United States v. Seleznev
Criminal Case Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cr-00306
District Judge Steve C Jones, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 5:52 AM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Roman Seleznev, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Leonard Louis Franco +1 404 875 1300 lfrancolawfirm@aol.com
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Matthew Furness +1 206 851 6583 furness.matt@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Anna Goykhman +1 206 226 7996 anna_goykhman@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by 701 Fifth Ave.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Anthony Todaro +1 206 839 4830 anthony.todaro@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ G. Patrick Civille +1 671 472 8868 +1 671 472 2601 pciville@guamattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Andrea Delgadillo Ostrovsky +1 206 407 2200 +1 206 407 2224 andreao@calfoeakes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Civille and Tang, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Joseph C. Razzano +1 671 472 8868 +1 671 477 2511 jrazzano@guamattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CORR CRONIN MICHELSON BAUMGARDNER & PREECE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Steven W Fogg +1 206 625 8600 sfogg@corrcronin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE (SEA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Dennis Carroll +1 206 553 1100 dennis_carroll@fd.org
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Paula Semmes Deutsch +1 206 553 1100 +1553012 +15 553 0120 paula_deutsch@fd.org
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Russell V. Leonard +1 253 593 6710 RUSSELL_LEONARD@FD.ORG

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ ELY GOLDIN +1 215 661 9487 +1 215 699 0231 egoldin@foxrothschild.com
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Robert William Ray +1 212 878 7993 +1 212 692 0940 rwray@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GARVEY SCHUBERT BARER (WA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Laurence B Finegold +1 206 464 3939 +1 206 464 0125 lfinegold@gsblaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ David Hugh Smith +1 206 464 3939 +1 206 464 0125 dsmith@gsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN HENRY BROWNE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ John Henry Browne +1 206 388 0777 johnhenry@jhblawyer.com
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Emma Scanlan +1 206 388 0777 emma@jhblawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Federal Public Defender

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ John T. Gorman +1 671 472 7111 +1 671 472 7120 john_t_gorman@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Litvak Law Firm, Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
TRACK2
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Roman Ivanov
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Ruben Samvelich
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
nCuX
TERMINATED: 04/21/2017
also known as
Bulba
TERMINATED: 04/21/ Igor B. Litvak +1 718 989 2908 igor@litvaklawny.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Igor B. Litvak +1 718 989 2908 igor@litvaklawny.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF SENTENCING Set as to Roman Seleznev Sentencing set for 12/11/2017 at 02:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C Jones. (sap) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C Jones: Change of Plea Hearing held as to Roman Seleznev. PLEA of GUILTY to Count 1. (Attachments: # 1 Guilty Plea and Plea Agreement) (Court Reporter David Ritchie) Interpreted by Olga Gorenshteyn. (sap) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C Jones: INITIAL APPEARANCE and ARRAIGNMENT held as to Roman Seleznev. PLEA of NOT GUILTY to Counts 1,2,22-55. Estimated Trial Time status set. Added attorney Igor Litvak for Roman Seleznev. (Court Reporter David Ritchie) Interpreted by Olga Gorenshteyn. (sap) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CONSENT TO TRANSFER JURISDICTION (Rule 20) from USDC District of Nevada, case number 2:12-cr-4-APG-GWF-14 as to Roman Seleznev. (Attachments: # 1 Indictment, # 2 Motion to Unseal Indictment, # 3 Order to Unseal Indictment, # 4 Docket Sheet, # 5 Transmittal Letter)(sap) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 20 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?