Karen Vanover v. NCO Financial Services, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 15-15294

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 7:46 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109594643 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mandate issued as to Appellant Karen Vanover.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109545029 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Judgment entered as to Appellant Karen Vanover.
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109545021 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Karen Vanover. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109293352 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Supplemental Authority filed by Attorney Lisa R. Wilcox for Appellant Karen Vanover. (ECF: Lisa Wilcox)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109272269 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Oral argument CD requested by Lisa R. Wilcox for Karen Vanover.
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109594643 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Mandate issued as to Appellant Karen Vanover.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109545029 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Judgment entered as to Appellant Karen Vanover.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 01109545021 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Karen Vanover. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109293352 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Supplemental Authority filed by Attorney Lisa R. Wilcox for Appellant Karen Vanover. (ECF: Lisa Wilcox)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109272269 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Oral argument CD requested by Lisa R. Wilcox for Karen Vanover.
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?