Acosta v. Wellfleet Communications
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-02353
District Judge Gloria M. Navarro, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 18, 2020 at 7:22 PM ST (4.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas E Perez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick A Rose +1 702 388 6336 +1 702 388 6735 Patrick.Rose@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura C. Bremer +1 415 625 7757 +1 415 625 7772 bremer.laura@dol.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Edeli +1 415 625 7753 +1 415 625 7772 edeli.david.l@dol.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Mace Kasameyer +1 415 625 7742 +1 415 625 7772 kasameyer.katherine@dol.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Seletsky +1 213 894 4983 seletsky.susan@dol.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara E Stearns +1 415 625 7741 +1 415 625 7745 stearns.tara.e@dol.gov
v.
No Logo Allen Roach, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Litigation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Malani L. Kotchka +1 702 834 8777 +1 702 834 5262 mlk@hmlawlv.com
No Logo Wellfleet Communications, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Litigation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Malani L. Kotchka +1 702 834 8777 +1 702 834 5262 mlk@hmlawlv.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (167) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Set Aside
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order Show Cause
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/29/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER Denying 64 Motion to Dismiss, Denying 71 Motion to Dismiss, Denying 148 Motion for Summary Judgment, Denying 149 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 150 Motion for Summary Judgment. Supplemental Brief with calculation of damages due by 10/15/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER Re: In Camera Review re 134 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 125 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Against Defendants Ryan Roach, New Choice Communications, Inc., and Lighthouse Communications, LLC is granted. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER Granting 144 Motion to Admit Government Attorney: Marc A Pilotin for R. Alexander Acosta. Attorney Susan Seletsky terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 150 Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Stearns Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Stearns Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Stearns Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Stearns Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Stearns Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 7 to Stearns Declaration) (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 145 Motion Hearing, held on 6/5/2018, before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court (Reporter) Transcriber: Amber McClane, AM@nvd.uscourts.gov. Recording start and end times: 2:31 p.m. - 3:38 p.m. Any Redaction Request is due by 7/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 8/5/2018. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 10/3/2018. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter. The Transcript Order Form is available on the court website. After that date, the transcript may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (AMM) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    View corrected image 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Responses due by 7/20/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tara Stearns, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit 47, # 49 Exhibit 48, # 50 Exhibit 49, # 51 Exhibit 50, # 52 Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit 54 # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit 60, # 62 Exhibit 61, # 63 Exhibit 62, # 64 Exhibit 63, # 65 Exhibit 64, # 66 Exhibit 65, # 67 Exhibit 66, # 68 Exhibit 67 to Stearns Decl., # 69 Exhibit 68, # 70 Exhibit 69, # 71 Declaration of Michael Eastwood, # 72 Exhibit A Eastwood Decl., # 73 Exhibit B Eastwood Decl., # 74 Exhibit C Eastwood Decl., # 75 Exhibit D Eastwood Decl., # 76 Exhibit E Eastwood Decl., # 77 Exhibit F Eastwood Decl., # 78 Declaration of Alisa Ann 1/24/2017, # 79 Declaration of Alisa Ann 9/19/2017, # 80 Index of Exhibits, # 81 Certificate of Service) (Stearns, Tara) Modified on 7/12/2018. (RFJ) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc., Ryan Roach. Responses due by 7/20/2018. (Golden, Anthony) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 7/20/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 thru 2, # 2 Exhibit 3 part 1, # 3 Exhibit 3 part 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 part 3, # 5 Exhibit 3 part 4, # 6 Exhibit 4 part 1, # 7 Exhibit 4 part 2, # 8 Exhibit 4 part 3, # 9 Exhibit 5 part 1, # 10 Exhibit 5 part 2, # 11 Exhibit 6 thru 10) (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony B. Golden. (Golden, Anthony) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 138 Motion Hearing, held on 5/9/2018, before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court (Reporter) Transcriber: Amber McClane, AM@nvd.uscourts.gov. Recording start and end times: 10:28 a.m. - 11:22 a.m. Any Redaction Request is due by 6/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 7/7/2018. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 9/4/2018. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter. The Transcript Order Form is available on the court website. After that date, the transcript may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (AMM) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: David Edeli; Def Counsel: Malani Kotchka; Recording start and end times: 2:31p.m. - 3:38p.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to 134 Motion to Compel re: Production of Documents. The Court will take the matter under submission, written order to follow. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Marc A. Pilotin by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marc A. Pilotin, # 2 Proposed Order) (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER Granting 142 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 134 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing reset for 6/5/2018 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    FIRST STIPULATION to Continue re: 136 MINUTE ORDER - Motion Hearing on 134 Motion to Compel; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY to Response to 134 Motion to Compel, by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H) (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        RESPONSE to 134 Motion to Compel, filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Replies due by 5/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Edeli, # 2 Exhibit A7-A12, # 3 Exhibit A13-A16, # 4 Exhibit A17, # 5 Exhibit B-G, # 6 Declaration of Bryan Jarrett) (Edeli, David) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER granting 137 Stipulation. Motions due by 6/29/2018. Responses due by 8/15/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2018 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: David Edeli; Def Counsel: Anthony Golden; Recording start and end times: 10:28a.m. - 11:22a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to 125 First Motion to Compel Documents from defendants Ryan Roach, New Choice Communications, Inc., and Lighthouse Communications. The Court will take the matter under submission, written order to follow. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) re 109 Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 4/30/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Taelor Evans. Re: 135 Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion, 134 Motion to Compel. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Discovery Hearing set for Friday May 25, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. is reset for Thursday, May 24, 2018 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TE) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 4/26/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Taelor Evans.Re: 134 MOTION to Compel re: Production of Documents Motion Hearing set for May 25, 2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom to be determined. before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TE) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION to Compel re: Production of Documents; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 5/9/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1 thru A10, # 3 Exhibit A11, # 4 Exhibit A12 thru A15, # 5 Exhibit A16, # 6 Exhibit A17, # 7 Exhibit A18) (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPLY to Response to 125 Motion to Compel,, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Edeli, # 2 Exhibit A-E) (Edeli, David) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        REPLY to Response to 124 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RESPONSE to 125 Motion to Compel,, by Defendants Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc., Ryan Roach. Replies due by 4/24/2018. (Golden, Anthony) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER Granting 127 Stipulation to Continue Hearing Re: 125 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing reset for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              RESPONSE to 124 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendants Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc., Ryan Roach. Replies due by 4/17/2018. (Golden, Anthony) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RESPONSE to 124 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Replies due by 4/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  FIRST STIPULATION to Continue re 126 MINUTE ORDER on Motion Hearing, filed by Defendants Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc., Ryan Roach. (Golden, Anthony) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 4/4/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Taelor Evans. Re: 125 First MOTION to Compel Documents from Defendants Ryan Roach, New Choice Communications, Inc., and Lighthouse Communications, LLC by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Motion Hearing set for Thursday, May 1, 2018 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TE) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      First MOTION to Compel Documents from Defendants Ryan Roach, New Choice Communications, Inc., and Lighthouse Communications, LLC by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Responses due by 4/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tara Stearns, # 2 Exhibit A - C to Stearns Declaration, # 3 Exhibit D - E to Stearns Declaration, # 4 Exhibit F - J to Stearns Declaration, # 5 Exhibit K - N to Stearns Declaration, # 6 Exhibit O - P to Stearns Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Q - S to Stearns Declaration, # 8 Declaration of Alisa Ann dated 1/24/2017, # 9 Declaration of Alisa Ann dated 9/19/2017) (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct 44 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Responses due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Filing, # 2 Declaration of David Edeli and Exhibits Thereto) (Edeli, David) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          RESPONSE to 119 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER re 119 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Wellfleet's and Allen Roach's objections to the production of documents submitted for in camera review are overruled. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/8/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Non COMPLIANCE with Local Rules LR IC 2-2 and Docket Correction to Document 119 : ERROR: Document should have been properly linked to establish the docket-entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). CORRECTION: The Court modified the entry to properly established docket entry relationship. Malani L. Kotchka is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Additionally, attorney Malani L. Kotchka is advised that continue failure to file document pursuant to the local rules governing electronic filing may cause a delay in filing document. (no image attached) (RFJ) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                RESPONSE to 113 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1 by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Edeli) (Edeli, David) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  OBJECTION/APPEAL Magistrate Judge order or ruling under LR IB 3-1 re: 112 ORDER; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 3/15/2018. (Kotchka, Malani) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR 2-2(d) by attorney Malani L. Kotchka. Court Modified entry to properly establish docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) on 3/2/2018 (RFJ). (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 117 OBJECTION re 116 Order on Stipulation; filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alisa Ann (9/2017), # 2 Declaration of Alisa Ann (12/2017), # 3 Declaration of Tara Stearns, # 4 Exhibit A-C to Stearns Decl,, # 5 Exhibit D-F to Stearns Decl., # 6 Exhibit G-O to Stearns Decl., # 7 Exhibit P-X to Stearns Declaration) (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      OBJECTION re: 116 ORDER - Review of Email Communications; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR 2-2(d) by attorney Malani L. Kotchka. Court corrected the event and modified entry to properly establish docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) LR IC 2-2(d) on 2/23/2018 (RFJ). (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 115 Stipulation for In-Camera Review of Email Communications. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/22/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          STIPULATION for In-Camera Review of Email Communications; filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 111 Motion Hearing, held on 2/2/18, before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donna Davidson, DD@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 3/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 3/24/2018. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 5/22/2018. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (DD) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              OBJECTION/APPEAL Magistrate Judge order or ruling under LR IB 3-1 re 110 Order on Motion for Sanctions, by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 3/1/2018. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 92 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions for DOL's Disobedience of a Discovery Order is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/15/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: Tara Stearns and David Edeli; Def Counsel: Malani Kotchka; Recording start and end times: 9:34a.m. - 10:18a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to 92 First Motion for Sanctions for DOL's Disobedience of a Discovery Order. The Court will take the matter under submission, written order to follow.Parties are to meet and confer regarding issues discussed in open court. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 82 Motion for Spoilation Sanctions for the reasons stated on the record during the 1/11/18 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 2/1/2018.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 86 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Scheduling Orderis granted in part, as follows: Discovery due by 4/25/2018. Motions due by 5/25/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 85 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is granted. Defendants shall serve supplemental responses to the requests for production of documents within fourteen days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 105 Motion Hearing, held on 1/11/18, before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donna Davidson, DD@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 2/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 2/26/2018. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 4/26/2018. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (DD) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 92 Motion for Sanctions by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 8) (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2018 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: Tara Stearns and David Edeli; Def Counsel: Anthony Golden and Malani Kotchka, also present Allen Roach; Recording start and end times: 1:32p.m. - 2:57p.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to 82 First Motion to Sanctions for Spoilation of Evidence, 83 First Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, 85 First Motion to Compel Documents, 86 Third Motion to Extend Time re: Scheduling Order, and 89 Motion to Strike re: 85 Motion to Compel.As to the 83 First Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, for the reasons stated on the record, the Court denies without prejudice to defendant pursuing a claim for damages against plaintiff for physical damage to Nobel Dialer during the time the dialer was in possession of counsel and/or agents.The Court denies 89 Motion to Strike re: 85 Motion to Compel, for the reasons stated on the record. As to 86 Third Motion to Extend Time re: Scheduling Order, the discovery is extended for 30-days. The Court will consider further extension of discovery, once the Court makes its ruling on the pending motions, as discussed in open court.The Court takes the following motions under submission 82 First Motion to Sanctions for Spoilation of Evidence and 85 First Motion to Compel Documents. Written ruling of the Court will be issue, as stated on the record. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 89 Motion to Strike, filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit 11, # 5 Exhibit 12, # 6 Exhibit 13 Part 1, # 7 Exhibit 13 Part 2, # 8 Exhibit 13 Part 3, # 9 Exhibit 13 Part 4, # 10 Exhibit 13 Part 5, # 11 Exhibit 14, # 12 Exhibit 15) (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 92 Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Replies due by 1/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tara Stearns, # 2 Declaration of Laura Bremer) (Edeli, David) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 86 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Edeli, David) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 99 Response by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tara Stearns) (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 85 Motion to Compel,, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 89 Motion to Strike, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Replies due by 1/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tara Stearns) (Stearns, Tara) Corrected image 101 attached on 1/5/2018 (DKJ). (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 83 Motion for Attorney Fees by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit I) (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 82 Motion for Sanctions by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit I) (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 86 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Replies due by 1/5/2018. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 85 Motion to Compel,, by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Replies due by 1/4/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Part 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Part 1, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Part 2, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Part 3, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 9-Part 1, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 9-Part 2, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 9-Part 3, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 10) (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/28/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. Re: 92 First MOTION for Sanctions for DOL's Disobedience of a Discovery Order Motion Hearing set for Friday, February 2, 2018 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/28/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. Re: 82 First MOTION for Sanctions for Spoilation of Evidence and 83 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED for Thursday, January 11, 2018 at 1:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Sanctions for DOL's Disobedience of a Discovery Order by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 1/10/2018. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 83 Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Replies due by 1/2/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alisa Ann, # 2 Declaration of Gaspar Montanez, # 3 Declaration of Tara Stearns, # 4 Exhibit A - F to Stearns Declaration, # 5 Exhibit G - L to Stearns Declaration, # 6 Exhibit M - Q to Stearns Declaration) (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 82 Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Replies due by 1/2/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alisa Ann, # 2 Declaration of Gaspar Montanez, # 3 Declaration of Tara Stearns, # 4 Exhibit A - F to Stearns Declaration, # 5 Exhibit G - L to Stearns Declaration, # 6 Exhibit M - Q to Stearns Declaration) (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike re: 85 MOTION to Compel; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 1/4/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2 Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 3 Part 3, # 8 Exhibit 3 Part 4, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7) (Kotchka, Malani) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Malani Kotchka. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile documents pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Court Modified entry to properly establish docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) on 12/21/2017 (RFJ). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/18/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. Re: 85 First MOTION to Compel Documents and 86 Third MOTION to Extend Time re: Scheduling Order. Motion Hearing set for January 11, 2018 at 1:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 71 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc., Ryan Roach. (Golden, Anthony) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Third MOTION to Extend Time (Third Request) re 78 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tara Stearns, # 2 Exhibit A - Q to Stearns Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order) (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Compel Documents by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Responses due by 12/28/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tara Stearns, # 2 Exhibit A - E to Stearns Declaration, # 3 Exhibit F - N to Stearns Declaration, # 4 Exhibit O - S to Stearns Declaration, # 5 Exhibit T - Y to Stearns Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Z - FF to Stearns Declaration, # 7 Exhibit GG - HH to Stearns Declaration, # 8 Declaration of Alisa Ann, # 9 Declaration of Gaspar Montanez, # 10 Proposed Order) (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/13/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. Re: 82 First MOTION for Sanctions for Spoilation of Evidence and 83 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Motion Hearing set for Thursday, January 4, 2018 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 12/26/2017. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Sanctions for Spoilation of Evidence, Including Dismissal, and for Award of Fees and Costs by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 12/26/2017. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 71 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Replies due by 12/15/2017. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 64 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L, # 7 Exhibit M, # 8 Exhibit N, # 9 Exhibit O, # 10 Exhibit P, # 11 Exhibit Q, # 12 Exhibit R, # 13 Exhibit S)(Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 76 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 64 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER Granting 77 Stipulation. Discovery due by 1/25/2018. Motions due by 3/16/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: 64 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR 2-2(d) by attorney Malani Kotchka. Court Modified entry to properly establish docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) on 11/14/2017 (RFJ). (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 39 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum on JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, N.A., and G&S Tax and Accounting Services, Inc.; and 41 Motion for Protective Order is granted, in part, and denied, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall, if necessary, submit a revised discovery plan and scheduling order in light of the time this matter has been under submission to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 64 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Replies due by 11/14/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alisa Ann (dated 1/24/17), # 2 Declaration of Alisa Ann, # 3 Declaration of Tara Stearns, # 4 Declaration of David Edeli, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C-M, # 8 Exhibit N-V)(Bremer, Laura) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER to 64 Motion to Dismiss,,,,,, ; filed by Defendants Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc., Ryan Roach. (Golden, Anthony) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc., Ryan Roach. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Golden, Anthony) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss re 44 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc., Ryan Roach. Responses due by 11/20/2017. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/21/2017. (Golden, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation to Extend Time. Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc. and Ryan Roach answer due 11/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 44 Amended Complaint; filed by Defendants Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc., Ryan Roach. (Golden, Anthony) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta re 44 Amended Complaint,. Ryan Roach served on 9/29/2017, answer due 10/20/2017. (Edeli, David) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta re 44 Amended Complaint,. Lighthouse Communications, LLC served on 9/29/2017, answer due 10/20/2017; New Choice Communications, Inc. served on 9/29/2017, answer due 10/20/2017. (Edeli, David) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 44 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Edeli, David) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order; filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Edeli, David) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively for Summary Judgment by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 10/24/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 11, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 12, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 13, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 14, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 15, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 16, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 17, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 18, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 19, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 20, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 21, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 22, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 23, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 24, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 25, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 26, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 27, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 28, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 29, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 30, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 31, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 32, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 33, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 34, # 36 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 35, # 37 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 36, # 38 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part 37, # 39 Exhibit Exhibits B thru F)(Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 2-1 (a)(d): that Susan Seletsky is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1 (a)(d). You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Attorney advised to visit the Courts website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select ATTORNEY REGISTRATION located in the middle of the web page to register. (no image attached) (RFJ) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation. (Discovery due by 12/16/2017., Motions due by 1/15/2018., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 59 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Motion in Response to First Amended Complaint. (Motions due by 10/10/2017., Responses due by 11/7/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 44 Amended Complaint, ; by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc., Ryan Roach re 44 Amended Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Edeli, David) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 48 Motion Hearing, held on 9/21/17, before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donna Davidson, DD@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 10/30/2017. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 12/28/2017. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (DD) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2017 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr.. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: Tara Stearns; Def Counsel: Malani Kotchka; Recording start and end times: 3:03p.m. - 3:14p.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to 50 First Motion to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (first request).Parties advise the Court that they have come to an agreement regarding discovery matters. Parties are to provide the Court with a stipulation/order regarding discovery, as discussed in open court. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 41 Motion for Protective Order, 39 Motion to Quash, filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Tara Stearns re 39 Motion to Quash, ; by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended RESPONSE to 50 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re: Discovery Deadlines, filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Replies due by 10/3/2017. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 9/25/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Ivy Hensel. RE: 50 First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (First Request) Motion Hearing set for Thursday, September 28, 2017 at 3:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IH) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tara Stearns)(Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 50 Motion to Extend Discovery filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Replies due by 9/29/2017. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2017 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr.. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: Laura Bremer, Tara Sterns and David Edeli; Def Counsel: Malani Kotchka, also present Allen Roach; Recording start and end times: 10:29a.m. - 11:42a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to 41 First Motion for Protective Order. The Court will take the matter under submission, written order to follow. The stay will remain in effect until the Court rules on said motion.Parties address discovery deadlines with the Court. Parties are to meet and confer regarding issues discussed in open court today. If parties have not agreed on discovery deadlines, a motion is to be filed by 5:00 p.m., Friday, September 22, 2017. The Court will set a hearing on said motion early next week, as stated on the record.Out-of-State counsel may appear telephonically and are instructed to call the Audio Conference Line at (888) 251-2909, access code 7771745, five (5) minutes prior to the hearing time. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 41 Motion for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Replies due by 9/26/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alisa Ann, # 2 Declaration of Tara Stearns)(Bremer, Laura) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 39 Motion to Quash,, filed by Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. Replies due by 9/26/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alisa Ann, # 2 Declaration of Tara Stearns)(Bremer, Laura) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Non-Compliance with LR IC 5-1. ERROR: Document 44 was not properly signed/filed in accordance with LR IC 5-1(b). The attorney who signs the document must be the attorney who electronically files the document. Attorneys Tara Elizabeth Stearns and Laura Bremer are advised in the future that documents submitted using CM/ECF, must be filed by the attorney who signed the document, pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). No further action is required regarding document 44 at this time. (no image attached) (RFJ) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas E. Perez. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 12/17/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stearns, Tara) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1 by attorney. Attorney advised to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules regarding electronic filing procedures on 9/19/2017 (RFJ). (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have ten (10) days from the entry of this Order to file the Amended Complaint separately on the docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment, is DENIED as moot. The Court denies this motion without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., on 9/12/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. RE: 39 EMERGENCY MOTION to Quash Subpoena and 41 FIRST MOTION for Protective Order Motion Hearing set for Thursday, September 21, 2017 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Plaintiff shall file a response no later than September 19, 2017. Compliance with the subpoenas is hereby STAYED until the Court hears and decides on Defendants' motions.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR) Corrected hearing judge. NEF regenerated. (ASB) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST MOTION for Protective Order; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-H)(Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Non Compliance with LR IC 2-2 and FRCP 7. Attorney Action Required to Document 39 : ERROR: Document should have been filed as separate entries by attorney Malani L. Kotchka , pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b): "For each type of relief requested or purpose of the document, a separate document must be filed and a separate event must be selected for that document" CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to only file the additional request for Protective Order contained in document 39 , as separate filing, using the appropriate Motion event pursuant to LR IC 2-2 (b), LR IC 2-2(c) and FRCP 7(b)(1). (no image attached)(RFJ) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EMERGENCY MOTION to Quash Subpoena; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A- H)(Kotchka, Malani) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to FRCP 7 and LR IC 2-2(b) by attorney. Attorney advised to file documents pursuant to the local rules regarding electronic filing procedures on 9/11/2017 (RFJ). (Entered: 09/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 33 Motion for Leave to File filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Interim STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 33 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Replies due by 8/18/2017. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation to Extend Time re 33 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Responses due by 8/11/2017.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 33 Motion for Leave to File; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint; filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Edeli, # 2 Exhibit 1 Proposed First Amended Complaint and Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Edeli, David) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 21 Motion Hearing, held on 3/31/17, before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donna Davidson, DD@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 5/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 5/12/2017. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 7/10/2017. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (DD) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 22 Defendants' Motion to Enforce LR IA 11-3 and to Strike All Documents Filed in this Action by Plaintiff is granted, in part, and denied, in part. Defendants' request to enforce LR IA 11-3 is granted. However, Defendants' request to strike all documents filed by Plaintiff is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 23 Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena isdenied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 26 Motion for Leave to Admit Government Attorneys to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorneys' Government Employment. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Edeli re 26 Motion for Leave to Appear ; by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Attachments: # 1 email)(Rose, Patrick) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Stearns re 26 Motion for Leave to Appear ; by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Attachments: # 1 email)(Rose, Patrick) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Bremer re 26 Motion for Leave to Appear ; by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Attachments: # 1 email)(Rose, Patrick) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear government attorneys. Attorney: Bremer, Stearns, Edeli, Seletsky. by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Rose, Patrick) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., on 4/3/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. RE: 23 Motion to Quash Subpoena The response to Plaintiff's subpoena is stayed pending Plaintiff's attorneys' compliance with Local Rule IA 11-3. See Minute Order (ECF No. 24). If counsel does not comply, Defendants' motion will be granted.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 4/3/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. RE: 22 Motion to Strike The attorneys for Plaintiff must file an appropriate application pursuant to Local Rule 11-3 no later than April 10, 2017. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST MOTION to Quash; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST MOTION to Strike; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 4/14/2017. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/31/2017 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: Laura Bremer; Def Counsel: Malania Kotchka, also present is Allen Roach; Recording start and end times: 9:26a.m. - 9:50a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to 15 First Motion to Stay Discovery.The Court sets forth its findings on the record and denies the 15 First Motion to Stay Discovery.Defendants' counsel has ten (10) days from today's date to serve their initial disclosures, as discussed in open court.Parties discuss with the Court compliance with the local rule to practice in this case. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to 15 Motion to Stay; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 15 Motion to Stay, filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. Replies due by 3/22/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laura Bremer)(Edeli, David) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 14 Objection to Document, filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Edeli on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Edeli, David) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., on 3/2/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Allison Reese. RE: 15 FIRST MOTION to Stay Discovery Motion Hearing set for Friday, March 31, 2017 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST MOTION to Stay Discovery; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION to 8 Reply to Response to Motion; filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (ADR) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties Disputed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order 11 is granted, in part. Discovery due by 10/16/2017. Motions due by 11/15/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez . (Kasameyer, Katherine) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine Kasameyer on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Kasameyer, Katherine) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tara Elizabeth Stearns on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. (Stearns, Tara) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 5 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 5 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Perez. Replies due by 1/31/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laura Bremer, # 2 Declaration of Alisa Ann)(Bremer, Laura) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint or Alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. Responses due by 1/17/2017. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/17/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Allen Roach, # 2 Exhibit A-1 (Part 1) Direct Seller Agreements, # 3 Exhibit A-1 (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit A-1 (Part 3), # 5 Exhibit A-1 (Part 4), # 6 Exhibit A-1 (Part 5), # 7 Exhibit A-1 (Part 6), # 8 Exhibit A-1 (Part 7), # 9 Exhibit A-1 (Part 8), # 10 Exhibit A-1 (Part 9), # 11 Exhibit A-1 (Part 10), # 12 Exhibit A-1 (Part 11), # 13 Exhibit A-1 (Part 12), # 14 Exhibit A-1 (Part 13), # 15 Exhibit A-1 (Part 14), # 16 Exhibit A-1 (Part 15), # 17 Exhibit A-1 (Part 16), # 18 Exhibit A-1 (Part 17), # 19 Exhibit A-1 (Part 18), # 20 Exhibit A-1 (Part 19), # 21 Exhibit A-1 (Part 20), # 22 Exhibit A-1 (Part 21), # 23 Exhibit A-1 (Part 22), # 24 Exhibit A-1 (Part 23), # 25 Exhibit A-1 (Part 24), # 26 Exhibit A-1 (Part 25), # 27 Exhibit A-1 (Part 26), # 28 Exhibit A-1 (Part 27), # 29 Exhibit A-1 (Part 28), # 30 Exhibit A-1 (Part 29), # 31 Exhibit A-1 (Part 30), # 32 Exhibit A-1 (Part 31), # 33 Exhibit A-1 (Part 32), # 34 Exhibit A-1 (Part 33), # 35 Exhibit A-1 (Part 34), # 36 Exhibit A-1 (Part 35), # 37 Exhibit A-1 (Part 36), # 38 Exhibit A-1 (Part 37))(Kotchka, Malani) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 3 Stipulation for Extension of Time and Briefing Schedule. ( Motions due by 1/3/2017., Responses due by 1/24/2017., Replies due by 2/13/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 1 Complaint; filed by Defendants Allen Roach, Wellfleet Communications. (Kotchka, Malani) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 10/13/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas E. Perez. Proof of service due by 1/5/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(bremer, Laura) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?