USA v. Wilmington Trust Corporation et al

Criminal Case Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00023
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Richard G. Andrews
Last Updated September 20, 2017 at 11:42 PM EDT (7.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Wilmington Trust Corporation, Defendant (1)

Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399 mkelly@mccarter.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Christopher J. Gunther +1 212 735 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew P. Majarian +1 302 651 3201 matthew.majarian@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Robert Scott Saunders +1 302 651 3000 +1 888 329 4135 rob.saunders@skadden.com
TERMINATED: 07/28/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Lori W. Will +1 302 651 3119

Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Christopher T Berg +1 202 434 5346 +1 202 434 5029 cberg@wc.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Margaret A. Keeley +1 202 434 5137 +1 202 434 5029 mkeeley@wc.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Simon A Latcovich slatcovich@wc.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Tobin J Romero +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 tromero@wc.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Barry S. Simon +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 bsimon@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. +1 202 434 5800 +1 202 434 5029 bsullivan@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Katherine A Trefz +1 202 434 5038 +1 202 434 5029 ktrefz@wc.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Lance A Wade +1 202 434 5755 +1 202 434 5029 lwade@wc.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (512) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Page 1 Page 2

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 506 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum On The Federal Reserve Bank Of Philadelphia And The Board Of Governors Of The Federal Reserve System Requiring Production Prior To Trial (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 505 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 503 MOTION to Compel (Nau, Helen) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Defendant Robert V.A. Harra's Joinder to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion to Compel by Robert V.A. Harra as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 505 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 503 MOTION to Compel (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by William B. North as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 505 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 503 MOTION to Compel , 506 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum On The Federal Reserve Bank Of Philadelphia And The Board Of Governors Of The Federal Reserve System Requiring Production Prior To Trial (Moultrie, Samuel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 9/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 09-16-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2017. (lad) (Entered: 09/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion to Compel (D.I. 503 ), by David Gibson. (Guberman, Phara) Modified on 9/16/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions (Joint Proposed Juror Questionnaire) by Wilmington Trust Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Joint Proposed Juror Questionnaire)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions by William B. North as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Wilks, David) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions (Joint) by Wilmington Trust Corporation (Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions (Additional) by Wilmington Trust Corporation (Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint Proposed Jury Instructions (as to Counts 17-19), by David Gibson (Guberman, Phara) Modified on 9/16/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 509 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trial Stipulations. (Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 9/16/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Service by Kevyn N. Rakowski re 501 Exhibit to a Document Sealed Exhibit A to Defendant Kevyn Rakowskis Motion in Limine to Preclude Use of Her Proffer Statement (Dalton, Andrew) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum On The Federal Reserve Bank Of Philadelphia And The Board Of Governors Of The Federal Reserve System Requiring Production Prior To Trial by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 503 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-O)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 504 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED LETTER to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews - re 500 Oral Order. (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
LREF
Blank 503 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 502 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED LETTER to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Robert Kravetz, Esq., Lesley Wolf, Esq. and Jamie McCall, Esq - re 500 Oral Order. (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 501 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re 470 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Use of Her Proffer Statement, by Kevyn N. Rakowski. (nms) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER: The Court understands the Government's recent submission (D.I.498) to be that Mr. Fomunyam worked on the 2010 Full Scope Examination, starting about June 2010, and did not work on earlier examinations. If any Defendant disputes this, they should so advise by 4:00 p.m. today with the basis for the dispute. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions (Limiting) Regarding Specific Evidence Identified in the Government's Rule 404(b) Motion by Wilmington Trust Corporation (Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 498 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED LETTER to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Robert Kravetz, Esq., Lesley Wolf, Esq. and Jamie McCall, Esq. - re 495 Oral Order. (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 371 MOTION Admissibility of Evidence (Rule 404(b).. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/12/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WITNESS/EXHIBIT LIST for the hearing held on 9/8/2017. (nms) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation: The Court will hear argument re 371 MOTION Admissibility of Evidence (Rule 404(b) and all pending Daubert Motions on Saturday, 9/16/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/12/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER: The United States is requested promptly to provide the first seventy-seven pages of the Mrozek May 6, 2015 testimony, and to provide support for its statement (D.I. 400 at 8) that credit file reviews occurred primarily in May and June 2010. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/12/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder, by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion in Limine (D.I. 422 , 429 , 430 , 432 , 433 , 435 , 440 , 442 , 445 , 448 , 450 , 454 , 455 , 457 , 458 , 459 , 460 , 461 , 462 , 463 , 464 , 465 , 466 , 467 , 468 , 469 , 471 , and 472 ). (Nau, Helen) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder, by Robert V.A. Harra as to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions in Limine (D.I. 422 , 429 , 430 , 432 , 433 , 435 , 440 , 442 , 445 , 448 , 450 , 454 , 455 , 457 , 458 , 459 , 460 , 461 , 462 , 463 , 464 , 465 , 466 , 467 , 468 , 469 , 471 , and 472). (Kelly, Michael) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder, by William B. North as to the motions and replied filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation and Kevyn N. Rakowski (D.I. 416, 417, 419, 422, 429 , 430 , 432 , 433 , 435 , 440 , 442 , 445 , 448 , 450 , 454 , 455 , 457 , 458 , 459 , 460 , 461 , 462 , 463 , 464 , 465 , 466 , 467 , 468 , 469 , 470, 471, and 472). (Moultrie, Samuel) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder, by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions in Limine (D.I. 422 , 429 , 430 , 432 , 433 , 435 , 440 , 442 , 445 , 448 , 450 , 454 , 455 , 457 , 458 , 459 , 460 , 461 , 462 , 463 , 464 , 465 , 466 , 467 , 468 , 469 , 471 , and 472) (Guberman, Phara) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Service by USA re 486 Exhibit to a Document, 488 Exhibit to a Document, 485 Exhibit to a Document, 484 Exhibit to a Document, 487 Exhibit to a Document, 483 Exhibit to a Document, and 482 MOTION in Limine. (nms) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 488 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBITS A & B to 427 MOTION in Limine #3 To Introduce Proffer Statements of Defendants' Rakowski and North At Trial, by USA. (nms) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EXHIBIT A to 434 MOTION in Limine #6 To Admit Evidence of Wilmington Trust's Payment of Witnesses Legal Fees, by USA. (nms) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 486 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBITS A & B re 436 MOTION in Limine #7 To Admit Evidence of Common Interest Agreement Between Defendants and Witnesses, by USA. (nms) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 485 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBITS A,B, C & D re 438 MOTION in Limine #8 To Declare Nine Former And Current Bank Employees As Identified With An Adverse Party And Hostile Witnesses Pre-Trial, by USA. (nms) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 484 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBITS A, B, C, D & E re 451 MOTION in Limine #13 To Preclude Advice Of Auditor Defense, by USA. (nms) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 483 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBITS C, D & E re 423 Reply Brief, by USA. (nms) Modified on 9/8/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/08/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 482 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED MOTION in Limine #14 to Preclude Evidence of Miscellaneous Conduct Not Probative of Truthfulness, by USA. (nms) Modified on 9/8/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/08/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bartholomew J. Dalton appearing for Kevyn N. Rakowski (Dalton, Bartholomew) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 480 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBIT A to 452 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Mischaracterization his Separation of Employment, by William B. North. (nms) Modified on 9/8/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/08/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 479 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBIT A to 443 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Mischarcterization of an Email Referenced in Paragraph 42 of the Indictment, by William B. North. (nms) Modified on 9/8/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/08/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER: The request for Mr. Gibson to be excused from the hearing scheduled for 9/8/2017 (D.I. 412 ) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/7/2017. (nms) Modified on 9/7/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Christopher J. Gunther regarding conflict hearing. (Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 9/8/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Katherine A. Trefz (rwc) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Katherine A. Trefz appearing for Wilmington Trust Corporation (rwc) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jay Norman Moffitt as co-counsel. Reason for request: Substitution of Counsel. (Malik, John) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine to Exclude the January 2009 Email and Related Testimony, by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guberman, Phara) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #27 To Exclude Evidence Regarding Wealth or Compensation, by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #26 To Exclude Evidence Regarding Loans Waived by the Commercial Loan Recovery Group, by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Use of Her Proffer Statement, by Kevyn N. Rakowski. (Attachments: # 1 Cover, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Notice of Motion)(Dalton, Andrew) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Main Document 470 replaced on 9/15/2017) (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #25 To Exclude All References to Wilmington Trust Corporations Foreign Ownership, by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #24 To Exclude Job Performance Evidence, by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #23 To Exclude References to Interest or Principal Waivers, by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #22 TO EXCLUDE THE SEPTEMBER 9, 2010 POWERPOINT TITLED COMMERCIAL LENDING CULTURE PRESENTATION by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #21 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PRE-OCTOBER 2009 BAD ACTS by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #20 TO EXCLUDE HINDSIGHT EVIDENCE REGARDING THE MEANING OF PAST DUE LOANS by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #19 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING SEC COMMENT LETTERS by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #18 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO HIDDEN TABS IN EXCEL SPREADSHEETS by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #17 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO LOAN EXTENSIONS AS MASS EXTENSIONS AND EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO FAILURE TO DISCLOSE EXTENSIONS by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #16 TO EXCLUDE GOVERNMENT EVIDENCE, COMMENTARY, OR ARGUMENT ON THE QUALITY OF WILMINGTON TRUSTS LOAN PORTFOLIO by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #15 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO THE ALLEGED EFFECTS OF M&T ACQUISITION by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #14 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO WILMINGTON TRUST AS A FAILED BANK by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #13 TO EXCLUDE ALL REFERENCES TO AND RESULTS FROM COLLATERAL GOVERNMENT ENFORCEMENT ACTIONS by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #16 To Preclude Miscellaneous Questioning Regarding Expert's Prior Employment by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #12 TO EXCLUDE COMMENTARY, ARGUMENT, OR EVIDENCE RELATING TO DEFENDANTS ALLEGED FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE WAIVER PRACTICE IN WILMINGTON TRUSTS SEC FILINGS by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #11 TO EXCLUDE COMMENTARY, ARGUMENT, OR EVIDENCE RELATING TO DEFENDANTS ALLEGED FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE WAIVER PRACTICE TO KPMG AND THE FEDERAL RESERVE DURING THE PERIOD PREDATING THE CHARGES IN THE INDICTMENT by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #15 To Preclude Improper Character Evidence by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Mischaracterization his Separation of Employment, by William B. North. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) Modified on 9/8/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #13 To Preclude Advice Of Auditor Defense by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #10 TO EXCLUDE POST-CONSPIRACY STATEMENTS NOT MADE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE CONSPIRACY AS HEARSAY, by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 9/7/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine regarding Wilmington Trust's Capital Raise by William B. North as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #9 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING LOAN PERFORMANCE AND RISK RATINGS AFTER THE END OF THE ALLEGED WAIVER PRACTICE by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #12 To Preclude Defendants From Misusing Memoranda of Witness Interviews by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Government's use of his Proffer Statement in its Case-in-Chief by William B. North as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #8 TO EXCLUDE SALES CULTURE EVIDENCE by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #11 To Admit Prior Grand Jury Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(1)(A) by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Mischarcterization of an Email Referenced in Paragraph 42 of the Indictment, by William B. North. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) Modified on 9/8/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #7 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING AND REFERENCES TO IRRELEVANT LOANS by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #10 To Preclude Lay Witnesses From Presenting Opinions Consisting Of Legal Conclusions by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #6 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL FINANCING by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #9 To Designate During Trial Former And Current Bank Employees As Hostile Witnesses by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #8 To Declare Nine Former And Current Bank Employees As Identified With An Adverse Party And Hostile Witnesses Pre-Trial by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #7 To Admit Evidence of Common Interest Agreement Between Defendants and Witnesses by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #5 TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EVIDENCE REGARDING KPMGS 2008 AUDIT by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #6 To Admit Evidence of Wilmington Trust's Payment of Witnesses Legal Fees by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #4 TO EXCLUDE REGULATORY FINDINGS AND BANK EXAMINATION MATERIALS OTHER THAN THOSE ADDRESSING by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PRIOR INVOCATIONS OF THE FIFTH AMENDMENT OR GRANTS OF IMMUNITY by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #5 To Preclude Arguments Designed to Elicit Jury Nullification, by USA. (Kravetz, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2017: # 1 Exhibit A) (nms). Modified on 9/8/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #2 TO EXCLUDE INVESTIGATORY STATEMENTS OF NON-TESTIFYING DEFENDANTS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO BE GRANTED A SEVERANCE by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DROPS IN WILMINGTON TRUST STOCK PRICE ABSENT RELIABLE EXPERT TESTIMONY by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #4 To Admit Guilty Pleas, Plea Agreements, And Other Grants of Immunity by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #3 To Introduce Proffer Statements of Defendants' Rakowski and North At Trial, by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 9/7/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #2 To Recall Case Agents, by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 9/7/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine #1 To Preclude Any Evidence or Argument Regarding Third Party Charging Decisions, by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 9/7/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Purported "Push Back" Evidence, by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Michael) Modified on 9/7/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 371 MOTION Admissibility of Evidence (Rule 404(b)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit F)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 421 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DECLARATION of Donald E. Foley re 420 Sealed MOTION in Limine, filed by Robert V.A. Harra (nms) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 420 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude the Howard Email and Related Testimony, by Robert V.A. Harra. (nms) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 380 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Donald A. Walker, Jr. And Douglas Carpenter (Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF by USA re 379 MOTION Regarding Defense Expert Witnesses, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 9/7/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 384 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Neil M. Librock (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 382 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Alan Hess (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SO ORDERED Granting 414 Joint MOTION Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Proposed Jury Instructions, Proposed Voir Dire, and Trial Stipulations (Additional) are now due by 9/15/2017. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/5/2017. (nms) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order, by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 9/5/2017 (nms). (Entered: 09/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 9/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 376 MOTION for Hearing Regarding Waiver of Potential Conflict (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Potential Government Trial Witnesses List, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of John S. Malik, # 3 Exhibit Affidavit of P.J. Bale, # 4 Exhibit Affidavit of David R. Gibson)(Malik, John) (Entered: 09/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter to Judge Andrews from John S. Malik regarding Requesting Defendant Gibson be exused from Conflict Hearing. (Malik, John) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER re 408 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bartholomew J. Dalton regarding the Conflict Hearing on September 8, 2017. The Court grants the request for Ms. Rakowski to be excused from the Hearing. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/31/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Defendant Robert Harra's Joinder by Robert V.A. Harra as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 382 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Alan Hess, 381 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 380 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Donald A. Walker, Jr. And Douglas Carpenter, 383 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 399 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition, 385 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 395 Response to Motion, 384 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Neil M. Librock (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation: The Court will hear Argument re 376 Motion for Conflict Hearing on 9/8/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/31/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bartholomew J. Dalton regarding the Conflict Hearing on September 8, 2017. (Dalton, Andrew) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Response to the Government's Motion Regarding Defense Expert Witnesses by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 395 Response to Motion (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Opposition to Government's Motion Regarding Notice of Potential Rule 404(b) Evidence by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 399 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 382 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Alan Hess, 380 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Donald A. Walker, Jr. And Douglas Carpenter, 384 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Neil M. Librock (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Wilmington Trust Corporations: (1) Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Donald A. Walker, Jr. and Douglas Carpenter (D.I. 380, 381); (2) Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Alan Hess (D.I. 382, 383); (3) Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Neil M. Librock (D.I. 384, 385); (4) Response to Governments Motion regarding Defense Expert Witnesses (D.I. 395); and, (5) Opposition to Governments Motion Regarding Notice of Potential Rule 404(b) Evidence (D.I. 399) by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Nau, Helen) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 400 Response to Motion,, Regarding Potential Presentation of False Testimony to the Grand Jury (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by William B. North as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 382 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Alan Hess, 381 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 380 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Donald A. Walker, Jr. And Douglas Carpenter, 383 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 399 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition, 385 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 395 Response to Motion, 384 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Neil M. Librock (Moultrie, Samuel) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 401 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBITS re 400 Response to Motion, by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 390 Joint MOTION for Discovery to Determine Whether False Testimiony Was Knowingling Presented to the Grand Jury (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit C1, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit E1, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit G1, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit M, # 12 Exhibit M1, # 13 Certificate of Service)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 371 MOTION Admissibility of Evidence (Rule 404(b)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Addendum A, # 2 Exhibit Addendum B, # 3 Exhibit 1-3)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 384 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Neil M. Librock (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 382 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Alan Hess (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 380 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Donald A. Walker, Jr. And Douglas Carpenter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 379 MOTION Defense Expert Witnesses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4-8)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by Kevyn N. Rakowski re 376 MOTION for Hearing with Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Dalton, Andrew) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 393 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBITS to 391 Memorandum in Support, by Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (nms) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER: The Government is directed to file a response to 390 Joint MOTION for Discovery to Determine Whether False Testimony Was Knowingly Presented to the Grand Jury by 8/28/2017. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/23/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 390 Joint MOTION for Discovery to Determine Whether False Testimiony Was Knowingling Presented to the Grand Jury (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Determine Whether False Testimiony Was Knowingling Presented to the Grand Jury, by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Michael) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SO ORDERED Granting 386 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/22/2017. (nms) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Simon A. Latcovich (rwc) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Simon A. Latcovich appearing for Wilmington Trust Corporation (rwc) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION Partially Modify Scheduling Order by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 384 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Neil M. Librock (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Neil M. Librock by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 382 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Alan Hess (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Alan Hess by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 380 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Donald A. Walker, Jr. And Douglas Carpenter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Donald A. Walker, Jr. And Douglas Carpenter, by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION Regarding Defense Expert Witnesses, by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 378 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBIT A 376 MOTION for Hearing as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER: The Court will deny 373 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Robert V.A. Harra (a written order will follow). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/11/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Hearing by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wolf, Lesley) (Main Document 376 replaced on 8/10/2017) (ksr, ). (Entered: 08/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David E. Wilks regarding Motion for Continuance of Trial - re 366 Response to Motion filed by William B. North, 374 Response to Motion filed by USA. (Wilks, David) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 373 MOTION for Reconsideration (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 373 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 372 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBIT C re 371 MOTION Admissibility of Evidence (Rule 404(b) by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION Admissibility of Evidence (Rule 404(b)) by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER: For the reasons set forth during the Teleconference held on 7/18/2017, 363 SEALED MOTION to Continue is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/18/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Teleconference held on 07-18-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2017. (lad) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Luke W. Mette as co-counsel.. (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 367 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED RESPONSE to SEALED MOTION to Continue by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 366 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED RESPONSE to 363 SEALED MOTION to Continue by William B. North as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation(ksr, ) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation: A Telephone Conference is set for 7/18/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge Richard G. Andrews, regarding 363 SEALED MOTION to Continue. The Government shall coordinate the conference call. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/14/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Emergency MOTION to Stay Case Management Schedule on a Temporary Basis (Unopposed) by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 363 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED MOTION to Continue by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER: The MOTION to Quash the Subpoenas (D.I. 344 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/11/2017. (nms) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTED VERSION of 360 Reply Brief, filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-K)(nms) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 360 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 344 MOTION to Quash, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (nms) Modified on 7/7/2017 (nms). (Entered: 07/07/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to Honrable Richard G. Andrews from Lesley F. Wolf regarding Rule 17 Subpoena - re 353 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation, 344 MOTION to Quash filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SO ORDERED as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 357 Stipulation filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/20/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JOINT STIPULATION and Proposed Order on Reply by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System (ksr, ) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher T. Berg appearing for Wilmington Trust Corporation (Berg, Christopher) Modified on 6/16/2017 (rwc). (Entered: 06/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Christopher T. Berg (rwc) Modified on 6/16/2017 (rwc). (Entered: 06/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION by Wilmington Trust Corporation filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 353 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Q, # 2 Exhibit R-U, # 3 Exhibit V-GG)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 344 MOTION to Quash (Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 350 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/13/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation, DENYING 291 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 Through 16 For Failure To State An Offense And As Unconstitutionally Vague, DENYING 293 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus), DENYING 294 MOTION for Joinder of Certain of Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions, DENYING 295 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus), and DENYING 289 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Its Opposition to the Motion to Quash by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SO ORDERED as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 348 Stipulation, filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/7/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION extending response time for Wilmington Trust Corporation to respond to Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System's Motion to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoenas Served on the Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia and the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System re Oral Order, (Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION by Maryann T. Connolly filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 344 MOTION to Quash filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System (ksr, ) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION by Jason A. Gonzalez filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 344 MOTION to Quash filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System (ksr, ) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF in Support of 344 MOTION to Quash Rule 17(C) Subpoenas Served on the Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia and the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(ksr, ) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Quash Rule 17(C) Subpoenas Served on the Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia and the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ksr, ) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Withdrawal of the Appearance of Jameson A.L. Tweedie by Robert V.A. Harra as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER as to Wilmington Trust Corporation DENYING 338 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Requiring Production Prior to Trial, and GRANTING 339 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Pennsylvania Department of Banking and Securities Requiring Production Prior to Trial (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/18/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 340 Response to Motion, regarding Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions for Leave to Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Pennsylvania Department of Banking and Securities and the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Requiring Production Prior to Trial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation re 339 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Pennsylvania Department of Banking and Securities Requiring Production Prior to Trial, 338 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Requiring Production Prior to Trial (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Pennsylvania Department of Banking and Securities Requiring Production Prior to Trial by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1-3)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Requiring Production Prior to Trial by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1-6)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 336 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to David Gibson (2). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/2/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Malik, John) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Entry of appearance of attorney John S. Malik. Attorney William M. Lafferty terminated in case as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski. (Malik, John) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia and the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Requiring Production Prior to Trial, filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation (D.I. 332 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/15/2017. (nms) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Kevyn N. Rakowski, Denying 330 Request for Order Temporarily Modifying Conditions of Release. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/15/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Federal Reserve Bank of Philadelphia and the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Requiring Production Prior to Trial, by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibits A-O)(Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 2/15/2017 (nms). (Entered: 02/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Assistant United States Attorney Lesley F. Wolf regarding Response to Request for Order Temporarily Modifying Conditions of Release - re 330 Letter,. (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter to Honorable Judge Richard G. Andrews from Henry E. Klingeman, Esq. regarding Request for Order Temporarily Modifying Conditions of Release. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Klingeman, Henry) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Jay N. Moffitt as Counsel of Record by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 327 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/18/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Proposed Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Belger, Vera) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Luke W. Mette as co-counsel.. (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 322 Motion for Protective Order as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/3/2017. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by Robert V.A. Harra as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 322 MOTION for Protective Order (Unopposed), 317 Reply Brief/Memorandum, 318 Reply Brief/Memorandum, (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Robert V.A. Harra's Reply to Government's Omnibus Response to Omnibus Motions Filed by Defendants as to Multiplicitous Counts Motion by William B. North as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 316 Reply to Response, (Moultrie, Samuel) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Protective Order (Unopposed) by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Reply Memorandums in Support of Motion for an Amended Bill of Particulars and to Dismiss Counts 3 through 16 for Failure to State a Claim and as Unconstitutionally Vague by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 317 Reply Brief/Memorandum, 318 Reply Brief/Memorandum, (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 316 Reply to Response, (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Reply Memorandums in Support of Motion for an Amended Bill of Particulars and to Dismiss Counts 3 through 16 for Failure to State a Claim and as Unconstitutionally Vague by William B. North as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 317 Reply Brief/Memorandum, 318 Reply Brief/Memorandum, (Moultrie, Samuel) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 291 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 Through 16 For Failure To State An Offense And As Unconstitutionally Vague (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 289 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 205 Response to Motion, 171 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 168 MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitious Counts, 220 Reply Brief/Memorandum, 315 Response to Motion, (Tweedie, Jameson) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 293 Omnibus MOTION to Dismiss, 294 MOTION for Joinder, (2) Motion Reasserting Prior Motion to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts, and (3) Motion Reasserting in Part Request for a Bill of Particulars Supplementing Defendant, and 295 Omnibus MOTION to Dismiss, by USA (Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 12/9/2016 (nms). (Entered: 12/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 291 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 Through 16 For Failure To State An Offense And As Unconstitutionally Vague, by USA. (Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 12/9/2016 (nms). (Entered: 12/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 289 MOTION for Bill of Particulars, by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 12/9/2016 (nms). (Entered: 12/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 311 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency Requiring Production Prior to Trial. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/30/2016. (nms) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency Requiring Production Prior to Trial, by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibits 1-8, # 3 Proposed Subpoena)(Majarian, Matthew) Modified on 11/30/2016 (nms). (Entered: 11/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SO ORDERED Granting 309 Joint Motion and Scheduling Order. Trial Stipulations due by 9/6/2017; Joint Proposed Draft Jury Instructions, Proposed Voir Dire, Motions in Limine shall be due by 9/6/2017; Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2017, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A; Jury Selection will be held on 10/2/2017, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A; Jury Trial set to begin on 10/10/2017, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/22/2016. (nms) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION Entry of Scheduling Order by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Robert V.A. Harra's Motion Reasserting Prior Motion to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts by William B. North as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 294 MOTION for Joinder of Certain of Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions, (2) Motion Reasserting Prior Motion to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts, and (3) Motion Reasserting in Part Request for a Bill of Particulars Supplementing Defenda (Moultrie, Samuel) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Robert V.A. Harras Motion Reasserting Prior Motion to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Nau, Helen) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Harra's Motion Reasserting Prior Motion to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 294 MOTION for Joinder of Certain of Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions, (2) Motion Reasserting Prior Motion to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts, and (3) Motion Reasserting in Part Request for a Bill of Particulars Supplementing Defenda (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven P. Wood appearing for Robert V.A. Harra (Wood, Steven) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Count 3 through 16 for Failure to State an Offense and as Unconstitutionally Vague by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 291 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 Through 16 For Failure To State An Offense And As Unconstitutionally Vague, 292 Brief/Memorandum in Support (Nau, Helen) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Omnibus Motion by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 293 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) (Nau, Helen) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion for an Amended Bill of Particulars by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 289 MOTION for Bill of Particulars , 290 Brief/Memorandum in Support (Nau, Helen) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 289 MOTION for Bill of Particulars , 290 Brief/Memorandum in Support (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 293 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 291 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 Through 16 For Failure To State An Offense And As Unconstitutionally Vague, 292 Brief/Memorandum in Support (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Omnibus Motion by William B. North as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 293 MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) (Wilks, David) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Count 3 through 16 for Failure to State an Offense and as Unconstitutionally Vauge by William B. North as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 291 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 Through 16 For Failure To State An Offense And As Unconstitutionally Vague, 292 Brief/Memorandum in Support (Wilks, David) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion for an Amended Bill of Particulars by William B. North as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 289 MOTION for Bill of Particulars , 290 Brief/Memorandum in Support (Wilks, David) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by William B. North. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate Under Local Rule 5(d)(2))(Wilks, David) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Joinder of Certain of Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions, (2) Motion Reasserting Prior Motion to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts, and (3) Motion Reasserting in Part Request for a Bill of Particulars Supplementing Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion for a Bill of Particulars by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification Under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2))(Mette, Luke) Modified on 1/6/2017 (ksr, ). (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss (Omnibus) by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification Under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2))(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 291 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 Through 16 For Failure To State An Offense And As Unconstitutionally Vague (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 Through 16 For Failure To State An Offense And As Unconstitutionally Vague by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 289 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification Under Local Rule 5(d)(2))(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation, Granting 266 MOTION to Continue Trial. Jury Selection is now set to begin on 10/2/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Time is excluded from 9/7/2016 until 10/2/2017, in the Interests of Justice. (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/7/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Continuance held on 08-26-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2016. (lad) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. Time excluded from 8/26/2016 until 9/26/2016. Pretrial Motions due by 9/26/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/26/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 275 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the State of Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner Requiring Production Prior to Trial (Unopposed) as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/26/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Defendant Robert V.A. Harra's Joinder to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion for Leave to Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the State of Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner Requiring Production Prior to Trial by Robert V.A. Harra as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 275 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the State of Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner Requiring Production Prior to Trial (Unopposed) (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 283 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBITS A, B, F, G and I re 276 Response to Motion, by USA (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 277 Motion to Reset Arraignment as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/25/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Serve a Rule 17(C) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the State of Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner Requiring Production Prior To Trial by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Serve a Rule 17(C) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the State of Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Nau, Helen) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter to Judge Richard Andrews, dated 8/24/2016 from A. Zachary Naylor, Esq, regarding Wilmington Trust Securities Litigation (C.A. 19-990 SLR). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(ksr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Serve a Rule 17(C) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the State of Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner Requiring Production Prior to Trial by William B. North (Moultrie, Samuel) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Reset Arraignment (Unopposed) re Set/Reset Hearings, by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 266 MOTION to Continue Trial (Attachments: # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 8/25/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 08/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on the State of Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner Requiring Production Prior to Trial (Unopposed) by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Subpoena)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER as to David Gibson granting D.I. 259 UNNOPPOSED MOTION for WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty filed by David Gibson. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/17/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address by William B. North (Wilks, David) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 198 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on KPMG LLP Requiring Production Prior to Trial as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/12/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion to Continue Trial by Robert V.A. Harra as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 267 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 266 MOTION to Continue Trial (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion to Continue Trial by William B. North (Moultrie, Samuel) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion to Continue Trial by Kevyn N. Rakowski (Klingeman, Henry) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Joinder to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion To Continue Trial] by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Moffitt, Jay) Modified on 8/12/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 266 MOTION to Continue Trial (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine Trefz, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Continue Trial by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 265 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sealed Ex Parte Document re 264 Letter by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter to Judge Richard Andrews from Robert Kravetz, Esq., dated 8/5/2016 enclosing copies of transcripts of Voir Dire. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter to Judge Richard Andrews from Robert Kravetz, Esq., dated 8/2/2016 regarding Grand Jury Matters. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 262 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sealed Ex Parte Document re 261 Letter by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter to Judge Richard G. Andrews from Robert Kravetz, Esq. dated 7/20/2016 enclosing copies of transcripts. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Regarding Cover Letters Enclosing Ex Parte Materials as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/11/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
UNNOPPOSED MOTION for WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by David Gibson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant David R. Gibson's Entry of Plea of Not Guilty and Waiver of Appearance, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guberman, Phara) Modified on 8/16/2016 (dlk). (Entered: 08/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to William B. North re 245 GRANTING Waiver of Presence at Arraignment on August 11, 2016 filed by William B. North. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/10/16. (kjk) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Wilmington Trust Corporation re 256 GRANTING MOTION to Reset Arraignment until August 25, 2016 at 1;00 pm filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/10/16. (kjk) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Reset Arraignment re Set/Reset Hearings, (Unopposed) by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Kevyn N. Rakowski re 252 GRANTING MOTION Unopposed Motion to Reset Arraignment to August 25, 2016 at 1:00 pm filed by Kevyn N. Rakowski. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/10/16. (kjk) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Robert V.A. Harra re 247 GRANTING Waiver of Presence at Arraignment filed by Robert V.A. Harra. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/10/16. (kjk) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Kevyn N. Rakowski re 250 GRANTING Waiver of Presence at Arraignment filed by Kevyn N. Rakowski. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/10/16. (kjk) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION Unopposed Motion to Reset Arraignment by Kevyn N. Rakowski. (Nau, Helen) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 249 Motion To Continue the Arraignment until 8/25/16 at 1:00 PM as to David Gibson (2). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/9/16. (kjk) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Kevyn N. Rakowski (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Nau, Helen) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION Unopposed Motion to Reset Arraignment by David Gibson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Reset Arraignment to 8/25/16)(Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Dismissing as Moot 238 Motion for Joinder; Dismissing as Moot 233 MOTION for the Court to Conduct Vior Dire of the Grand Jury for Bias. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Robert V.A. Harra (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jameson A.L. Tweedie appearing for Robert V.A. Harra (Tweedie, Jameson) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by William B. North (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 233 MOTION for the Court to Conduct Vior Dire of the Grand Jury for Bias (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 243 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTED VERSION of 242 Third Superseding Indictment with a Notice of Forfeiture by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski. (kjk) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
THIRD SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT with a Notice of Forfeiture as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s-10s, 11s-16s, David Gibson (2) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss-10ss, 11ss-16ss, 17ss-19ss, Robert V.A. Harra (3) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss-10ss, 11ss-16ss, William B. North (4) count(s) 1sss, 2sss, 4sss, 5sss, 6sss, 7sss-10sss, 11sss-16sss, Kevyn N. Rakowski (5) count(s) 1sss, 2sss, 4sss, 5sss, 6sss, 7sss-10sss, 11sss-16sss. ( Original SEALED - to be maintained in the Clerk's Office ). (kjk) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BILL OF PARTICULARS filed by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew P. Majarian appearing for Wilmington Trust Corporation (Majarian, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Withdrawal of the appearance of Lori W. Will on behalf of Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation by Wilmington Trust Corporation (Saunders, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder - Defendant David R. Gibsons Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporations Motion for the Court to Conduct Voir Dire of the Grand Jury for Bias - by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Moffitt, Jay) Modified on 8/5/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 07/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by William B. North as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 233 MOTION for the Court to Conduct Vior Dire of the Grand Jury for Bias , 234 Brief/Memorandum in Support (Wilks, David) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Nau, Helen) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder by Robert V.A. Harra as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski re 233 MOTION for the Court to Conduct Vior Dire of the Grand Jury for Bias , 234 Brief/Memorandum in Support (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 233 MOTION for the Court to Conduct Vior Dire of the Grand Jury for Bias (Will, Lori) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for the Court to Conduct Vior Dire of the Grand Jury for Bias by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 198 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on KPMG LLP Requiring Production Prior to Trial (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Denying 187 MOTION for Disclosure of Certain Grand Jury Materials and MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment if any Grand Jurors were Biased as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/12/2016. (nms) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: Motion to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 5, 11-16 for Failure to Allege Essential Elements 166 is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED IN-PART; Motion to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts 168 is DENIED; Motion to Dismiss Counts 7 Through 10 for Failure to State an Offense 169 is DENIED; Motion to Dismiss Counts 2 Through 16 and Portions of Count 1 for Failure to State an Offense 172 is DENIED; Supplemental Motion for a Bill of Particulars 174 at paragraph 4) is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART; Motion to Dismiss Counts 17 Through 19 for Failure to State an Offense 175 is DENIED; Motion to Dismiss Counts 1 Through 16 as Unconstitutionally Vague 176 is DENIED;Motion for a Bill of Particulars 179 is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART; Motion for a Bill of Particulars for Counts 17 Through 19 181 is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART; Motion to Dismiss the Second Superseding Indictment 182 is DENIED; Motion to Dismiss Count I of the Second Superseding Indictment 183 is DENIED; Motion to Dismiss Count II of the Second Superseding Indictment 184 is DENIED; Motion for a Bill of Particulars 185 is GRANTEDIN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/11/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 229 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER as to Wilmington Trust Corporation Denying 154 MOTION to Compel filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/11/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 07-07-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2016. (lad) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporations Notice of Ex Parte Delivery of Sealed List of the Names and Addresses of Shareholders Referenced in the Motion for Disclosure of Certain Grand Jury Materials and to Dismiss the Indictment if any Grand Jurors Were Biased as a Matter of Law by Wilmington Trust Corporation (Will, Lori) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles L. McCloud for Wilmington Trust Corporation by Wilmington Trust Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing for Charles L. McCloud)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 200 Motion for Leave to File as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/28/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by William B. North re 185 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Wilks, David) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by William B. North re 184 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of the Second Superseding Indictment (Wilks, David) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by William B. North re 183 MOTION to Dismiss Count I of the Second Superseding Indictment (Wilks, David) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by William B. North re 182 MOTION to Dismiss Second Superseding Indictment (Wilks, David) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 168 MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitious Counts (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 181 MOTION to Dismiss for a Bill of Particulars for Counts 17 Through 19 (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 175 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 17 Through 19 For Failure To State An Offense (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 187 MOTION for Disclosure of Certain Grand Jury Materials and MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment if any Grand Jurors were Biased as a Matter of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 176 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 Through 16 as Unconstitutionally Vague (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 166 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 5, 11-16 for Failure to Allege Essential Elements (Will, Lori) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 172 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2 Through 16 and Portions of Count I for Failure to State an Offense (Will, Lori) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 179 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Will, Lori) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 169 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 7 Through 10 for Failure to State an Offense (Will, Lori) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 181 MOTION to Dismiss for a Bill of Particulars for Counts 17 Through 19, 185 MOTION for Bill of Particulars , 179 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions by Robert V.A. Harra re 202 Notice (Other) (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 183 MOTION to Dismiss Count I of the Second Superseding Indictment, 182 MOTION to Dismiss Second Superseding Indictment, 184 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of the Second Superseding Indictment, 172 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2 Through 16 and Portions of Count I for Failure to State an Offense, 166 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 5, 11-16 for Failure to Allege Essential Elements (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 169 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 7 Through 10 for Failure to State an Offense (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 175 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 17 Through 19 For Failure To State An Offense (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 176 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 Through 16 as Unconstitutionally Vague (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 168 MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitious Counts (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 187 MOTION for Disclosure of Certain Grand Jury Materials and MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment if any Grand Jurors were Biased as a Matter of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions for Leave to Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on KPMG, LLC requiring Production Prior to Trial by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of joinder to Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Nau, Helen) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder to Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motions for Leave to Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on KPMG, LLP Requiring Production Prior to Trial by William B. North. (Moultrie, Samuel) Modified on 6/28/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on KPMG LLP requiring Production Prior to Trial (UNOPPOSED) by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 198 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on KPMG LLP Requiring Production Prior to Trial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to File and Serve a Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum on KPMG LLP Requiring Production Prior to Trial by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Defendants' Motion to Compel held on 05-18-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2016. (lad) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EXHIBIT re 181 MOTION to Dismiss for a Bill of Particulars for Counts 17 Through 19 - Certification under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2) - by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder to 187 Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion for Disclosure of Certain Grand Jury Materials and to Dismiss the Indictment if any Grand Jurors were Biased as a Matter of Law by William B. North. (Moultrie, Samuel) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder To Other Defendants' Motions 166 , 168 , 172 , 176 , 179 , 187 by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2))(Moffitt, Jay) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder to 168 Robert Harra's Motion to Dismiss by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Nau, Helen) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder to 179 WTC's motion for a Bill of Particulars by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Nau, Helen) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder to 187 WTC's motion for grand jury material by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Nau, Helen) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder to 166 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 5, 11-16 for Failure to Allege Essential Elements, 172 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2 Through 16 and Portions of Count I for Failure to State an Offense , 176 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 Through 16 as Unconstitutionally Vague by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Nau, Helen) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder to 166 , 168 , 172 , 176 , 179] Other Defendants' Motions by William B. North. (Wilks, David) Modified on 5/18/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 187 MOTION for Disclosure of Certain Grand Jury Materials and MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment if any Grand Jurors were Biased as a Matter of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Disclosure of Certain Grand Jury Materials and, MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment if any Grand Jurors were Biased as a Matter of Law by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 181 MOTION to Dismiss for a Bill of Particulars for Counts 17 Through 19 (Lafferty, William) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Bill of Particulars by William B. North. (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Count II of the Second Superseding Indictment by William B. North. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Count I of the Second Superseding Indictment by William B. North. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Second Superseding Indictment by William B. North. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss for a Bill of Particulars for Counts 17 Through 19 by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lafferty, William) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 179 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification Under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2))(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 175 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 17 Through 19 For Failure To State An Offense (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 176 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 Through 16 as Unconstitutionally Vague (Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 Through 16 as Unconstitutionally Vague by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 17 Through 19 For Failure To State An Offense by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Joinder of Certain Motions filed by Co-Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation and to Supplement Co-Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion for a Bill of Particulars by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Under Local Rule 5(d)(2), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mette, Luke) Modified on 7/12/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 172 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2 Through 16 and Portions of Count I for Failure to State an Offense (Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2 Through 16 and Portions of Count I for Failure to State an Offense by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 168 MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitious Counts (Mette, Luke) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 169 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 7 Through 10 for Failure to State an Offense (Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 7 Through 10 for Failure to State an Offense by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitious Counts by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mette, Luke) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 166 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 5, 11-16 for Failure to Allege Essential Elements (Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 5, 11-16 for Failure to Allege Essential Elements by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 154 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-15, # 2 Appendix A)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE to join motion to compel by Kevyn N. Rakowski (Dalton, Andrew) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBIT re 162 Sealed Letter by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sealed Letter by USA. (ksr, ) Modified on 5/9/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/09/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 154 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kenneth M. Breen regarding Status of pending discovery motions by individual defendants in response to oral order on 4/12/16. (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1), David Gibson (2), Robert V.A. Harra (3), William B. North (4), Kevyn N. Rakowski (5). The Government shall file its response to 154 Motion to Compel by April 29, 2016 and Defendant shall file any reply brief by May 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/15/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 154 MOTION to Compel by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: R. Stokes Nolte appearing for William B. North (Nolte, R.) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 154 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-15)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification Under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2))(Will, Lori) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER re 151 Motion for Joint MOTION Scheduling Order as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1), David Gibson (2), Robert V.A. Harra (3), William B. North (4), Kevyn N. Rakowski (5). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/14/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 12.4 by Wilmington Trust Corporation (Will, Lori) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION Scheduling Order by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 149 Motion for Protective Order as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1), David Gibson (2), Robert V.A. Harra (3), William B. North (4), Kevyn N. Rakowski (5). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation: A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/4/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Jury Selection is set to begin on 1/17/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Jury Trial is set for 1/23/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/24/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew Caulfield Dalton appearing for Kevyn N. Rakowski (Dalton, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew Caulfield Dalton appearing for Kevyn N. Rakowski Notice of Appearance for Bartholomew J Dalton for Kevyn Rakowski (Dalton, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to Kevyn N. Rakowski. Time excluded from 2/5/2016 until 3/7/2016. Pretrial Motions due by 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/5/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to David Gibson. Time excluded from 2/5/2016 until 3/7/2016. Pretrial Motions due by 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/5/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to Wilmington Trust Corporation. Time excluded from 2/5/2016 until 3/7/2016. Pretrial Motions due by 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/5/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 02-05-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (lad) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 138 Motion for Protective Order as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1), David Gibson (2), Robert V.A. Harra (3), William B. North (4), Kevyn N. Rakowski (5). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/4/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Christopher J. Gunther. (cna) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT (JOINT REGARDING SCHEDULING) by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Kevyn N. Rakowski granting D.I. 122 Waiver of Presence at Arraignment filed by Kevyn N. Rakowski. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/28/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Helen A. Nau (rwc) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Henry E. Klingeman (rwc) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 97 MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant To Brady v. Maryland, 110 MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Rule 16 (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to Robert V.A. Harra. Time excluded from 1/14/2016 until 2/15/2016. Pretrial Motions due by 2/15/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/14/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to William B. North. Time excluded from 1/14/2016 until 2/15/2016. Pretrial Motions due by 2/15/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/14/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation Granting 121 Joint MOTION to Schedule Status Conference. A Status Conference is set for 2/5/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Time is excluded from 1/14/2016 until 2/5/2016, in the Interests of Justice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2016. (ksr, ) Modified on 1/22/2016 (rwc). (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Lance A. Wade. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Tobin J. Romero. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Margaret A. Keeley. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Barry S. Simon. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr., Barry S. Simon, Margaret A. Keeley, Tobin J. Romero, Lance A. Wade appearing for Wilmington Trust Corporation (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to John P. Nowak (rwc) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to David Gibson granting D.I. 119 Waiver of Presence at Arraignment filed by David Gibson. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/13/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Kevyn N. Rakowski (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Klingeman, Henry) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION to Schedule Status Conference by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Scott Saunders appearing for Wilmington Trust Corporation and Notice of Appearance for Christopher J. Gunther and Lori W. Will (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing for Christopher J. Gunther)(Saunders, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by David Gibson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to William B. North granting D.I. 115 Waiver of Presence at Arraignment filed by William B. North. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/13/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Robert V.A. Harra granting D.I. 116 Waiver of Presence at Arraignment filed by Robert V.A. Harra. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/13/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Robert V.A. Harra (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by William B. North (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 97 MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant To Brady v. Maryland, 110 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Rule 16 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTED VERSION of 112 Second Superseding Indictment by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski. (kjk) (kjk). (Entered: 01/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT with a Notice of Forfeiture as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7-10, 11-16, David Gibson (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s-10s, 11s-16s, 17s-19s, Robert V.A. Harra (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s-10s, 11s-16s, William B. North (4) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss-10ss, 11ss-16ss, Kevyn N. Rakowski (5) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss-10ss, 11ss-16ss. ( Original SEALED - to be maintained in the Clerk's Office ). (kjk) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexander Ibrahim appearing for USA. (Ibrahim, Alexander) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Rule 16 by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(ksr, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra re 97 MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant To Brady v. Maryland (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 104 Motion to Amend/Correct as to William B. North (1), Kevyn N. Rakowski (2), David Gibson (3), Robert V.A. Harra (4). See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/15/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jamie M. McCall appearing for USA. as co-counsel (McCall, Jamie) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED EXHIBITS A and B re 103 MOTION to Amend/Correct Memorandum and Redline Under Seal by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra (ksr, ) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 96 Motion to Seal Document as to William B. North (1), Kevyn N. Rakowski (2), David Gibson (3), Robert V.A. Harra (4). (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/14/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Amend/Correct Version of Their Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Brady v. Maryland by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Amend/Correct Memorandum and Redline Under Seal by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of 110 by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moffitt, Jay) Modified on 12/17/2015 (lih). Modified on 12/17/2015 (ksr, ). (Entered: 12/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EXHIBIT re 96 MOTION to Seal Document by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant To Brady v. Maryland by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification Under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2))(Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (ksr, ) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Lauren K. Neal as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with the firm of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell. (Neal, Lauren) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 93 Joint MOTION for Waiver of Speedy Trial Act Due to Complex Case Designation, filed by USA. Time is excluded from 1/15/2016, until 9/26/2016, in the Interests of Justice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/6/2015. (nms) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION for Waiver of Speedy Trial Act Due to Complex Case Designation by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Phara A. Guberman (rwc) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Luke W. Mette appearing for Robert V.A. Harra (Mette, Luke) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 88 Motion for Protective Order as to William B. North (1), Kevyn N. Rakowski (2), David Gibson (3), Robert V.A. Harra (4). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/22/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re 84 Letter as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/20/2015. (ksr, ) (Main Document 89 replaced on 10/22/2015) (ksr, ). (Entered: 10/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Protective Order (Supplemental) - Governing Discovery by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra re 28 MOTION For A Hearing Under Seal filed by Kevyn N. Rakowski. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/14/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Robert F. Kravetz and Lesley F. Wolf regarding Government's Response regarding Briefing Schedule - re 84 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Samuel Lee Moultrie appearing for William B. North (Moultrie, Samuel) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter to Judge Andrews from David E. Wilks regarding Briefing Schedule. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Supplemental Scheduling Order re 82 MOTION Proposed Supplemental Scheduling Order as to William B. North (1), Kevyn N. Rakowski (2), David Gibson (3), Robert V.A. Harra (4). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION Proposed Supplemental Scheduling Order by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sealed AFFIDAVIT. (Balick, Adam) (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on 09-21-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2015. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Conflict of Interest Motion held on 09-21-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2015. (lad) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/13/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. An 8 week Jury Trial is set for 9/26/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Time is excluded from 9/21/2015 until 1/15/2016, in the Interests of Justice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/21/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Affiant Kevyn Rakowski filed by Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Adam Balick, Esquire regarding Unredacted Copy of Affidavit - re 70 Order,, Order to Continue - Ends of Justice,, Set Hearings,. (Balick, Adam) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION Scheduling Order by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Adam Balick, Esquire regarding affidavit waiving any potential conflict of interest - re 73 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Waiving a Potential Conflict of Interest)(Balick, Adam) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter to Honorable Judge Richard G. Andrews, U.S.D.J. from Henry E. Klingeman regarding New Counsel retained to represent potential witness. (Klingeman, Henry) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Good Standing as to Sharon D. Feldman (rwc) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sharon D. Feldman appearing for Robert V.A. Harra (rwc) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson and Robert V.A. Harra Granting 69 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Pretrial Motions Deadlines and for Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/21/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Time is excluded from 9/3/2015 until 9/21/2015, in the Interests of Justice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/3/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Pretrial Motions Deadlines and for Scheduling Conference by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Kevyn N. Rakowski -granting 67 MOTION to Reschedule Initial Appearance and Arraignment. An Initial Appearance and Arraignment is set for 9/21/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice as to Kevyn N. Rakowski. Time is excluded from 9/2/2015 until 9/21/2015. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/2/2015. (lih) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Reschedule Initial Appearance and Arraignment by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klingeman, Henry) Modified on 9/1/2015 (lih). (Entered: 09/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 66 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Returned Executed on 8/10/2015 as to David Gibson (SEALED) (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke from Michael P. Kelly regarding Conditions of Release. (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Passport issued to Robert V.A. Harra (dlk) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 56 Motion for Protective Order as to William B. North (1), Kevyn N. Rakowski (2), David Gibson (3), Robert V.A. Harra (4). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to Robert V.A. Harra. Time excluded from 8/20/2015 until 9/21/2015. Pretrial Motions due by 9/21/2015. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/20/2015. (dlk) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to Robert V.A. Harra in amount of $ 25,000, executed by Defendant. (dlk) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/20/2015. (dlk) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTED VERSION of 45 SEALED Letter by USA as to Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTED VERSION of 30 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Henry E. Klingeman by Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTED VERSION of 29 SEALED Letter/BRIEF in Support by Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Protective Order Governing Discovery by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss as to William B. North (1). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/18/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment filed by Defendant William North (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lauren Kimberly Neal appearing for David Gibson and Notice of Appearance of William M. Lafferty and Jay N. Moffitt (Neal, Lauren) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Passport by David Gibson (lih) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to David Gibson. Time excluded from 8/13/2015 until 9/14/2015. Pretrial Motions due by 9/14/2015. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/13/2015. (lih) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to David Gibson in amount of $25,000.00, executed by David Gibson. (lih) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTED VERSION of 48 Order Setting Conditions of Release by David Gibson (lih) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to David Gibson (3) Unsecured Bond (SEALED). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/13/2015. (lih) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Returned Executed on 8/8/2015 as to Kevyn N. Rakowski (SEALED) (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED Letter re 34 Order re 28 Unopposed MOTION For A Hearing Under Seal, filed by USA.(ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER as to Kevyn N. Rakowski: Docket Items 28 and 34 are UNSEALED. Defendant shall SUBMIT copies of Docket Items 29 and 30 , redacted in conformity with this Order, by no later than August 20, 2015(See order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/11/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Letter to Honorable Judge Richard G. Andrews from Henry E. Klingeman, Esq. regarding Motion for Hearing. (Klingeman, Henry) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel J. Brown appearing for Robert V.A. Harra (Brown, Daniel) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew S. Dupre appearing for Robert V.A. Harra (Dupre, Andrew) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael P. Kelly appearing for Robert V.A. Harra (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to William B. North. Time excluded from 8/6/2015 until 9/8/2015. Pretrial Motions due by 9/8/2015. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/6/2015. (lih) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTED VERSION of 35 Indictment, by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A Harra, Jr (lih) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT with a Notice of Forfeiture for Counts I-IV and Counts VI-X as to William B. North (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s-10s, 11s-16s, Kevyn N. Rakowski (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s-10s, 11s-16s, David Gibson (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7-10, 11-16, 17-19, Robert V.A Harra, Jr (4) count(s) 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 7-10, 11-16. ( Original SEALED - to be maintained in the Clerk's Office ). (lih) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order re 28 Unopposed MOTION For A Hearing Under Seal as to Kevyn N. Rakowski (2). A Hearing is set for 9/21/2015 at 9:00 am in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2015. (ksr, ) (Main Document 34 replaced on 8/11/2015) (ksr, ). Modified on 8/11/2015 (ksr, ). (Entered: 08/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to William B. North. The government shall file it's response to D.I. 23 by 8/17/2015 (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/28/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion by William B. North re 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment by USA as to William B. North. (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Henry E. Klingeman re 28 Sealed Unopposed MOTION For A Hearing Under Seal, filed by Kevyn N. Rakowski. (nms) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED Letter/BRIEF in Support of 28 Sealed Unopposed MOTION For A Hearing Under Seal, by Kevyn N. Rakowski. (nms) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unopposed MOTION For A Hearing Under Seal, by Kevyn N. Rakowski. (nms) (Main Document 28 replaced on 8/11/2015) (ksr, ). Modified on 8/11/2015 (ksr, ). (Entered: 07/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ORDER: The Government shall file its response to the Motion to Dismiss The Indictment (D.I. 23 ) by 7/30/2015. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/22/2015. (nms) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sealed Multi Media Document (Exhibits A-D) re 25 NOTICE of Lodging by William B. North (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Lodging of Exhibits to 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support, by William B. North (Wilks, David) Modified on 7/22/2015 (nms). (Entered: 07/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by William B. North re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Indictment by William B. North. (Wilks, David) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to William B. North Granting 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions. Pretrial Motions are now due by 9/11/2015. Time is excluded from 7/8/2015 until 9/11/2015, in the Interests of Justice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/8/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by William B. North. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilks, David) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Kevyn N. Rakowski Granting 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions. Pretrial Motions are now due by 9/11/2015. Time is excluded from 7/13/2015 until 9/11/2015, in the Interests of Justice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Kevyn N. Rakowski. (Klingeman, Henry) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 17 Motion for Protective Order as to William B. North (1), Kevyn N. Rakowski (2). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/24/2015. (ksr, ) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Protective Order Governing Discovery by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Passport as to Kevyn N. Rakowski. (kjk) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Kevyn N. Rakowski (2) Own Recognizance. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/9/15. (kjk) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to Kevyn N. Rakowski; Time excluded from 6/9/15 until 7/13/15. Pretrial Motions due by 7/13/2015. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/9/15. (kjk) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 64 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?