Jerry Adams v. James Beal
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-7135

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 3:02 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RECORD (paper) returned to VA Western District. Record Part: State Court Records, Volumes Location: Vols 1 , 2. [16-7135] (TW)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Mandate issued. Referencing: [12] Unpublished per curiam Opinion, [13] Judgment Order. Originating case number: 7:15-cv-00594-MFU-RSB. Mailed to: Jerry Adams. [16-7135] (TW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 16-7135 opn.u.sub. Decision: Dismissed. Originating case number: 7:15-cv-00594-MFU-RSB. Entered on Docket Date: 02/03/2017. [1000016627] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. Mailed to: Jerry L. Adams. [16-7135] (RHS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion--denying motion for discovery [9] Originating case number: 7:15-cv-00594-MFU-RSB Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1000016620]. Mailed to: Jerry L. Adams. [16-7135] (RHS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Letter re: Circuit Court of Pulaski County by Appellant Jerry L. Adams. [999977409] [16-7135] (RHS)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Appellant Jerry L. Adams. [16-7135] (RHS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION by Appellant Jerry L. Adams for discovery. Date and method of service: 10/14/2016 US mail. [999949997] [16-7135] (RHS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER filed [999932787] granting Motion to extend filing time [7], updating/ resuming informal briefing order deadlines Informal Opening Brief due 10/20/2016 Copies to all parties.. [16-7135] (RHS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION by Appellant Jerry L. Adams to extend filing time for informal opening brief until 10/30/2016. Date and method of service: 09/14/2016 US mail. [999932785] [16-7135] (RHS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jerry Adams. Informal Opening Brief due 09/16/2016 [16-7135] (RHS)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 7:15-cv-00594-MFU-RSB. Date notice of appeal filed: 08/19/2016. Case manager: RSewell. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [16-7135] (RHS)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 5 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?