Fischer v. Parexel International Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-11364
District Judge Denise J. Casper, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 4, 2018 at 12:59 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Catherine Fischer NOTICE OF FILING OF RELATED CASES (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Catherine Fischer. A. Dana Callow, Jr waiver sent on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017; Patrick J. Fortune waiver sent on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017; Maykin Ho waiver sent on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017; Eduard E. Holdener waiver sent on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017; Christopher J. Lindop waiver sent on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017; Richard J. Love waiver sent on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017; Parexel International Corporation waiver sent on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017; Josef H. Von Rickenbach waiver sent on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017; Ellen M. Zane waiver sent on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Summons Issued as to A. Dana Callow, Jr, Patrick J. Fortune, Maykin Ho, Eduard E. Holdener, Christopher J. Lindop, Richard J. Love, Parexel International Corporation, Josef H. Von Rickenbach, Ellen M. Zane. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF SECTIONS 14(a) AND 20(a) OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6725614 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Catherine Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Certification, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Form)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/25/2017) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 07/25/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 95 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?