United States v. Allahyari
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00668
District Judge Thomas S. Zilly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 17, 2021 at 9:21 AM ST (2.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yael Bortnick +1 215 459 1180 Yael.Bortnick@usdoj.gov
No Logo Leslie R. Allahyari, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry N Johnson +1 206 243 7600 lnjtaxlaw@comcast.net
No Logo Leslie R Cover, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry N Johnson +1 206 243 7600 lnjtaxlaw@comcast.net
v.
No Logo King County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret A Pahl +1 206 296 9045 peggy.pahl@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Komron M. Allahyari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LESOURD & PATTEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane E. Tebelius +1 206 624 1040 +1 206 223 1099 dtebelius@lesourd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney J. Waldbaum +1 206 624 1040 rwaldbaum@lesourd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LESOURD & PATTEN, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Veliz +1 206 624 1040 sveliz@lesourd.com
No Logo Leslie R. Allahyari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry N Johnson +1 206 243 7600 lnjtaxlaw@comcast.net
No Logo Leslie R Cover, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry N Johnson +1 206 243 7600 lnjtaxlaw@comcast.net
No Logo Shaun Allahyari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LESOURD & PATTEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane E. Tebelius +1 206 624 1040 +1 206 223 1099 dtebelius@lesourd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Veliz +1 206 624 1040 sveliz@lesourd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney J. Waldbaum +1 206 624 1040 rwaldbaum@lesourd.com
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yael Bortnick +1 215 459 1180 Yael.Bortnick@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (164) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Order of USCA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Order of USCA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Memorandum/Opinion from USCA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Order of USCA
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None 2 - Minute Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Witness List
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None 2 - Minute Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None 2 - Minute Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Request
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None 2 - Minute Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Transcript Designation/Order Form - Appeal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/8/2018, Entered: None order on motion for bill of costs
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTE ORDER striking as moot, without prejudice, defendant Shaun Allahyari's 104 Motion to Stay Judgment Pending Appeal. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting parties' 111 Stipulated Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. John Kaplan allowed to withdraw as counsel for defendant Shaun Allahyari and Avi Lipman shall continue as counsel. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Attorney John Stuart Kaplan terminated) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Bankruptcy
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Time Schedule Order
                                                                      TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (18-35956) as to 103 Notice of Appeal filed by Shaun Allahyari : (CDA) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                        DECLARATION of Avi J. Lipman filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari re 104 MOTION to Stay re 103 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Lipman, Avi) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                                                          MOTION to Stay re 103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/23/2018, (Lipman, Avi) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (18-35956) re 102 Order, 93 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 101 Judgment, by Defendant Shaun Allahyari. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-5537480. (Lipman, Avi) Modified on 11/9/2018 to add CCA # (CDA). (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                JUDGMENT re 94 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. The United States is entitled to its costs as the prevailing party on its claims against Defendant Komron Allahyari. The United States is not entitled to its costs against Defendant Shaun Allahyari, as neither party prevailed. (See Judgment for details) Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Request
                                                                                  REQUEST to Strike Section III(B) by Plaintiff United States of America re 97 Objections (Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order (Unsigned)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order (Unsigned)
                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 98 Proposed Order (Unsigned), 96 Proposed Order (Unsigned), 95 Proposed Order (Unsigned), 97 Objections (Lipman, Avi) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order (Unsigned)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order (Unsigned)
                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 96 Proposed Order (Unsigned), 95 Proposed Order (Unsigned), 97 Objections (Lipman, Avi) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Objections - non motion/R and R
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Objections - non motion/R and R
                                                                                              OBJECTIONS by Defendant Shaun Allahyari (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B)(Lipman, Avi) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Proposed Order (Unsigned)
                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 94 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, (Order of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale) (Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Proposed Order (Unsigned)
                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 94 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, (Final Judgment) (Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                    FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; directing the United States to file a proposed final judgment and proposed order for judicial sale within seven (7) days of Entry of these Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allayari via USPS)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying defendant Shaun Allahyari's 91 Motion for Leave to File Short Post-Trial Brief. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allayari via USPS)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to 91 MOTION for Leave to File Short Post-Trial Brief. (Senra, Nithya)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Leave to File Document
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Short Post-Trial Brief, filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari. Noting Date 9/7/2018, (Lipman, Avi)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Judge Thomas S. Zilly- Dep Clerk: Gail Glass; Pla Counsel: Yael Bortnik and Nithya Senra; Def Counsel: Komron Allahyari - (Pro se), Avi Lipman and Curtis Isacke; CR: Debbie Zurn; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 15206;Bench Trial Day Two completed on 9/6/2018. At 9:00 a.m. Christie L. West is sworn and testifies. The testimony of Komron Allahyari resumes. Exhibits marked and admitted: 155, 158(limited), 101, 102, 153, 111 -118, 127, 130, 131, 133, 134, 135, 139, 140 and 179. Shaun Allahyari recalled and testifies. Counsel rest. The Court hears closing arguments. The Court takes the matter under advisement. -Adjourned (GG) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Judge Thomas S. Zilly- Dep Clerk: Gail Glass; Pla Counsel: Yael Bortnik and Nithya Senra; Def Counsel: Komron Allahyari (pro se), Avi Lipman and Curtis Isacke; CR: Debbie Zurn; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 15206; Bench Trial Day One held on 9/5/2018. At 9:00 a.m. Counsel present their opening statements. Exhibits listed as agreed in the pretrial order are admitted and may be used during trial. Shaun Allahyari and Komron Allahyari are sworn and testify. Exhibits marked and admitted: 32, 33 (limited), 110. Exhibits 101 and 102 are admitted as demonstrative. Exhibit 153 is REFUSED. Exhibit nos. 131 and 135 admitted pages 2 and 3 only. Exhibit nos. 142-152 are admitted. Trial will resume on Thursday, September 6, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. -Adjourned (GG) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon.Judge Thomas S. Zilly- Dep Clerk: Gail Glass; Pla Counsel: Yael Bortnik and Nithya Senra; Def Counsel: Komron Allahyari-Pro Se, Avi Lipman counsel for Shaun Allahyari, Curtis Isacke and John Kaplan; CR: None; Courtroom: Chambers/Conf; Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/31/2018. Counsel appear telephonically. Defendants Komron Allahyari, pro se, and Shaun Allahyari also participate telephonically. The deferred portions of plaintiff's motion in limine, as amended, docket nos. 66, 69, and 78, are DENIED in part and DEFERRED to trial in part as follows: (i) the motion to exclude the testimony of Christie L. West is DENIED; (ii) the motion to exclude defendant's trial exhibits 111-118, 127, 130-131, 133-135, and 139-152 is DENIED; however, the Court makes no ruling concerning whether such exhibits will be admitted at trial; (iii) the motion to exclude defendant's trial exhibits 101, 102, 108, 110, and 153 (proffered as summaries under Federal Rule of Evidence 1006) is DEFERRED to trial. Defendant Shaun Allahyari's new attorneys (Avi Lipman and Curtis Isacke) orally approve of the form of the Pretrial Order, and the Court SIGNS the Pretrial Order, as modified by the Court. Each witness shall be examined in full when called, except that Shaun Allahyari may be recalled in defendant's case upon a showing of good cause. All exhibits that the parties have stipulated are authentic and admissible, as indicated in the Pretrial Order, as well as Exhibit 24, are ADMITTED for all purposes. John Kaplan may remain counsel of record for defendant Shaun Allahyari, but he will not participate in the trial. Trial is set to commence on Wednesday, September 5, 2018, at 9:00 a.m., and is scheduled to be completed in two days (from 9:00 a.m. to 4:00 p.m. each day, with an hour lunch break and two 15-minute breaks, one in the morning and one in the afternoon). Opening statements and closing arguments should be less than 30 minutes per side. All counsel agree that the transcript of the deposition of Christie L. West that was filed as docket no. 84 is a true and correct copy, and it may be used at trial without providing a sealed version. Any supplemental trial brief, not to exceed twelve (12) pages in length shall be filed by 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, September 4, 2018. Any amended proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, along with a redlined version, shall be filed by September 4, 2018. (GG) Modified on 9/5/2018, to correct plaintiff's counsel name Nithya Senra. (GG). (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                  Proposed Findings of Fact by Defendant Shaun Allahyari (Lipman, Avi)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF by Defendant Shaun Allahyari. (Lipman, Avi)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron M. Allahyari via USPS)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Deposition
                                                                                                                        DEPOSITION of Christie L. West taken on August 23, 2018. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER further deferring in part and denying in part plaintiff's 66 , 69 -1, 78 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Plaintiff shall file a copy of the transcript of Ms. West's telephonic deposition on or before 8/29/2018. (See Minute Order for further details.) Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Curtis C. Isacke filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari re 78 Amended MOTIONS IN LIMINE, 66 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Isacke, Curtis)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Avi J. Lipman on behalf of Defendant Shaun Allahyari. (Lipman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Amended document
                                                                                                                                AMENDMENT of Response to 78 Amended MOTIONS IN LIMINE, 66 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Defendant Shaun Allahyari (Kaplan, John)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to 67 MOTIONS IN LIMINE . (Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 In Limine
                                                                                                                                    Amended MOTIONS IN LIMINE, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 8/17/2018, (Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF OF DEFENDANT SHAUN ALLAHYARI by Defendant Shaun Allahyari. (Kaplan, John) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                            Proposed Findings of Fact by Defendant Shaun Allahyari (Kaplan, John) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF - United States' Supplemental Trial Brief by Plaintiff United States of America. (Senra, Nithya)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                Proposed Findings of Fact by Plaintiff United States of America (Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff United States of America. (Senra, Nithya)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER directing plaintiff's trial exhibits to be numbered 1 thorugh 99, and defendant's trial exhibits to be numbered beginning with 101; parties shall provide to chambers a set of trial exhibits on or before 8/22/2018; counsel shal l confer and submit a joint statement or revised motions in limine on or before 8/22/2018; granting in part and deferring in part plaintiff's 66 Motion in Limine; denying defendant Shaun Allahyari's 67 Motion in Limine. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by Defendant Shaun Allahyari, to 66 MOTIONS IN LIMINE . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Kaplan, John) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to 67 MOTIONS IN LIMINE . (Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Praecipe-Other
                                                                                                                                                            PRAECIPE re 66 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: # 1 United States' Motion in Limine, # 2 Proposed Order)(Senra, Nithya)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                              REDACTION to 66 MOTIONS IN LIMINE replacing Exhibit E (attachment # 5) by Plaintiff United States of America (Senra, Nithya)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTIONS IN LIMINE, filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/17/2018, (Kaplan, John) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTIONS IN LIMINE, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - United States' Initial Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Initial Disclosures, # 3 Exhibit C - Defendant Shaun Allahyari's Response to USA's 1st Set of Requests for Production, # 4 Exhibit D - Defendant Shaun Allahyari's Response to USA's 1st Set of Interrogatories, # 5 SEALED Exhibit E - Records Custodian Declaration and USA's proposed Exh. 18, # 6 Exhibit F - Def. Shaun Allahyari's Tentative Exhibit List, # 7 Exhibit G - Def. Shaun Allahyari's proposed exhibit A-6, # 8 Exhibit H - Def. Shaun Allahyari's proposed exhibit A-49, # 9 Exhibit I - Def. Shaun Allahyari's proposed exhibit A-52, # 10 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/17/2018, (Senra, Nithya) Modified to seal attachment #5 due to financial accounting information on 8/9/2018 (SWT).
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nithya Senra on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Senra, Nithya)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Transcript/Notice of Filing of Official TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2018, (ND)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER striking in part as moot and otherwise denying the Government's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Defendant Shaun Allahyari's 51 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. The Pretrial Conference is RESCHEDULED from 8/24/2018, to 8/31/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) Modified on 7/30/2018: copy sent to Komron M. Allahyari via first class mail (PM).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Thomas S. Zilly - Dep Clerk: Gail Glass; Plaintiff's Counsel: Yael Bortnick; Counsel for Defendant Shaun Allahyari: John Kaplan; CR: Nickie Drury; Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2018. Pro se defendant Komron Allahyari is not present. Defendant Shaun Allahyari appears with counsel. The Court hears oral argument on the Government's motion for summary judgment, docket no. 41, and defendant Shaun Allahyari's amended motion for summary judgment, docket no. 51 . The Court DENIES the Government's motion to strike, docket no. 53, and takes the summary judgment motions under advisement. Shaun Allahyari's counsel is DIRECTED to disclose to the Government's attorney, within two weeks, all exhibits to be used at trial, as well as the manner in which interest is calculated on the loans at issue. Trial is CONTINUED to September 5, 2018, to commence at 9:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to contact the Court telephonically before filing any motions in limine. The agreed pretrial order remains due on August 17, 2018. Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law remain due on August 20, 2018. Any supplemental trial briefs shall also be filed by August 20, 2018. (KK) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Praecipe-Other
                                                                                                                                                                              PRAECIPE re 51 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibit 103 by Defendant Shaun Allahyari (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kaplan, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Shaun Allahyari filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Kaplan, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Komron Allahyari filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Kaplan, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/7/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY, filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari, TO RESPONSE to 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Kaplan, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY, filed by Plaintiff United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Komron Michael Allahyari filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Kaplan, John) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental DECLARATION of Shaun Allahyari filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Kaplan, John) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by Defendant Shaun Allahyari, to 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Kaplan, John) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to 51 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21, # 2 Exhibit 22, # 3 Exhibit 23)(Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/30/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Shaun Allahyari filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari re 51 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, 8, 9, 10, 13, 14, 101, 102, 103, 104, 105, 106, 107, 108)(Kaplan, John) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/30/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 7/26/2018, (Kaplan, John) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PARTIAL JUDGMENT re parties' 49 Stipulated Motion; entered against defendant Komron Allahyari in favor of the United States of America in the following amounts: $2,859,853.75 on First Claim For Relief, $614,755.49 on the Second Claim For Relief, $435,861.11 on the Third Claim For Relief. (See Judgment for details). Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Stipulated Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Partial Judgment, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/29/2018, (Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Praecipe to Attach Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRAECIPE to attach document re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit 20)(Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Judge Thomas S. Zilly- Dep Clerk: Gail Glass; Pla Counsel: Yael Bortnick; CR: NONE; Time of Hearing: 11:05 am; Courtroom: Chambers/Conf; Telephone Conference held on 6/22/2018. The Court conducts an ex parte telephone conference with Yael Bortnick. Counsel for the defendant, John Stuart Kaplan is not available and did not participate. Both sides are directed to meet and confer by Tuesday, June 26, 2018, concerning the identity and numbering of exhibits, and reference to exhibits in the summary judgment motions, docket nos. 41 and 43, and all future briefs in this case. Counsel shall then call chambers to arrange a telephone conference to resolve the marking of exhibits. (GG) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER setting oral argument on the United States' 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Defendant Shaun Allahyari's 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for Thursday, 7/26/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) cc: Defendant Komron M. Allahyari via first class mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 39 Stipulation and Order for Substitution of Counsel. Diane E. Tebelius and Sandra Veliz of LeSourd & Patten, P.S. are GRANTED leave to withdraw as counsel of record for Shaun Allahyari, effective immediat ely, and John S. Kaplan of Perkins Coie LLP is substituted as counsel of record for Shaun Allahyari. Defendant Komron M. Allahyari's unopposed motion, docket no. 40 , to permit counsel to withdraw is GRANTED as follows. Diane E. Tebelius and Sa ndra Veliz of LeSourd & Patten, P.S. are granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record for Komron M. Allahyari, effective immediately. Defendant Komron M. Allahyari is allowed to proceed pro se. He is hereby REMINDED that he has an obligation to kee p the Court apprised of his contact information and to provide the Court with any changes of address. Defendant pro se is also ADVISED that he is expected to comply with the rules and orders of this Court and that he will be held to the same standards as lawyers authorized to practice before this Court. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH) (cc: Defendant Komron M. Allahyari via first class mail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Shaun Allahyari filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Kaplan, John) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Shaun Allahyari. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, John) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Stuart Kaplan on behalf of Defendant Shaun Allahyari. (Kaplan, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-19) Noting Date 7/6/2018, (Bortnick, Yael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Defendant Komron M. Allahyari. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/29/2018, (Veliz, Sandra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Substitution of Counsel by parties (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Judge Thomas S. Zilly- Dep Clerk: Gail Glass; Pla Counsel: Yael Bortnick; Def Counsel: Diane Tebelius and Sandra Veliz; CR: None; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: Chambers/Conf; Telephone Conference held on 5/9/2018. Counsel appear telephonically. The Court and counsel discuss the case schedule and the United States' Motion for Relief from Deadline, docket no. 34 (the "Motion"). For the reasons discussed, the Court DENIES the Motion and DIRECTS that the depositions of Kathryn Allahyari, Shaun Allahyari, and Komron Allahyari proceed in person this week as scheduled. (GG) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY, filed by Plaintiff United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 34 MOTION for Relief from Deadlines (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by Defendants Komron M. Allahyari, Shaun Allahyari, to 34 MOTION for Relief from Deadlines. (Veliz, Sandra) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 34 MOTION for Relief from Deadlines (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Relief from Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 5/4/2018, (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER of Dismissal of Leslie Cover re parties' 32 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Leslie R Cover terminated.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Leslie R. Cover by parties (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint by Leslie R Cover.(Johnson, Larry) (Entered: 01/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint by Komron M. Allahyari.(Veliz, Sandra) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Komron M. Allahyari, Shaun Allahyari, Leslie R Cover, King County, filed by United States of America.(Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Amend Complaint. The United States shall file its First Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this minute order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint,,, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/1/2017, (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting United States of America's 20 Motion to Dismiss Leslie R. Cover's Counterclaim; denying Defendant Leslie R. Cover's request for stay pending final determination of relief under ยง 6015 from the IRS, dkt. 24 . Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)(Leslie R Cover as Counter Claimant and United States of America as Counter Defendant terminated.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY, filed by Counter Defendant United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 20 MOTION to Dismiss Leslie R. Cover's Counterclaim (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, by Defendant Leslie R Cover, to 20 MOTION to Dismiss Leslie R. Cover's Counterclaim. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration with Exs 1-2)(Johnson, Larry) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diane E. Tebelius on behalf of Defendants Komron M. Allahyari, Shaun Allahyari. (Tebelius, Diane) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Lis Pendens)(Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 20 MOTION to Dismiss Leslie R. Cover's Counterclaim. Filed by Counter Defendant United States of America. Noting Date 9/15/2017, (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Leslie R. Cover's Counterclaim, filed by Counter Defendant United States of America. Noting Date 8/11/2017, (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Thomas S. Zilly; Length of Trial: *2 days*. Bench Trial is set for 9/4/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 2/12/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/12/2018, Motions due by 4/5/2018, Discovery completed by 5/14/2018, Dispositive motions due by 6/14/2018, Motions in Limine due by 8/2/2018, Pretrial Order due by 8/17/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/17/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2018 at 1:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 8/20/2018. (KD) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of dismissal of King County re parties' 17 Stipulated Motion; signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (King County terminated.) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulated MOTION to Priority and to Dismissal of King County, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/12/2017, (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 2. (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Komron M. Allahyari.(Veliz, Sandra) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's unopposed 12 motion to amend case caption to reflect a name change of defendant Leslie R. Allahyari to Leslie R. Cover. Authorized signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Komron M. Allahyari mailed on 5/19/2017 (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend Case Caption to Reflect Name Change, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 6/16/2017, (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sandra Veliz on behalf of Defendant Shaun Allahyari. (Veliz, Sandra) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sandra Veliz on behalf of Defendant Komron M. Allahyari. (Veliz, Sandra) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Leslie R. Allahyari on 5/12/2017, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Shaun Allahyari on 5/12/2017, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Attorney Larry N Johnson added to party Leslie R. Allahyari(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff United States of America by Leslie R. Allahyari.(Johnson, Larry) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by King County.(Pahl, Margaret) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on King County on 5/10/2017, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Margaret A Pahl on behalf of Defendant King County. (Pahl, Margaret) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/23/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/7/2017, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Komron M. Allahyari, Leslie R. Allahyari, Shaun Allahyari, King County. (Attachments: # 1 Summons-Leslie Allahyari, # 2 Summons-Shaun Allahyari, # 3 Summons-King County)(RE) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Yael Bortnick added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Komoron Allahyari, # 3 Summons to Leslie Allahyari, # 4 Summons to S Allahyari, # 5 Summons to King County)(Bortnick, Yael) (No Fee required-Government Agency) Modified on 5/2/2017 to edit fee status. (RE) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reset Hearings: Bench Trial is set for 9/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Attorney Curtis C Isacke for Shaun Allahyari added; per 81 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER: re 66 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Attachment #5). Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (SWT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: At the telephonic request of counsel, the deadline for filing motions in limine is EXTENDED to August 8, 2018. Responses shall be filed by August 14, 2018. The motions in limine shall be noted for August 17, 2018. (KK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Noting Date Set re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Noting Date 7/6/2018, (SWT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney Rodney J. Waldbaum for Komron M. Allahyari and Shaun Allahyari added; per 11 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?