Zirogiannis v. Seterus, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 17-140

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 13, 2017 at 11:32 PM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming judgment of the district court, by RKW, DC, SLC, FILED.[2122097] [17-140] [Entered: 09/12/2017 10:00 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[2122093] [17-140] [Entered: 09/12/2017 09:58 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NEW CASE MANAGER, Troy White, ASSIGNED.[2115085] [17-140] [Entered: 08/31/2017 03:55 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER, dated 08/18/2017, Appellant's counsel Daniel A. Edelman's request to bring in a laptop computer and cellular phone into Courtroom 1703 is GRANTED, counsel's request for a mobile wi-fi hotspot is DENIED, FILED.[2103982] [17-140] [Entered: 08/18/2017 09:53 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Nicholas Zirogiannis, dated 08/16/2017, in re: permission request for oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[2102584] [17-140]--[Edited 08/17/2017 by AS] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:08 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Seterus, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2075074] [17-140] [Entered: 07/10/2017 05:10 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Nicholas Zirogiannis, FILED. Service date 07/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2074316] [17-140] [Entered: 07/10/2017 10:54 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2071798] [17-140] [Entered: 07/06/2017 10:54 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 62 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?