Maldonado v. City Of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-06618
District Judge Alison J. Nathan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 11, 2019 at 4:10 PM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Franklin Maldonado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sommerville, John Matthew

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vikrant Pawar +1 212 571 0805 +1 212 571 0938 vikrantpawaresq@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Administration For Children Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Ronald E. Richter, in his capacity as Commissioner of ACS of the City of New York) Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk +1 212 788 1165 +1 212 788 0940 ckruk@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Ronald E. Richter, in his capacity as Commissioner of ACS of the City of New York) Lesley Berson Mbaye +1 212 788 0408 +1 212 788 0940 lmbaye@law.nyc.gov
(Ronald E. Richter, in his capacity as Commissioner of ACS of the City of New York) Janice Casey Silverberg +1 212 788 8119 +1 212 788 0877 jsilverb@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 99 Park Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Michael Cleary +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 rcleary@hpmb.com
Space Austa Starr Devlin +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 adevlin@hpmb.com
Space Tucker Christian Kramer +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 tkramer@hpmb.com
Space Daryl Paxson +1 914 522 2068 +1 914 949 1160 dpaxson@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordan Michael Smith +1 212 880 3800 +1 212 880 8965 jordan.smith@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter John Fogarty +1 212 356 3514 pfogarty@law.nyc.gov
Space Bilal Husain Haider +1 212 356 3549 +1 212 356 3509 bhaider@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Beth Jenifer Hoffman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beth Jenifer Hoffman

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dara Lynn Weiss +1 212 676 1307 +1 212 788 9776 DAWEISS@LAW.NYC.GOV

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel Office City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rhiana L. Swartz +1 212 356 2382 +1 212 356 3509 rswartz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.(NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Adam Stein +1 212 351 4660 +1 212 878 8600 JStein@ebglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidell Pittoni Murphy & Bach, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alejandra Rosa Gil +1 914 559 3100 agil@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidell, Pittoni, Murphy & Bach, LLP (WP)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Gerard May +1 212 471 4653 +1 212 490 8966 dmay@hpmb.com
Space Ana Maria Vizzo +1 212 471 4661 +1 212 883 7929 avizzo@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Joshua Mathew Friedman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Mathew Friedman

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl Joseph Ashanti +1 212 227 0414 +1 212 788 9776 kashanti@law.nyc.gov
Space Danielle Marie Dandrige +1 212 788 0889 +1 212 788 0877 Ddandrig@law.nyc.gov
Space Brendan Michael Horan +1 212 356 1174 +1 212 356 4360 brhoran@law.nyc.gov
Space Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@ahalelaw.com
Space Elisa Lee +1 781 636 8967 +1 212 356 3582 ellee@law.nyc.gov
Space Gary Moy +1 212 356 3522 +1 212 788 9776 gmoy@law.nyc.gov
Space Daniel H. Oliner +1 212 356 2329 +1 212 256 3509 doliner@law.nyc.gov
Space Rachel Amy Seligman +1 212 788 0784 +1 212 788 9776 rseligma@law.nyc.gov
Space Scott Craig Silverman +1 212 356 2450 ssilverm@law.nyc.gov
Space Alana Danielle Sisnett +1 909 633 1515 asisnett@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kerrin Ann Bowers +1 212 356 2473 +1 212 356 2089 kbowers@law.nyc.gov
Space Evan F. Jaffe +1 212 356 2354 evjaffe@law.nyc.gov
Space Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fayola Naila Alibey +1 212 356 2334 +1 212 356 3509 falibey@law.nyc.gov
Space Joseph Anci +1 212 356 1106 +1 212 788 5650 janci@law.nyc.gov
Space Suzanne Emily Aribakan +1 212 232 1300 +1 212 232 1399 saribaka@law.nyc.gov
Space Christopher Gregory Arko +1 212 788 0303 carko@law.nyc.gov
Space Karl Joseph Ashanti +1 212 227 0414 +1 212 788 9776 kashanti@law.nyc.gov
Space Richard Bahrenburg +1 212 356 2338 +1 212 356 3509 rbahrenb@law.nyc.gov
Space Elizabeth Barrett Bardauskis +1 212 356 3159 +1 212 356 3509 ebardaus@law.nyc.gov
Space Nikki Lynn Barker +1 212 676 0992 nbarker@law.nyc.gov
Space Zachary Russell Bergman +1 212 356 5051 zbergman@law.nyc.gov
Space Shira M. Blank +1 212 356 2475 +1 212 788 3770 sblank@law.nyc.gov
Space Cassandra Natasha Branch +1 212 356 4074 cbranch@law.nyc.gov
Space Daniel Michael Braun +1 212 356 3548 +1 212 356 3509 dbraun@law.nyc.gov
Space Cherie Nicole Brown +1 212 356 5054 chebrown@law.nyc.gov
Space Kyle C. Bruno +1 732 674 3172 kbruno@law.nyc.gov
Space Evan Brustein +1 212 356 2651 +1 212 356 3509 ebrustei@law.nyc.gov
Space Katherine Abigail Byrns +1 212 356 3549 +1 212 356 3509 kbyrns@law.nyc.gov
Space John Corbin Carter +1 212 356 2078 jocarter@law.nyc.gov
Space Johana Castro +1 212 788 0976 +1 212 788 9776 jcastro@law.nyc.gov
Space Colin M. Ceriello +1 212 356 5052 +1 212 356 3509 cceriell@law.nyc.gov
Space Jacqueline Carolina Chavez +1 212 356 1000 jchavez@law.nyc.gov
Space Megan Patricia Conger +1 212 356 3504 +1 212 356 3509 mconger@law.nyc.gov
Space David Allen Cooper +1 212 356 3535 +1 212 356 3509 dcooper@law.nyc.gov
Space Alexandra Corsi +1 212 788 1090 +1 212 788 9776 acorsi@law.nyc.gov
Space Theresa Jeanine D'Andrea +1 212 356 3187 +1 212 356 3509 tdandrea@law.nyc.gov
Space Elizabeth M. Daitz +1 212 788 0775 +1 212 788 9776 edaitz@law.nyc.gov
Space Elizabeth Carolyn Degori +1 212 356 3586 edegori@law.nyc.gov
Space Carolyn Kay Depoian +1 212 442 1048 +1 212 788 9776 cdepoian@law.nyc.gov
Space Anthony Matthew Disenso +1 212 442 6618 +1 212 788 9776 adisenso@law.nyc.gov
Space Hannah Victoria Faddis +1 212 356 2486 +1 212 356 1148 hfaddis@law.nyc.gov
Space Courtney Patrice Fain +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 cfain@law.nyc.gov
Space Kaitlin Elizabeth Fitzgibbon +1 212 356 5057 kfitzgib@law.nyc.gov
Space Michael Friel Fleming +1 212 356 2471 +1 212 788 3770 mfleming@law.nyc.gov
Space Brian Christopher Francolla +1 212 788 0988 +1 212 788 9776 bfrancol@law.nyc.gov
Space Philip Sebastian Frank +1 212 788 0893 +1 212 788 9776 pfrank@law.nyc.gov
Space John L. Garcia +1 212 356 5053 +1 212 356 3509 johgarci@law.nyc.gov
Space Ashley Rebecca Garman +1 212 768 4900 +1 212 768 3629 agarman@law.nyc.gov
Space Holly Rachel Gerstenfeld +1 212 788 0710 +1 212 788 0937 hgersten@law.nyc.gov
Space Brachah Goykadosh +1 212 356 3523 +1 212 356 3509 bgoykado@law.nyc.gov
Space Joseph Aaron Gutmann +1 212 356 2659 +1 212 356 3509 jgutmann@law.nyc.gov
Space John Paul Guyette +1 212 356 2455 +1 212 356 2089 jguyette@law.nyc.gov
Space Douglas William Heim +1 212 788 1298 +1 212 788 9776 dheim@law.nyc.gov
Space Maurice L Hudson +1 212 788 8684 +1 212 788 9776 mhudson@law.nyc.gov
Space Elissa Beth Jacobs +1 212 341 9892 +1 212 788 9776 ejacobs@law.nyc.gov
Space Paul Hasan Johnson +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 pajohnso@law.nyc.gov
Space Christopher Michael Katsimagles +1 609 558 7656 ckatsima@law.nyc.gov
Space Melissa Kim +1 310 985 1524 mkim@law.nyc.gov
Space Elizabeth Norris Krasnow +1 212 335 3997 +1 212 335 4390 krasnowe@dany.nyc.gov
Space Ben Kuruvilla +1 212 788 6405 +1 212 788 9776 bkuruvil@law.nyc.gov
Space Nelson Leese +1 212 356 4361 nleese@law.nyc.gov
Space Ariel Shaun Lichterman +1 212 513 7927 +1 212 788 9776 alichter@law.nyc.gov
Space Jeffrey Loperfido +1 212 356 2384 +1 212 356 3509 jloperfido@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew W Manoff +1 212 356 3283 amanoff@law.nyc.gov
Space Paul Frederick Marks +1 212 788 0884 +1 212 788 8877 pmarks@law.nyc.gov
Space Heather Marie Martone +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 hmartone@law.nyc.gov
Space Joseph Anthony Marutollo +1 212 788 1300 +1 212 788 0367 jmarutol@law.nyc.gov
Space Max Oliver McCann +1 212 788 0861 +1 212 788 9776 mmccann@law.nyc.gov
Space Joanne Maureen McLaren +1 212 801 3197 +1 212 801 6400 jmclaren@law.nyc.gov
Space Linda Margareta Mindrutiu +1 212 788 1177 +1 212 788 9776 lmindrut@law.nyc.gov
Space Alison Sue Mitchell +1 212 356 3514 amitchel@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew Thomas Myerberg +1 212 788 0869 +1 212 788 9776 amyerber@law.nyc.gov
Space Michael Nacchio +1 212 356 2726 mnacchio@law.nyc.gov
Space Kathleen Erin Naughton +1 212 788 9567 +1 212 788 9776 knaughto@law.nyc.gov
Space Alexander Macrae Noble +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 356 3509 anoble@law.nyc.gov
Space Daniel Louis Passeser +1 212 227 6339 +1 212 788 9776 dpassese@law.nyc.gov
Space Evan Michael Piercey +1 212 356 2428 epiercey@law.nyc.gov
Space Lucienne Pierre +1 212 356 2415 +1 212 356 3509 lpierre@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew James Rauchberg +1 212 788 0889 +1 212 788 0940 arauchbe@law.nyc.gov
Space Justin Warren Reiter +1 212 356 3580 jreiter@law.nyc.gov
Space Sean Robert Renaghan +1 212 356 2452 srenagha@law.nyc.gov
Space Wilda Jacqueline Rodriguez +1 212 356 4361 +1 212 356 3508 wrodrigu@law.nyc.gov
Space Erin T. Ryan +1 212 365 5056 +1 212 356 3509 eryan@law.nyc.gov
Space Daniel G. Saavedra +1 212 356 0892 +1 212 356 3509 dsaavedr@law.nyc.gov
Space Melanie Vogel Sadok +1 212 676 6051 +1 212 791 9714 msadok@law.nyc.gov
Space Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
Space Nana Kwame Sarpong +1 212 356 0827 +1 212 356 3508 nsarpong@law.nyc.gov
Space Susan P. Scharfstein +1 212 227 4071 +1 212 788 9776 sscharfs@law.nyc.gov
Space Omar Javed Siddiqi +1 212 356 2381 osiddiqi@law.nyc.gov
Space Valerie Elizabeth Smith +1 212 356 2398 vsmith@law.nyc.gov
Space Melanie Mary Speight +1 212 788 0577 +1 212 788 9776 mspeight@law.nyc.gov
Space Kathryn M Sprovieri +1 212 356 2383 +1 212 356 3509 ksprovie@law.nyc.gov
Space Noreen M. Stackhouse +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 9776 nstackho@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
Space Pernell Michael Telfort +1 212 341 2652 +1 212 788 3824 ptelfort@law.nyc.gov
Space Kavin Suresh Thadani +1 212 356 2351 +1 212 356 3509 kthadani@law.nyc.gov
Space Omar Hani Tuffaha +1 212 356 0896 +1 212 788 0877 otuffaha@law.nyc.gov
Space Melissa Wachs +1 718 222 2332 +1 718 802 2540 mwachs@law.nyc.gov
Space Katherine Jane Weall +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 3509 kweall@law.nyc.gov
Space Joshua Alan Weiner +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 jweiner@law.nyc.gov
Space Angharad Wilson +1 212 356 2572 awilson@law.nyc.gov
Space Lamar DeVaughn Winslow +1 212 356 2579 +1 212 356 3558 lwinslow@law.nyc.gov
Space Christopher John Yee Coyne +1 212 356 1180 +1 212 356 2089 ccoyne@law.nyc.gov
Space Joseph P. Zangrilli +1 212 356 2657 +1 212 356 1148 jzangril@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Dept.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Issac Klepfish +1 212 788 0897 +1 212 788 8000 iklepfis@law.NYC.gov
Space Ryan Glenn Shaffer +1 212 788 1041 +1 212 788 9776 rshaffer@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shlomit Aroubas +1 212 442 2715 +1 212 788 9776 saroubas@law.nyc.gov
Space Tanya N Blocker +1 212 356 3177 +1 212 780 3770 tblocker@law.nyc.gov
Space Stephanie Marie Breslow +1 212 788 1575 +1 212 788 9776 sbreslow@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew Bridge +1 212 356 2347 +1 212 356 3509 mbridge@law.nyc.gov
Space Peter William Brocker +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 356 3509 pbrocker@law.nyc.gov
Space Elizabeth Colette Connelly +1 212 356 2547 +1 212 356 1148 econnell@law.nyc.gov
Space Tavish Coryell Deatley +1 212 356 2409 tdeatley@law.nyc.gov
Space Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
Space Eviana Linnea Frances Englert +1 212 356 5055 eenglert@law.nyc.gov
Space Aimee Kara Lulich +1 212 788 0725 +1 212 788 9776 alulich@law.nyc.gov
Space Matthew William McQueen +1 212 356 2423 +1 212 356 3509 mmcqueen@law.nyc.gov
Space Suzanna Publicker Mettham +1 212 788 1103 +1 212 788 9776 smettham@law.nyc.gov
Space Okwede N Okoh +1 212 356 3271 +1 212 788 9776 ookoh@law.nyc.gov
Space Alan Howard Scheiner +1 212 788 0600 +1 212 788 0367 ascheine@law.nyc.gov
Space Mark David Zuckerman +1 212 442 8248 +1 212 788 9776 mzuckerm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Keaupuni Akina +1 212 356 2377 +1 212 356 3509 wakina@law.nyc.gov
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
Space Kristen Monet McIntosh +1 212 356 2394 +1 212 356 3582 kmcintos@law.nyc.gov
Space Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrea Mary O'Connor +1 212 676 2750 +1 212 788 8877 aoconnor@law.nyc.gov
Space Kathleen Deborah Reilly +1 212 356 2663 +1 212 356 2663 kareilly@law.nyc.gov
Space Max R. Sarinsky +1 212 356 4017 +1 212 356 2019 msarinsk@law.nyc.gov
Space Qiana Charmaine Smith +1 212 788 1588 +1 212 788 9776 qwilliam@law.nyc.gov
Space Emily Stitelman +1 212 356 2011 +1 212 356 2019 estitelm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Ferrari +1 212 356 5058 dferrari@law.nyc.gov
Space Michael Keith Gertzer +1 212 788 0786 +1 212 788 9776 mgertzer@law.nyc.gov
Space Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@law.nyc.gov
Space Brian Guenther Maxey +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 bmaxey@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Corporation Counsel NYC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Scott Dantowitz +1 212 788 0939 +1 212 788 8877 jdantowi@law.nyc.gov
Space Kimberly Marie Savino +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 ksavino@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elissa Paulette Fudim +1 212 356 2425 +1 212 356 1148 efudim@law.nyc.gov
Space Aviva Yocheved Horowitz +1 917 868 1122 ahorowit@law.nyc.gov
Space Sumit Sud +1 212 788 1096 +1 212 788 0367 ssud@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The Corporation Counsel, Nyc Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amatullah Khaliha Booth +1 212 356 3534 +1 212 356 3509 abooth@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Shoffel +1 212 416 8576 +1 212 416 6009

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip Rudolph DePaul

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Rudolph DePaul

Toggle Switch Represented by Sadis & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Amy Rossan +1 212 788 0867 +1 212 788 9776 jrossan@sglawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jorge M. Marquez-San Martin +1 787 525 8895 +1 212 356 3509 jorge.marquez.sm@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stanley W Hodge Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Joseph Lax +1 212 442 6831 +1 212 788 9776 joshua_lax@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tzipora Esther Teichman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tzipora Esther Teichman
No Logo Horizon Juvenile Center, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-3, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad and Scherer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
former CPD officials Albert L. Frevola, Jr. +1 954 462 5500 +1 954 463 9244 afrevola@conradscherer.com
former CPD officials Jack Kallus +1 917 462 5500 +1 954 463 9244 jkallus@conradscherer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keck & Austin, L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
former CPD officials Patricia Ann Keck +1 417 890 8989 +1 417 890 8990 pat@keckaustin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Minneapolis City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
former CPD officials Timothy S Skarda +1 612 673 2553 +1 612 673 3362 Timothy.Skarda@ci.minneapolis.mn.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Missouri State University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
former CPD officials Jill Patterson +1 417 836 8506 +1 417 836 6777 jillpatterson@missouristate.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
former CPD officials Mbiabah L Ghartey +1 212 416 8548 +1 212 416 6009 lisa.ghartey@oag.state.ny.us

Toggle Switch Represented by One Ashburton Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
former CPD officials Chana Vered Jona +1 617 727 2200 vered.jona@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Pritchard and Elliott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
former CPD officials James H. Elliott +1 843 722 3300 +1 843 722 3379 jelliott@pritchard-elliott.com
former CPD officials Samia Hanafi Nettles +1 843 722 3300 shanafi@pritchard-elliott.com
former CPD officials Arthur Cole Pelzer +1 843 577 7700 acpelzer@pritchard-elliott.com
former CPD officials Thomas Bacot Pritchard +1 843 722 3300 +1 843 722 3379 tpritchard@pritchard-elliott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith, Finkelstein, Lundberg, Isler & Yakaboski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
former CPD officials Frank A. Isler +1 631 727 4100 +1 631 727 4130 fisler@sfliy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
former CPD officials Sheri R Glaser +1 202 616 1231 +1 202 616 8962 sheri.glaser@usdoj.gov
No Logo Ms. Jane Clarke, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Jane Estrella, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Jane Martin, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Michelle Hall, Defendant
No Logo Natalie Medford, Defendant
No Logo Tour Comander John Ike, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Conference
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Stay
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Statement of Relatedness
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Statement of Relatedness
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Request to Enter Default
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant Medford's request for a protective order and stay of discovery in this case is denied. This resolves docket number 57, and the Court's prior stay of the deposition of Defendant Medford, see Dkt. No. 56, is lifted. Within two weeks of the filing of this order, the parties shall submit a revised plan to the Court for the completion of the remaining discovery. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/1/18) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Support (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Reply Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None order on motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. City Of New York served on 9/1/2017, answer due 9/22/2017. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Service Window Clerk. Document filed by Franklin Maldonado. (Pawar, Vikrant) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Administration for Children Services, City Of New York, Ms. Michelle Hall, Horizon Juvenile Center, John Does 1-3, Natalie Medford, Ms. Jane Clarke, Ms. Jane Estrella, Ms. Jane Martin, Tour Comander John Ike. (rch) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK, HORIZON JUVENILE CENTER, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN SERVICES, TOUR COMMANDER JOHN IKE, NATALIE MEDFORD, MS. JANE CLARKE, MS. JANE ESTRELLA, MS. JANE MARTIN, MS. MICHELLE HALL, JOHN DOES 1-3, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Franklin Maldonado. (Pawar, Vikrant) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, Horizon Juvenile Center, Administration for Children services, Natalie Medford, Ms. "Jane" Clarke, Ms. "Jane" Estrella, Ms. "Jane" Martin, Ms. Michelle Hall, Tour Commander "John" Ike, John Does 1-3, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Franklin Maldonado. (Pawar, Vikrant) Modified on 8/31/2017 (rch). (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pawar, Vikrant) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Administration for Children Services, Ms. "Jane" Clarke, Ms. "Jane" Estrella, Ms. Michelle Hall, Horizon Juvenile Center, Tour Commander "John" Ike, John Does 1-3, Ms. "Jane" Martin, Natalie Medford, The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14074600)Document filed by Franklin Maldonado.(Pawar, Vikrant) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?