Venice PI, LLC v. Bovee
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00335
Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2019 at 11:07 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Venice PI, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 701 Fifth Ave.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Lowe +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 Lowe@lowegrahamjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl D. Crowell +1 503 581 1240 +1 503 585 0368 carl@crowell-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dale Jensen Plc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dale Reese Jensen +1 434 249 3874 +1 866 372 0348 djensen@dalejensenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dematteo Law, Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Neil DeMatteo +1 866 645 4169 +1 732 301 9202 bryan@demfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
Space William Benjamin Kalbac +1 312 604 2734 wkalbac@HSPLEGAL.COM

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch Van Sickle Law PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Maher Lynch +1 919 469 5685 kml@lynchvansickle.com
Space R. Matthew Van Sickle +1 919 469 5685 rmv@lynchvansickle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 105

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary J Fischman +1 713 900 4924 fischman@fischmaniplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 102

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kerry S. Culpepper +1 202 621 0218 kculpepper@culpepperip.com
v.
No Logo Doe #1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel A. Bushnell +1 561 835 9400
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cigel Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Rick Alan Cigel +1 424 901 8513 +1 424 901 8514 rick.cigel@cigellawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Jacksonville, Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Craig D. Feiser +1 904 630 1834 +1 904 630 1316 cfeiser@coj.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Manuel J Dominguez - NOT SWORN +1 561 578 6850 +1 202 408 4699 jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe #1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 1

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric J. Menhart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Eric J. Menhart

Toggle Switch Represented by Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Ansel Jay Halliburton +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 ansel@krinternetlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Karl Stephen Kronenberger +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 karl@KRInternetlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 Jeff@KRInternetlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of DAVID H MADDEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David Hamlin Madden +1 503 679 1671 +1 503 512 6113 ecf@mersenne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Kelley Marie Blasa Fox +1 213 281 5280 +1 213 250 7900 kelley.fox@lewisbrisbois.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NEELEMAN LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jennifer L Neeleman +1 425 212 4800 jneeleman@expresslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Novation Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Erin R. Christison +1 503 390 2044 +1 971 216 4990 erinc@novationlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Wyoming Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jeremy A Gross +1 307 777 6946 +1 307 777 3542 jeremy.gross@wyo.gov
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John H Ridge +1 307 777 7862 +1 307 777 8920 john.ridge@wyo.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by The Pietz Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Morgan E. Pietz +1 310 424 5557 +1 310 546 5301 mepietz@pietzlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 10

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Doe 10

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Lory R Lybeck +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 4255 lory@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Charles P. LaPolla +1 212 382 0700 +1 212 382 0888 clapolla@ostrolenk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perry, Krumsiek & Jack, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Timothy M. Cornell +1 617 720 4300 tcornell@pkjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tishler & Wald, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Alexander D. Kerr, Jr. +1 312 876 3800 +1 312 876 3816 akerr@tishlerandwald.com
No Logo Doe #11, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguero Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Matthew Bryan Aguero +1 720 325 6787 maguero@aguerolawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Byrd and Byrd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Timothy Patrick Leahy +1 301 464 7448 +1 301 805 5178 tleahy@byrdandbyrd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tishler & Wald, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alexander D. Kerr, Jr. +1 312 876 3800 +1 312 876 3816 akerr@tishlerandwald.com
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CHAVEZ LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Robert H Chavez +1 206 789 1614 roberthchavez@chavezlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Theodore R. Bynum, III +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 t.r.bynum@huschblackwell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mestemaker Straub

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Karl Van Gardner +1 713 626 8900 vgardner@msandz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mestemaker Straub Zumwalt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 David Kent Mestemaker +1 713 626 8900 dkm@mestemakerstraub.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHER & ASSOCIATES PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Arnold Richer
No Logo Doe 13, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by atlawip.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Jeffrey Thomas Breloski +1 404 495 3681 +1 404 365 9532 jbreloski@atlawip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Norman Rocco Cerullo +1 516 663 6600 +1 516 663 6835 ncerullo@rmfpc.com
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Jennifer Leigh Hartmann +1 516 663 6600 +1 516 663 6743 jhartmann@rmfpc.com
No Logo Doe 13a, Defendant
No Logo Doe 13b, Defendant
No Logo Doe 13c, Defendant
No Logo Doe 13d, Defendant
No Logo Doe 14, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 14

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Doe 14

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kent L Greenberg PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent L. Greenberg +1 410 363 1020 +1 410 363 1022 kent@klgreenberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven C Vondran PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Charles Vondran +1 877 276 5084 +1 888 551 2252 law@attorneysteve.net

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean T. Carnathan +1 781 359 9002 +1 781 359 9001 scarnathan@ocmlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E Whitaker +1 206 436 8500 john@whitaker.law
No Logo Doe 15, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leslie Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Doe 15

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter R. Irvine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter R. Irvine

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of John M G Murphy LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M G Murphy +1 410 244 6700 +1 866 260 1396 jmurphy@johnmgmurphylaw.com
No Logo Doe 15a, Defendant
No Logo Doe 16, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Godfread Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul A Godfread +1 612 284 7325 +1 612 605 6001 paul@godfreadlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven C Vondran PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Charles Vondran +1 877 276 5084 +1 888 551 2252 law@attorneysteve.net
No Logo Doe 17, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2014 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
No Logo Doe 18, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 18

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/11/2013 Doe 18

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scot Sikes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/11/2013 William R. Wohlsifer +1 850 219 8888 +1 866 829 8174 william@wohlsifer.com
No Logo Doe 19, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee & Hayes PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder chris@leehayes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarthy Winkelman and Morrow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael John Winkelman +1 301 262 7422 +1 301 262 0562 mike@mcwmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Harbor Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine Isabelle Casey Rajwani +1 508 842 9244 +1 508 842 9311 crajwani@harborlaw.com
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel A. Bushnell +1 561 835 9400
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Booth Sweet LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel G. Booth +1 617 250 8602 +1 617 250 8883 dbooth@boothsweet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Jacksonville, Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Craig D. Feiser +1 904 630 1834 +1 904 630 1316 cfeiser@coj.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Manuel J Dominguez - NOT SWORN +1 561 578 6850 +1 202 408 4699 jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe #2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 2

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parks Bauer Sime & Winkler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Billy M. Sime +1 503 371 3502 +1 503 371 0429 bsime@pbswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John E Whitaker +1 206 436 8500 john@whitaker.law
No Logo Doe 20, Defendant
No Logo Doe #3, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Dale J Montpelier +1 865 673 0330 dalemontpelier@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Stephen K Perry +1 865 673 0330 +1 865 673 0440 stephenkperry@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ali Law Practice LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Tawfiq Innas Ali +1 312 546 5081 tali@alilawpractice.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Ankur V Shah +1 312 724 7807 ashah@alilawpractice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 3

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 3

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
No Logo Doe 4, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cashman Law Firm, Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert Z. Cashman +1 713 364 3476 rzcashman@cashmanlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 4

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 4

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Schubert Barer (Anch)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John Crosetto jcrosetto@gsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scot Sikes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 William R. Wohlsifer +1 850 219 8888 +1 866 829 8174 william@wohlsifer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Molari, Edward R.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Edward R. Molari +1 617 942 1532 +1 815 642 8351 edward@molarilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE RUSSELL FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Erin Kathryn Russell +1 312 994 2424 +1 312 706 9766 erin@russellfirmchicago.com
No Logo Doe #5, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
No Logo Doe 5a, Defendant
No Logo Doe 6, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David J. McGuire +1 860 586 8900 dmcguire@acluct.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel Mach +1 202 637 6313 dmach@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Americans United for Sep of Church & State (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alex J. Luchenitser +1 202 466 3234 luchenitser@au.org
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert S.H. Shapiro +1 202 466 3234 shapiro@au.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Public Representation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Sandra J. Staub +1 413 586 6024 +1 413 586 5711 sstaub@cpr-ma.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 6

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 6

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
No Logo Doe 7, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John M Kuranty +1 630 322 8548 +1 708 430 1119 jkurantylaw@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David J. McGuire +1 860 586 8900 dmcguire@acluct.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel Mach +1 202 637 6313 dmach@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Americans United for Sep of Church & State (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alex J. Luchenitser +1 202 466 3234 luchenitser@au.org
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert S.H. Shapiro +1 202 466 3234 shapiro@au.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Public Representation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Sandra J. Staub +1 413 586 6024 +1 413 586 5711 sstaub@cpr-ma.org

Toggle Switch Represented by MORSE BRATT ANDREWS & TERRY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John Carlson Terry +1 360 213 2040 jterry@mbavancouverlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Swider Medeiros & Haver LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jessica L. McKie +1 503 226 8122 +1 503 295 2737 jmckie@smhllaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 TTAB Attorney Placeholder robert@smhllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VRP Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David N. Oskin +1 312 854 7090 david@caliberip.com
No Logo Doe #8, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguero Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Matthew Bryan Aguero +1 720 325 6787 maguero@aguerolawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaheen Guerrera & O'Leary, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Nicholas S. Guerrera +1 978 689 0800 +1 978 794 0890 nguerrera@sgolawoffice.com
No Logo Doe 9, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Summons (proposed)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None response
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order on ExParte Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None ~Ex Parte Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None ~Ex Parte Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Motion for Entry of Default
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None supplement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Order on ExParte Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None ~Ex Parte Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None ~Ex Parte Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Summons (proposed)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Link
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Link
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Link
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None terminate hearings
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Case Reassignment
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Link
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Summons (proposed)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Dismissal
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of Dismissal
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Dismissal
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Dismissal
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Order on ExParte Motion
                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER DISMISSING OBJECTION AND COMPELLING WITNESS CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS TO DISCLOSE IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION OF DEFENDANT DOE 9 AND DENYING OBJECTION TO SUBPOENA re [19] - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/9/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Dismissal
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DOE DEFENDANT NO. 1 AND WITH PREJUDICE OF DOE 15a Venice PI, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                EO: The hearing on 19 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Order Dismissing Objection of Doe 9 and Compelling Witness Charter Communications to Disclose Identification Information of Defendant Doe 9 ("Motion") is set for hearing on 11/28/2017, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before the Honorable Kenneth J. Mansfield. Any opposition to the Motion shall be filed by 11/07/2017. Plaintiff may file a reply by 11/14/2017. (Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  EX PARTE Motion order Dismissing Objection of Doe 9 and Compelling Charter Communications Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC (Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DOE DEFENDANT NO. 12 Venice PI, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Notice of Dismissal
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DOE DEFENDANT NO. 6 Venice PI, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: 10/9/2017 Notice of Dismissal
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DOE DEFENDANTS NO. 8 AND NO. 14 Venice PI, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Notice of Dismissal
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Dismissal of Doe 10 with prejudice Venice PI, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition to [13] Objection of Doe 9 filed by Venice PI, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry) Modified on 9/21/2017 to add linkage to related document (emt, ).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Objection
                                                                                                                              OBJECTION to Disclosure of Information Subpoenaed of Time Warner Cable Internet LLC; Certificate of Service re [10] - filed by Doe 9. (Attachments: # (1) Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                EO: For good cause shown, Court GRANTS 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint and Summons until January 11, 2018.Furthermore, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 09/11/2017 IS CONTINUED TO 02/15/2018 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are now due by 02/08/2018. (Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE Motion for extension of time to serve complaint Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration re motion)(Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE re 9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/24/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE Motion for leave to serve third party subpoena Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support of motion)(Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Venice PI, LLC Copyright Report Venice PI, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (emt, ) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: # 1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: # 1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, # 2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 9/11/2017 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/17/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 17-00335 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Venice PI, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Lost Dog Productions, LLC, Other Affiliate Voltage Productions, LLC for Venice PI, LLC.. (Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 07/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1899526.), filed by Venice PI, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 07/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Advisory Entry
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Advisory Entry
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?