IN RE: Wesson Oil Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. 2:11-ml-2291
District Judge Margaret M. Morrow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 2:15 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Liaison Counsel for Plaintiff(s), Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by A. Daniel Woska & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space A. Daniel Woska +1 405 562 7771 +1 405 285 9350 awoska@woskalawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus Anderson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori Erin Andrus +1 415 986 1400 +1 415 986 1474 lori@andrusanderson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 ldavis@hhklawfirm.com
Space Rachel Lawrence Mor +1 405 562 7771 +1 405 282 9350 rmor@woskalawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Etheredge Burton, Jr. +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 mburton@audetlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Scott Tarbutton +1 215 665 7255 +1 215 665 2013 starbutton@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dealy & Silberstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milo Silberstein +1 212 385 0066 +1 212 385 2117 msilberstein@dealysilberstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DOMENGEAUX WRIGHT ROY & EDWARDS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P Roy +1 337 233 3033

Toggle Switch Represented by Dowd & Dowd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Dowd +1 314 621 2500 +1 314 621 2503 doug@dowdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman, Herman, Katz & Cotlar, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. Herman - NOT SWORN +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024

Toggle Switch Represented by HILLIARD & SHADOWEN LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVE D. SHADOWEN +1 855 344 3298 steve@hilliardshadowenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Humphrey, Farrington, & McClain, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Blair McClain +1 816 836 5050 +8368 836 836 8966 kbm@hfmlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Cecil Gilbert +1 305 384 7270 +1 954 525 4300 gilbert@kolawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Timothy Green +1 212 687 8181 +1 212 972 9432 JGreen@kreindler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LITE DEPALMA GREENBERG LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allyn Zissel Lite +1 973 623 3000 +1 973 623 0858 alite@litedepalma.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Joseph Bruckner +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 bruckwj@locklaw.com
Space Elizabeth R. Odette +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 erodette@locklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LYNCH & PINE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey B. Pine +1 401 274 3306

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinn, Carpenter, Montoya & Love, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randi McGinn +1 505 843 6161 randi@mcginnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael J Blaschke PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Blaschke +1 405 562 7771 +1 405 285 9350 mblaschke@thelawgroupokc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Yanchunis +1 813 223 5505 +1 813 223 5402 jyanchunis@forthepeople.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don Migliori +1 401 457 7700 +4577 457 457 7708 dmigliori@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parry Deering Futscher & Sparks, P.S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ron R. Parry +1 859 291 9000 +1 859 291 9300 rparry@pdfslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick Lynch Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Lynch plynch@patricklynchlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reilly Pozner, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel M Reilly +1 303 893 6100 +1 303 893 6110 dreilly@rplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J Hanly, Jr. +1 212 784 6400 +1 212 213 5949

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlachter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith S. Dubanevich +1 503 227 1600 kdubanevich@stollberne.com
Space Mark A. Friel +1 503 227 1600 +1 503 227 6840 mfriel@stollberne.com
Space Steve Douglas Larson +1 503 227 1600 +1 503 227 6840 slarson@stollberne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald Edward Meunier +1 504 522 2304 +1 504 528 9973 gmeunier@gainsben.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 305

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary E Mason +1 202 429 2290 +1 202 429 2294 gmason@wbmllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite D

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia S. Murphy +1 618 248 3236 trisha@murphymurphyllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas V Bender +1 816 421 6620 +1 816 421 4747 tbender@wbsvlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
v.
No Logo Liaison Counsel for Defendant(s), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura S Shores +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 492 5999 laura.shores@apks.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kerry J. Miller +1 504 566 8646 kjmiller@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Barbara B Smithers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara B Smithers +1 407 245 0365

Toggle Switch Represented by Beck Redden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Beck +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard P. Cassetta +1 314 259 2823 +1 314 552 8823 Richard.Cassetta@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis Joseph Warin +1 202 887 3609 +1 202 530 9608 fwarin@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Godwin Lewis PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Everett Godwin +1 214 939 4400 +1 214 760 7332 Don.Godwin@GodwinLewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Hefferon ,. +1 202 346 4029 +1 202 346 4444 thefferon@goodwinproctor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irwin Fritchie Urquhart and Moore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James B. Irwin, V +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 jirwin@irwinllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Andrew Langan +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 andrew.langan@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kuchler Polk Schell Weiner & Richeson, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah DeRoche Kuchler +1 504 592 0691

Toggle Switch Represented by Liskow & Lewis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don Keller Haycraft +1 504 556 4128 dkhaycraft@liskow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald Sobel +1 212 836 8000 +1 212 836 8689 gerald.sobel@kayescholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D Sokler +1 202 434 7303 +1 202 434 7400 bdsokler@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ky Elaine Kirby +1 202 373 6795 +1 202 373 6434 ky.kirby@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by STONE PIGMAN WALTHER & WITTMANN LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip A. Wittmann +1 504 581 3200 pwittmann@stonepigman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by WEIL GOTSHAL & MANGES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Lyle +1 202 538 8166
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
***THIS MDL IS CLOSED. (JN) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF TRANSFEREE COURT -- (ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING APPEAL)Signed by Sr. District Judge Margaret M. Morrow in the C.D. California and filed in district court on 5/5/15. (dld) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 9/27/2011 before the Panel at Philadelphia, PA. Court Reporter/Transcriber Suzanne R. White, James A. Byrne U.S. Courthouse, 601 Market Street, Room 2609, Philadelphia, PA 19106-1797, (215) 627-1882. Transcript may be viewed at the Panel's office or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/15/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2012.Signed by U.S. District Judge John G Heyburn, II on 10/25/2011. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-05379, CAC/2:11-cv-06127, CAC/2:11-cv-06402, CAC/2:11-cv-06480, CAC/2:11-cv-07097, NJ/2:11-cv-04038 (RH) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        TRANSFER ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2291), ( 2 in MDL No. 2291) Transferring 1 action(s) to Judge Judge Margaret M. Morrow in the C.D. California.Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 10/13/2011. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-05379, CAC/2:11-cv-06127, CAC/2:11-cv-06402, CAC/2:11-cv-06480, CAC/2:11-cv-07097, CAC/2:11-cv-08421, NJ/2:11-cv-04038 (JG) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          CONSENT ORDER re: pldg(s). 1 , 2 Consenting to transfer of litigation to Judge Margaret M Morrow in the California Central District Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Audrey B Collins on 10/12/11. (JG) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Robert B. Hawk, Counsel for: Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. -- California Northern District Court (3:11-cv-04607) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Complaint CAN 3:11-cv-04607) (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. ( 17 in MDL No. 2291, 8 in NJ/2:11-cv-04038) Filed by Defendant CONAGRA FOODS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, NJ/2:11-cv-04038 (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. ( 18 in MDL No. 2291, 9 in NJ/2:11-cv-04038) Filed by Plaintiffs ALEXIS JUSTAK, PHYLLIS SCARPELLI, LEONORA ULITSKY -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, NJ/2:11-cv-04038 (Cecchi, James) Modified on 9/9/2011 (LH). ADDED MDL AND CASE NUMBERS (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 7 in MDL No. 2291, 3 in NJ/2:11-cv-04038) Filed by James E Cecchi on behalf of Plaintiffs ALEXIS JUSTAK, PHYLLIS SCARPELLI, LEONORA ULITSKY Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, NJ/2:11-cv-04038 (Cecchi, James) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2291), ( 2 in MDL No. 2291) ) Filed by Plaintiffs ALEXIS JUSTAK, PHYLLIS SCARPELLI, LEONORA ULITSKY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, NJ/2:11-cv-04038 (Cecchi, James) Modified on 9/9/2011 (LH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM, INTERESTED PARTY AND DUPLICATE ATTACHMENTS NAMES (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (3 in CAC/2:11-cv-05379, 3 in CAC/2:11-cv-06127, 4 in CAC/2:11-cv-06402, 4 in CAC/2:11-cv-06480, 3 in CAC/2:11-cv-07097, 7 in MDL No. 2291, 3 in NJ/2:11-cv-04038) Filed by Robert B Hawk on behalf of Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-05379, CAC/2:11-cv-06127, CAC/2:11-cv-06402, CAC/2:11-cv-06480, CAC/2:11-cv-07097, NJ/2:11-cv-04038 (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. (7 in CAC/2:11-cv-05379, 7 in CAC/2:11-cv-06127, 6 in CAC/2:11-cv-06402, 6 in CAC/2:11-cv-06480, 5 in CAC/2:11-cv-07097, 13 in MDL No. 2291, 5 in NJ/2:11-cv-04038), ( 2 in MDL No. 2291), ( 1 in MDL No. 2291) Filed by Defendants Conagra Foods, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc., CONAGRA FOODS, INC., ConAgra Foods Inc, Conagra Foods, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert B. Hawk, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-05379, CAC/2:11-cv-06127, CAC/2:11-cv-06402, CAC/2:11-cv-06480, CAC/2:11-cv-07097, NJ/2:11-cv-04038 (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- re: pldg(s). ( 1 in MDL No. 2291) -- Filed by Defendant CONAGRA FOODS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, NJ/2:11-cv-04324 (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2291), ( 2 in MDL No. 2291) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Robert Briseno, Kelly McFadden, Christi Toomer, Janeth Ruiz - (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Andrei V. Rado In Support of Plaintiffs Robert Briseno's, Christi Toomer's, Kelly McFadden's, and Janeth Ruiz's Response In Support of Proposed Transfer of Related Actions to the Central District of California, # 2 Exhibit A - Ruiz Transfer Order, # 3 Exhibit B - Krein Consent Order, # 4 Exhibit C - In re Toys R Us docket and complaint, # 5 Exhibit D - In re Human Tissue Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit E - Federal Court Management Statistics, # 7 Exhibit F - Briseno Order Denying Defendant's Stipulation, # 8 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-05379, CAC/2:11-cv-06127, CAC/2:11-cv-06402, CAC/2:11-cv-06480, NJ/2:11-cv-04038, NJ/2:11-cv-04324 (Rado, Andrei) Modified on 8/29/2011 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (3 in CAC/2:11-cv-05379, 7 in MDL No. 2291) Filed by Andrei V Rado on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Briseno (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-05379 (Rado, Andrei) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2291), ( 2 in MDL No. 2291) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for CONAGRA FOODS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-05379, CAC/2:11-cv-06127, CAC/2:11-cv-06402, CAC/2:11-cv-06480, NJ/2:11-cv-04038, NJ/2:11-cv-04324 (Hawk, Robert) Modified on 8/22/2011 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2291) Filed by Adam J. Levitt on behalf of Plaintiff Christi Toomer Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-06127 (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2291) Filed by Adam J. Levitt on behalf of Plaintiff Christi Toomer Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-06127 (Levitt, Adam) Modified on 8/22/2011 (LH). ADDED PARTY TYPE (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2291), ( 2 in MDL No. 2291) Filed by Andrei V Rado on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Briseno Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-05379 (Rado, Andrei) Modified on 8/22/2011 (LH). ADDED PARTY TYPE (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2291), ( 2 in MDL No. 2291) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for Tuesday, 9/27/2011 in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 8/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 MDL No. 2291 Notice of Presentation or Waiver form, # 2 Courthouse Advisory) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-05379, CAC/2:11-cv-06127, CAC/2:11-cv-06402, CAC/2:11-cv-06480, NJ/2:11-cv-04038, NJ/2:11-cv-04324 (RH) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- re: pldg(s). ( 1 in MDL No. 2291) -- Filed by Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, FLS/9:11-cv-80863 (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2291), ( 2 in MDL No. 2291) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 8/19/2011. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 8/19/2011. Responses due on or before 8/26/2011. Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 8/5/2011. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2291, CAC/2:11-cv-05379, CAC/2:11-cv-06127, CAC/2:11-cv-06402, FLS/9:11-cv-80863, NJ/2:11-cv-04038, NJ/2:11-cv-04324 (TB) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MDL Number 2291 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( 1 in Pending No. 115) Associated Cases: Pending No. 115, CAC/2:11-cv-05379, CAC/2:11-cv-06127, CAC/2:11-cv-06402, FLS/9:11-cv-80863, NJ/2:11-cv-04038, NJ/2:11-cv-04324, NYE/1:11-cv-03186 (TB) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: pldg.( 2 in Pending No. 115) Associated Cases: Pending No. 115, CAC/2:11-cv-06402 (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION TO TRANSFER (AMENDED) (re: pldg. ( 1 in Pending No. 115) ) from California Central District Court (2:11-cv-06402) (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit A (Complaint - CAC 2:11-06402))Associated Cases: Pending No. 115, NYE/1:11-cv-03186(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION TO TRANSFER (INITIAL MOTION) with Brief in Support. -- 6 Action(s) -- from California Central District Court (2:11-cv-05379,2:11-cv-06127), Florida Southern District Court (9:11-cv-80863), New Jersey District Court (2:11-cv-04038,2:11-cv-04324), New York Eastern District Court (1:11-cv-03186) - Suggested Transferee Court: C.D. California - Filed by: Conagra Foods, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Benjamin Diggs (with Exhibits A-C), # 4 Proof of Service, # 5 Exhibit A (Complaint - CAC 2:11-05379), # 6 Exhibit B (Complaint - CAC 2:11-06127), # 7 Exhibit C (Complaint - FLS 9:11-80863), # 8 Exhibit D (Complaint - NJ 2:11-04038), # 9 Exhibit E (Complaint - NJ 2:11-04324), # 10 Exhibit F (Complaint - NYE 1:11-03186))(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?