs & Co. to [15-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Penny Shane from the Firm: Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [15-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:30 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/18/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER by Bear, Stearns & Co. to [15-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Randy Mastro from the Firm: Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of REGISTRATION AND FIRM NAME CHANGE by Goldman Sachs & Co. Re: Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP. (gf) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AMENDED COMPLAINT by Wayne Gilbert amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Goldman Sachs & Co. by S&C on 3/13/02. (sac) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint returned executed as to Ronlad G. Pettengil mailed on 1/28/02. Answer due on 3/29/02 for Ronlad G. Pettengil. (sac) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint returned executed as to Predictive Systems mailed on 1/28/02. Answer due on 3/29/02 for Predictive Systems. (sac) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint returned executed as to Robert L. Belau mailed on 1/28/02. Answer due on 3/29/02 for Robert L. Belau. (sac) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint returned executed as to Gerard E. Dorsey mailed on 1/28/02. Answer due on 3/29/02 for Gerard E. Dorsey. (sac) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint returned executed as to Donaldson Lufkin mailed on 1/28/02. Answer due on 3/29/02 for Donaldson Lufkin. (sac) (Entered: 03/08/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint returned executed as to Robertson Stephens mailed on 1/28/02. (sac) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DECLARATION of Stuart L. Berman by Wayne Gilbert in support Re: [5-1] motion for an order, appointing Movant as Lead Pltff, [5-2] motion for an order, approving Movant's selection of the IPO Securities Litigation Pltffs' Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel. (sac) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Wayne Gilbert in support of [5-1] motion for an order, appointing Movant as Lead Pltff, [5-2] motion for an order, approving Movant's selection of the IPO Securities Litigation Pltffs' Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel. (sac) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by Wayne Gilbert for an order, appointing Movant as Lead Pltff ; for an order, approving Movant's selection of the IPO Securities Litigation Pltffs' Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel ; Return date not indicated. (sac) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Predictive Systems. (sac) (Entered: 02/08/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (moc) (Entered: 01/31/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 422028. (gmo) (Entered: 11/21/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?