Isaacs v. United States Department of Education
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-11221
District Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 1:06 AM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeffrey Isaacs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aldo A. Badini

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aldo A. Badini

Toggle Switch Represented by Alexandra B McTague

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexandra B McTague

Toggle Switch Represented by Blitman & King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Ernest Kornfeld +1 315 422 7111 +1 315 471 2623 dekornfeld@bklawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by James Ching-I Lin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Ching-I Lin

Toggle Switch Represented by Klein Zelman Rothermel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jesse Samuel Grasty +1 212 935 6020 +1 212 753 8101 jgrasty@kleinzelman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bruce Egert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher A. Smith +1 914 843 9100 +1 914 949 4752 111csmith111@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by markljosephslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark L. Josephs +1 857 250 4998 mark.josephs@markljosephslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trivella & Forte, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bardavid +1 914 949 9075 +1 914 949 4752 jonathan@tfsllp.com
Space Jael Dumornay +1 914 949 9075 +1 914 949 4752 jael@tfsllp.com
Space Arthur Joseph Muller, III +91 494 990 7522 aj@tfsllp.com
v.
United States Department of Education United States Department of Education, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division U.S. DOJ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Halainen +1 202 616 8101 daniel.j.halainen@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowder Stewart, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth D. Crowder +1 706 434 8545 ken@crowderstewart.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Julia A. Caroff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia A. Caroff +1 313 226 9772 +1 313 226 3800

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259 jared.bennett@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert P. Brouillard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Brouillard +1 206 553 7970

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annapurna Balakrishna +1 617 748 3111 annapurna.balakrishna@usdoj.gov
Space SEAN E MARTIN +1 503 727 1010

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1650

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Tenfelde Armstrong +1 704 338 3104 Katherine.Armstrong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
Space Jane Elizabeth Andersen +1 410 209 4892 +1 410 962 2310 Jane.Andersen@usdoj.gov
Space KATHLEEN LOUISE BICKERS +1 503 727 1060
Space Christopher R. Donato +1 617 748 3303 +1 617 748 3972
Space Jeffrey Michael Hansen +1 312 886 1325 jeffrey.hansen@usdoj.gov
Space Ann Elizabeth Harwood +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 ann.harwood@usdoj.gov
Space Ameet B. Kabrawala +1 718 254 6001 +1 718 254 7489 ameet.kabrawala@usdoj.gov
Space Sanjay S. Karnik +1 912 201 2513 +1 912 652 4388 sanjay.karnik@usdoj.gov
Space Terrance Mebane +1 202 353 7971 terrance.a.mebane@usdoj.gov
Space Michael P. Sady +1 617 748 3362 +1 617 748 3971 michael.sady@usdoj.gov
Space Bahram Samie +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 bahram.samie@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia J. Hyde +1 417 831 4406 +1 417 831 4511
Space Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Byars +1 212 225 2524 +1 212 225 3999 michael.byars@usdoj.gov
Space Michael James Byars +1 212 637 2793 +1 212 637 2717
Space Ellen London +1 212 637 2737 +1 212 637 2702 ellen.london@usdoj.gov
Space Christine Schessler Poscablo +1 212 637 2674 +1 212 637 0033 christine.poscablo@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Education

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space United States department of education litigation support

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anjali A. Ashley +1 202 514 3368
Space Matthew J. Berns +1 202 616 8016 +1 202 616 8470 matthew.j.berns@usdoj.gov
Space Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
Space James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Megan Anne Crowley +1 202 305 0754 megan.a.crowley@usdoj.gov
Space Christina Fogg +1 206 553 7970 Christina.Fogg@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
Space Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
Space Jason Lee +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 Jason.Lee3@usdoj.gov
Space Sheila Lieber +1 202 514 3259 +1 202 616 8470 sheila.lieber@usdoj.gov
Space Robert Charles Merritt, III +1 202 616 8098 +1 202 616 8460 robert.c.merritt@usdoj.gov
Space Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
Space John Vagelatos +1 718 254 6182 +1 718 254 7489 john.vagelatos@usdoj.gov
Space Caroline Lewis Wolverton +1 202 965 6570 +1 202 616 8202 caroline.lewis-wolverton@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 551
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered denying 36 Motion (FDS, law1)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 29 Motion to Continue The clerk will reset the scheduling conference date.(FDS, law1) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Consent MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to court choice by Jeffrey Isaacs.(Josephs, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2018 03:20 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. See docket entry #14, attachment #1 for text of proposed order. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint, Regarding Count II by United States Department of Education.(Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDERDefendant's partial motion to dismiss is GRANTED.(FDS, law1) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2018 re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by United States Department of Education. Court heard argument on the motion. Court took the matter UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Josephs, Balakrishna) (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE postponing the 2/7/2018 scheduling conference. The Court will only hear argument on the motion to dismiss on 2/7/2018. The scheduling conference is postponed at this time. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Court will postpone the scheduling conference currently set for 2/7/2018, and the Court will hear argument on the motion to dismiss on that date beginning at 2:30 PM. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Jeffrey Isaacs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Josephs, Mark) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 1/26/2018 (FDS, law1) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Jeffrey Isaacs.(Josephs, Mark) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 15 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by United States Department of Education. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Count I filed by United States Department of Education. (Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by United States Department of Education.(Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by United States Department of Education.(Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2018 02:20 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 5, 2018 to To Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 5, 2018 to To Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by United States Department of Education.(Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Department of Education, filed by Jeffrey Isaacs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Josephs, Mark) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Department of Education. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Department of Education.(Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. RE: 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court will grant the defendant a 30 day extension to file a response to the existing complaint. Response due 10/18/2017. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Jeffrey Isaacs. United States Department of Education served on 7/10/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. Acknowledgement filed by Jeffrey Isaacs. (Josephs, Mark) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to amended complaint , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, ( Responses due by 9/28/2017) by United States Department of Education.(Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Annapurna Balakrishna on behalf of United States Department of Education (Balakrishna, Annapurna) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Summons Issued as to United States Department of Education. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            COMPLAINT against United States Department of Education Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6694759 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jeffrey Isaacs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet)(Josephs, Mark) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/3/2017) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2017: # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?