District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  1. Case No. 17-1722
    Filed 5/31/2017
  2. Case No. 16-3945
    Filed 11/23/2016
  3. Case No. 18-2868
    Filed 9/28/2018
  4. Case No. 17-1625
    Filed 5/19/2017
United States Supreme Court

Giuffre v. Maxwell
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 17-1722

Tags
Last Updated March 8, 2019 at 2:19 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Maxwell, Ghislaine Maxwell, Ghislaine, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ghislaine Maxwell"
Epstein, Jeffrey E. Epstein, Jeffrey E., Respondent
Officially listed as "Jeffrey Epstein"
Officer/Director, Priceline.com Inc.
Officer/Director, Advo, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mdc Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Ozark Holding Inc.
Officer/Director, Shutterstock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Twilio, Inc.
Officer/Director, Poshmark, Inc.
No Logo Sharon Churcher, Respondent
Dershowitz, Alan M. Dershowitz, Alan M., Intervenor - Appellant
Officially listed as "Alan M. Dershowitz"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew George Celli +1 212 763 5000
Space David A. Lebowitz
No Logo Cernovich, Michael, Intervenor - Appellant
Officially listed as "Michael Cernovich, Dba Cernovich Media"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc John Randazza +1 888 667 1113 +1 305 437 7662 MJR@randazza.com
Space Jay Marshall Wolman +1 702 420 2001 +1 305 437 7662 jmw@randazza.com
No Logo American Society Of News Editors, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
The Associated Press The Associated Press, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "Associated Press"
No Logo Association Of Alternative Newsmedia, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Association Of Magazine Media, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Bay Area News Group, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Daily News, LP, Amicus Curiae
No Logo First Amendment Coalition, Amicus Curiae
No Logo First Look Media Works, Inc., Amicus Curiae
No Logo Gannett Company, Inc., Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "Gannett Co., Inc."
No Logo Investigative Reporting Workshop At American University, Amicus Curiae
No Logo National Press Photographers Association, Amicus Curiae
No Logo New England First Amendment Coalition, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Online News Association, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Radio Television Digital News Association, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Society Of Professional Journalists, Amicus Curiae
No Logo The E.W. Scripps Company, Amicus Curiae
No Logo The International Documentary Association, Amicus Curiae
No Logo The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
No Logo Tully Center For Free Speech, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Virginia L. Giuffre, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Cassell +1 801 585 5202
Space Bradley James Edwards +1 954 524 2820 +1 954 524 2822 brad@pathtojustice.com
Nature of Suit 4320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=15-cv-7433
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=15-cv-7433
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CASE, before JAC, RSP, CFD, HEARD.[2511923] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206710598 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    *REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2507077] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT[2501662-2], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED.[2502066] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206696150 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, acknowledgment and notice of appearance[153], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, FILED.[2501585] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 02/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2501539] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206693581 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2500614] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 03/06/2019, SET.[2475914] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206629129 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION ORDER, granting in part motion to adjourn oral argument [2460734-2] filed by Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, the oral argument is rescheduled to Wednesday, March 6, 2019 at 4 p.m., FILED. [2475907][148] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 02/06/2019, SET.[2433831] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206517847 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AMENDED ORDER, dated 11/14/2018, directing appeals 16-3945 and 18-2868 to be heard in tandem, and setting argument date as 02/06/2019, FILED.[2433815] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206517669 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ORDER, directing appeals 16-3945 and 18-2868 to be heard in tandem, and setting argument date as 02/06/2019, FILED.[2433749] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206512608 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ORDER, dated 11/13/2018, adjourning oral argument for Thursday, December 6, 2018, oral argument will be rescheduled at a later date, FILED.[2431824] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206477967 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2418686] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 12/06/2018, SET.[2413612] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 12/03/2018, PROPOSED.[2398860] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ATTORNEY, Marc Randazza for Michael Cernovich[127], ADDED.[2382931] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206383747 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 09/05/2018 by CM/ECF. [2382858] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206344412 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2368050] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206085561 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 04/02/2018 by CM/ECF, email.[2270011] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206085428 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 04/02/2018 by CM/ECF.[2269963] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206084658 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 04/02/2018 by CM/ECF.[2269670] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206029142 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ORDER, dated 03/02/2018, instructing parties to file supplemental briefs regarding the question of appellate jurisdiction in this case; the supplemental briefs must be submitted by 04/02/2018, FILED.[2248556] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 00206011304 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Certificate of Service of Confidential Appellee Brief (Sealed per DE 178-179], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 02/22/2018 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[2241786] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206004354 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal Appellee's brief; to the extent that they have not yet done so, the parties are also hereby instructed to brief for the merits panel the question of appellate jurisdiction [81] filed by Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, by ALK, DAL, MEYER, D.J., FILED. [2239140][114] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205981189 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2230392] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. [2247604] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Paul Cassell, Esq. for Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 01/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2208161] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205911466 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file reply brief under seal [2201303-2] filed by Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, by PWH, FILED. [2204012][105] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          SEALED REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, FILED. [2207857] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205907082 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Jay Marshall Wolman, Esq. for Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2202400] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205907079 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Reply Brief of Michael Cernovich d/b/a Cernovich Media, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF.[2202399] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205907076 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2202398] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205906551 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Andrew G. Celli, Jr. for Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2202196] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205906156 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Confidential Reply Brief for Intervenor-Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF.[2202049] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205906142 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REDACTED REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2202046] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205888900 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION ORDER, referring motion to seal document [81] filed by Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, by CFD, FILED. [2195478][88] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205885807 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          REPLY TO OPPOSITION [82], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2194300][84] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205884810 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            REDACTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2193926] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205882658 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [81], on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2193128] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205882114 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2192908] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205840329 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file an oversized brief of 15,000 words [77] filed by Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, by RAK, FILED. [2177022][80] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205836342 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 11/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2175520] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Associated Press, Association of Alternative Newsmedia, Bay Area News Group, Daily News, L.P., The E.W. Scripps Company, First Amendment Coalition, First Look Media Works, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., International Documentary Assn., Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Association of Magazine Media, National Press Photographers Association, New England First Admendment Coalition, Online News Association, Radio Television Digital News Association, Society of Professional Journalists and Tully Center for Free Speech , ADDED.[2133191] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205722895 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-198), on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 09/25/2017 by CM/ECF.[2133027] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205722889 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 09/25/2017 by CM/ECF.[2133025] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205715678 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, Brief and Appendix, [66], [67], on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, FILED.[2130287] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205714259 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Associated Press, Association of Alternative Newsmedia, Bay Area News Group, Daily News, L.P., The E.W. Scripps Company, First Amendment Coalition, First Look Media Works, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., International Documentary Assn., Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Association of Magazine Media, National Press Photographers Association, New England First Admendment Coalition, Online News Association, Radio Television Digital News Association, Society of Professional Journalists and Tully Center for Free Speech, FILED. Service date 09/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2129772] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]--[Edited 09/26/2017 by AM]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CORRECTED APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 09/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2128740] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 09/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2128739] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205704360 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945 Brief due date as 12/13/2017, FILED.[2125949] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205703336 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, informing Court of proposed due date 12/13/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 09/15/2017 by CM/ECF.[2125587] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205697385 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Brief for Intervenor-Appellant Michael Cernovich d/b/a Cernovich Media and Appendix of Intervenor-Appellant Michael Cernovich d/b/a Cernovich Media, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2123342] [17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-198), on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2123330] [17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625]
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2123324] [17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625]
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205664859 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file sealed brief [2107572-2] [2107579-2], filed by Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, by RSP, FILED. [2110995][46] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205670978 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                DISTRICT COURT SEALING ORDER, dated 08/09/2016, RECEIVED.[2113385] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by US mail.[2112594] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by US mail.[2112592] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by US mail.[2112577] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        SEALED SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. [2112575] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. [2112572] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205661743 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Confidential Brief for Intervenor-Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, Confidential Special Appendix, and Confidential Joint Appendix Volumes IV - VI, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109810] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205661740 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              REDACTED SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109809] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205661728 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                REDACTED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, (pp. 1177-1436), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109804] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205661706 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  REDACTED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, (pp. 915-1176), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109797] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205661676 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    REDACTED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 654-914), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109787] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205661667 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, (pp. 437-653), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109784] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205661648 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, (pp. 219-436), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109778] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205661645 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, (pp. 1-218), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109776] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205661603 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            REDACTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109763] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              CAPTION, to reflect consolidation of appeal 16-3945 with appeals 17-1625 and 17-1722, AMENDED.[2081409] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205587054 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals 16-3945 with appeals 17-1625 and 17-1722; Appellant's brief is due 08/24/2017 [2080216-2][2081255-2] filed by Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. [2081388][30] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205548358 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, dated 06/27/2017, setting Appellant Michael Cernovich's brief and appendix filing due date as 09/13/2017, FILED.[2066783] [17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205547783 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 17-1625, informing Court of proposed due date 09/21/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 06/26/2017 by CM/ECF.[2066548] [17-1722, 17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205528534 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2059291] [17-1722, 17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205526947 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich, FILED. Service date 06/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2058700] [17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205526941 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich, FILED. Service date 06/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2058699] [17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205526938 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 06/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2058698] [17-1722, 17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205517872 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 06/09/2017 by CM/ECF.[2055217] [17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                CURED DEFECTIVE, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [14], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED.[2055010] [17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY, Paul Cassell for Virginia L. Giuffre, in case 17-1722 Paul Cassell for Virginia L. Giuffre, in case 17-1625 , [14], ADDED.[2055008] [17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205517164 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 06/09/2017 by CM/ECF. [2054948] [17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205513555 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [12], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 17-1625, FILED.[2053546] [17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 06/07/2017 by CM/ECF. [2053252] [17-1625, 17-1722]
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          CURED DEFECTIVE, Form C and D, [2049737-2], [2049742-2], on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED.[2049841] [17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205502844 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C and D, [7], [8], on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED.[2049483] [17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 17-1722, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 06/02/2017 by CM/ECF.[2049446] [17-1722, 17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Brief for Intervenor-Appellant Michael Cernovich d/b/a Cernovich Media and Appendix of Intervenor-Appellant Michael Cernovich d/b/a Cernovich Media, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2123342] [17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625] [Entered: 09/13/2017 11:34 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 17-1722, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 06/02/2017 by CM/ECF.[2049445] [17-1722, 17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-198), on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2123330] [17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625] [Entered: 09/13/2017 11:30 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205496839 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2047206] [17-1722, 17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2123324] [17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625] [Entered: 09/13/2017 11:27 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, district court receipt # 0208-13725473, FILED.[2047201] [17-1722, 17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            DISTRICT COURT SEALING ORDER, dated 08/09/2016, RECEIVED.[2113385] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/30/2017 10:50 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205496816 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 05/03/2017, RECEIVED.[2047198] [17-1722, 17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file sealed brief [2107572-2] [2107579-2], filed by Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, by RSP, FILED. [2110995][46] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/28/2017 10:29 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00205496802 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, FILED. [2047191] [17-1722, 17-1625]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 975 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?