Washington et al v. Sessions et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-05625
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 17, 2020 at 11:39 AM EDT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Alexis Bortell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hillerpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Steven Hiller +1 212 319 4000 +1 212 753 4530 mhiller@hillerpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Joseph A Bondy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MICHAEL KENNEDY PC - NEW YORK CITY NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Clifford Holland +1 212 935 4500 +1 212 980 6881 david.holland@att.net
No Logo Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hillerpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Steven Hiller +1 212 319 4000 +1 212 753 4530 mhiller@hillerpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Joseph A Bondy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MICHAEL KENNEDY PC - NEW YORK CITY NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Clifford Holland +1 212 935 4500 +1 212 980 6881 david.holland@att.net
No Logo Dean Bortell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hillerpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Steven Hiller +1 212 319 4000 +1 212 753 4530 mhiller@hillerpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Joseph A Bondy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MICHAEL KENNEDY PC - NEW YORK CITY NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Clifford Holland +1 212 935 4500 +1 212 980 6881 david.holland@att.net
No Logo Jagger Cotte, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hillerpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Steven Hiller +1 212 319 4000 +1 212 753 4530 mhiller@hillerpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Joseph A Bondy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MICHAEL KENNEDY PC - NEW YORK CITY NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Clifford Holland +1 212 935 4500 +1 212 980 6881 david.holland@att.net
No Logo Jose Belen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hillerpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Steven Hiller +1 212 319 4000 +1 212 753 4530 mhiller@hillerpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Joseph A Bondy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MICHAEL KENNEDY PC - NEW YORK CITY NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Clifford Holland +1 212 935 4500 +1 212 980 6881 david.holland@att.net
No Logo Marvin Washington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hillerpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Steven Hiller +1 212 319 4000 +1 212 753 4530 mhiller@hillerpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Joseph A Bondy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MICHAEL KENNEDY PC - NEW YORK CITY NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Clifford Holland +1 212 935 4500 +1 212 980 6881 david.holland@att.net
No Logo Sebastien Cotte, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hillerpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Steven Hiller +1 212 319 4000 +1 212 753 4530 mhiller@hillerpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Joseph A Bondy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MICHAEL KENNEDY PC - NEW YORK CITY NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Clifford Holland +1 212 935 4500 +1 212 980 6881 david.holland@att.net
v.
No Logo Administrator Charles P. Rosenberg, Defendant
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Hilliard Dolinger +1 212 637 2677 samuel.dolinger@usdoj.gov
No Logo Charles Chuck Rosenberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Hilliard Dolinger +1 212 637 2677 samuel.dolinger@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "US Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Hilliard Dolinger +1 212 637 2677 samuel.dolinger@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Drug Enforcement Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Hilliard Dolinger +1 212 637 2677 samuel.dolinger@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Drug Enforcement Agency (D.E.A.), Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331dp
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 40 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION to Dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Responses due by 11/27/2017. Replies due by 12/11/2017.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/9/2017) (ras) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte.(Holland, David) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 38 Letter, filed by Jose Belen, Marvin Washington, Jagger Cotte, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Sebastien Cotte, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Responses due by 11/10/2017. Replies due by 11/22/2017.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/1/2017) (ras) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Lauren A. Rudick dated October 31, 2017 re: Request for adjournment of the parties' briefing schedule. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington.(Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Robert W. Patterson, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Agency, United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Agency, United States of America, Robert W. Patterson.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 9/8/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 9/8/2017 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER: At the case management conference held September 8, 2017, I suggested to the parties that discovery proceed according to a schedule to be agreed to, and that a motion to dismiss by the government be deferred. The government insists, however, that it wishes to test the legal sufficiency of the complaint before discovery, and that it can file a motion promptly. Upon reconsideration, I order as follows: 1. The government shall file its motion, pursuant to either Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b), or, upon answering, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c), by October 13, 2017. 2. Plaintiffs shall file opposition papers by November 3, 2017. 3. The government shall file reply papers by November 15, 2017. 4. Discovery shall await determination of this motion. 5. Both parties shall prepare the papers required for their Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), so that production can be made within seven days after the motion is determined, if it is determined favorably to plaintiffs. (Motions due by 10/13/2017. Responses due by 11/3/2017. Replies due by 11/15/2017.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/20/2017) (ras) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Michael S. Hiller dated 9-15-17 re: Opposing Counsel's Violation of the Judge's Rules. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington.(Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Samuel Dolinger dated 9/15/2017 re: Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' letter filed September 14, 2017. Document filed by Charles Chuck Rosenberg, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Agency, United States of America.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Michael S. Hiller dated 9/14/17 re: Joint Scheduling Letter Regarding Discovery. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email, # 2 Exhibit Email, # 3 Exhibit Email, # 4 Exhibit Email, # 5 Exhibit Email)(Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Samuel Dolinger dated 9/14/2017 re: Defendants' response to the Court's order regarding discovery scheduling. Document filed by Charles Chuck Rosenberg, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Agency, United States of America.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Lauren A. Rudick dated September 11, 2017 re: Extension to Submit Joint Scheduling Letter Regarding Discovery. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington.(Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Samuel Dolinger dated 9/11/2017 re: request for reconsideration of the Court's scheduling determinations. Document filed by Charles Chuck Rosenberg, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Agency, United States of America.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER DENYING A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: On September 7, 2017, plaintiffs filed an order to show cause seeking a temporary restraining order in this action. I heard both parties in an on-the-record hearing on September 8, 2017. Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order is denied. After considering the four requirements for issuing a temporary injunction, and for the reasons stated on the record, I hold that the requirements are not satisfied. See Am. Civil Liberties Union v. Clapper, 804 F.3d 617, 622 (2d Cir. 2015) ("A party seeking a preliminary injunction must generally show a likelihood of success on the merits, a likelihood of irreparable harm in the absence of preliminary relief, that the balance of equities tips in the party's favor, and that an injunction is in the public interest."). A complete record is required. The parties shall proceed as expeditiously as is just and proper. The hearing will consolidate the hearing on a motion for a preliminary injunction with the trial on the merits. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2) ("Before or after beginning the hearing on a motion for a preliminary injunction, the court may advance the trial on the merits and consolidate it with the hearing."). Discovery shall commence promptly. The parties shall confer and submit a joint letter on September 11, 2017 to outline the discovery that will be necessary in this case, along with a proposed discovery and briefing schedule. A hearing will be scheduled promptly thereafter. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/11/2017) (ap) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Charles Chuck Rosenberg served on 9/7/2017, answer due 9/28/2017; Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III served on 9/7/2017, answer due 9/28/2017; United States Department of Justice served on 9/7/2017, answer due 9/28/2017; United States Drug Enforcement Agency served on 9/7/2017, answer due 9/28/2017; United States of America served on 9/7/2017, answer due 9/28/2017. Service was made by MAIL (Email). Document filed by Jagger Cotte; Alexis Bortell; Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc.; Dean Bortell; Jose Belen; Marvin Washington; Sebastien Cotte. (Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of Charles Chuck Rosenberg, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Agency, United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint,,, against Charles Chuck Rosenberg, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Agency, United States of America.Document filed by Jagger Cotte, Alexis Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Dean Bortell, Jose Belen, Marvin Washington, Sebastien Cotte. Related document: 1 Complaint,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Poll, # 2 Exhibit Photo, # 3 Exhibit Article, # 4 Exhibit Article, # 5 Exhibit Decision, # 6 Exhibit Patent Application, # 7 Exhibit Memorandum, # 8 Exhibit Memorandum, # 9 Exhibit Memorandum, # 10 Exhibit Court Application)(Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jagger Cotte, Alexis Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Dean Bortell, Jose Belen, Marvin Washington, Sebastien Cotte. (Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (rch) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Drug Enforcement Agency. (rch) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles Chuck Rosenberg. (rch) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice. (rch) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III. (rch) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc..(Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Aaron Bondy on behalf of Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington. (Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington. (Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHARLES "CHUCK" ROSENBERG, in his official capacity as the Acting Director of the Drug Enforcement Agency, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington. (Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington. (Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, in his official capacity as the United States Attorney General, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington. (Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Steven Hiller on behalf of Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington. New Address: Hiller, PC, 600 Madison Avenue, Floor 22, New York, New York, United States 10022, 2123194000. (Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Clifford Holland on behalf of Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte, Marvin Washington. (Holland, David) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY NAME & CAPTION ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte. (Hiller, Michael) Modified on 7/25/2017 (kl). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY NAME & CAPTION ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte. (Hiller, Michael) Modified on 7/25/2017 (kl). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY NAME & CAPTION ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to US DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte. (Hiller, Michael) Modified on 7/25/2017 (kl). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY NAME & CAPTION ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DEA CHIEF CHARLES P. ROSENBERG, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte. (Hiller, Michael) Modified on 7/25/2017 (kl). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY NAME & CAPTION ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATTORNEY GENERAL JEFFREY B. SESSIONS III, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Belen, Alexis Bortell, Dean Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Jagger Cotte, Sebastien Cotte. (Hiller, Michael) Modified on 7/25/2017 (kl). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Charles P. Rosenberg, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, US Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Agency (D.E.A.). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13935001)Document filed by Jagger Cotte, Alexis Bortell, Cannabis Cultural Association, Inc., Dean Bortell, Jose Belen, Marvin Washington, Sebastien Cotte. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Quinnipiac Poll, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Hemp for Victory, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Daily News Article, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4: Harper's Article, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5: Decision, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6: Cannabis Patent, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7: Ogden Memo, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8: Cole Memo, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9: FinCen Memo, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10: ASA Petition)(Hiller, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 443 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?