District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Florida Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit United States Supreme Court

Lavigne v. HERBALIFE, LTD
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-23429-MGC
District Judge Marcia G. Cooke, presiding

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated August 10, 2021 at 2:42 PM DT (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cody Pyle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lara O'Donnell +laramar kmi gdalcom

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
No Logo Felix Valdez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lara O'Donnell +laramar kmi gdalcom

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
No Logo Izaar Valdez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lara O'Donnell +laramar kmi gdalcom

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
No Logo Jeff Rodgers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lara O'Donnell +laramar kmi gdalcom

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
No Logo Jennifer Lavigne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lara O'Donnell +laramar kmi gdalcom

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
No Logo Jennifer Ribalta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lara O'Donnell +laramar kmi gdalcom

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
No Logo Michael Lavigne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lara O'Donnell +laramar kmi gdalcom

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
No Logo Patricia Rodgers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lara O'Donnell +laramar kmi gdalcom

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
v.
No Logo Alcides Mejia, Defendant
No Logo Amber Wick, Defendant
No Logo Amy Hendricks, Defendant
No Logo Arquimedes G. Valencia, Defendant
No Logo Bradley Harris, Defendant
No Logo Carol Rosenau, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Reese, Defendant
No Logo Claudia Rasch, Defendant
No Logo Cody Morrow, Defendant
No Logo Daniel J. Waldron, Defendant
No Logo Danielle Edwards, Defendant
No Logo Debbie Katz, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Dowdell, Defendant
No Logo Disney De La Concepcion, Defendant
No Logo Emma Sandoval, Defendant
No Logo Enrique Carillo, Defendant
No Logo Fernando Rancel, Defendant
No Logo Gabriel Sandoval, Defendant
No Logo Garrain S. Jones, Defendant
No Logo Graeme Edwards, Defendant
No Logo Guillermo Rasch, Defendant
Herbalife International Of America, Inc. Herbalife International Of America, Inc., Defendant
Herbalife International, Inc. Herbalife International, Inc., Defendant
Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. Herbalife Nutrition Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "HERBALIFE, LTD"
No Logo Jason Wick, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Micheli, Defendant
No Logo Jenny Davis, Defendant
No Logo Jillian Addy, Defendant
No Logo John Tartol, Defendant
No Logo Jorge De La Concepcion, Defendant
No Logo Kristopher Bickerstaff, Defendant
No Logo Leslie R Stanford, Defendant
No Logo Lori Baker, Defendant
No Logo Manuel Costa, Defendant
No Logo Mark Matika, Defendant
No Logo Mark Addy, Defendant
No Logo Mark Davis, Defendant
No Logo Michael Katz, Defendant
No Logo Miriam Mejia, Defendant
No Logo Paulina Riveros, Defendant
No Logo Paymi Romero, Defendant
No Logo Ron Rosenau, Defendant
No Logo Ryan Baker, Defendant
No Logo Samuel Hendricks, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Gioiosa, Defendant
No Logo Susan Peterson, Defendant
No Logo Thomas P. Gioiosa, Defendant
Office Miami
Filed 9/18/2017
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Miami-Dade (Office
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag JG
  Entries (189) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) by ATTORNEY ONLY
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None extension of time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) by ATTORNEY ONLY
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None Supplement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Supplement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Strike
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Affidavit
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/5/2021, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) by ATTORNEY ONLY
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) by ATTORNEY ONLY
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) by ATTORNEY ONLY
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) by ATTORNEY ONLY
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) by ATTORNEY ONLY
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/13/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) by ATTORNEY ONLY
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting [120] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Michael S. Catlett is hereby withdrawn from the case as counsel of record for the Individual Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/27/2020. (jzn)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020, Terminated: 5/27/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael S. Catlett for / by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 6/10/2020 (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: 12/26/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick of Withdrawal of S. Douglas Knox (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediation
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                            Attorney Steven Douglas Knox terminated per DE [119] Notice of Withdrawal of S. Douglas Knox. (kpe)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Electronic Availability of ROA
                                                                                                                                Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: [113] Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 18-14048-JJ. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (hh)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA
                                                                                                                                  Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re [113] Notice of Appeal, filed by Jason Wick, Mark Addy, Ron Rosenau, Paulina Riveros, Leslie R Stanford, Daniel J. Waldron, Ryan Baker, Disney De La Concepcion, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Dennis Dowdell, Carol Rosenau, Michael Katz, Christopher Reese, Mark Matika, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Jorge De La Concepcion, Jennifer Micheli, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Fernando Rancel, Gabriel Sandoval, Graeme Edwards, Garrain S. Jones, Bradley Harris, Susan Peterson, Cody Morrow, Emma Sandoval, Sandra Gioiosa, Guillermo Rasch, Debbie Katz, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Paymi Romero, Claudia Rasch, Danielle Edwards, Jenny Davis, Enrique Carillo, Jillian Addy, Manuel Costa, Lori Baker, John Tartol, Amy Hendricks, Mark Davis, Amber Wick, Samuel Hendricks. Date received by USCA: 9/21/18. USCA Case Number: 18-14048-JJ. (hh)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Administrative OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Defendant's [115] Joint Motion For an Automatic Stay of All Proceedings in This Matter, Pending Resolution of Defendants Appeal of the Courts August 23, 2018 Order. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/24/2018. See attached document for full details. (chd)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018, Terminated: 9/24/2018 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Stay re [113] Notice of Appeal,,,, by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 10/5/2018 (Knox, Steven)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part [112] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's [111] Response in Opposition to Defendant's [68] Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall file their Reply by September 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/21/2018. (chd)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                          Reset Deadlines Per DE#114. Replies due by 9/25/2018. (cqs)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                            Reset Deadlines Per DE#114. Replies due by 9/25/2018. (cqs)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                              Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [113] Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (hh)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appeal as to [106] Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Change Venue by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-11012346. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Knox, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018, Terminated: 9/21/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [68] MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice [1] Complaint,,,, by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Knox, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [68] MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice [1] Complaint,,,, Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Indivdual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Replies due by 9/21/2018. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER Modifying briefing schedule set in this Court's [106] Order on Motion to Compel and Motion to Change Venue. In order to conform with Local Rule 7.1(c) and this Court's practices, procedures, and schedule, the Court ORDERS as follows:Plaintiffs shall file their Response to Defendants' [68] Motion to Dismiss by September 14, 2018.Defendants shall file their Reply by September 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/4/2018. (chd)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 2:18-cv-07480, filed 08/27/2018. (bb)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 107 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 8-22-2018 before Judge Marcia G. Cooke, 1-38 pages, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5634 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2018. (gbx)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                            SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:17-cv-23429 electronically transferred out to California Central. (cqs)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 106 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [62] Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part [63] Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/23/2018. See attached document for full details. (chd)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2018 re [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by Jason Wick, Mark Addy, Ron Rosenau, Paulina Riveros, Leslie R Stanford, Daniel J. Waldron, Ryan Baker, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, Disney De La Concepcion, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Dennis Dowdell, Carol Rosenau, Michael Katz, Christopher Reese, Mark Matika, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Jorge De La Concepcion, Jennifer Micheli, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Fernando Rancel, Gabriel Sandoval, Graeme Edwards, Garrain S. Jones, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Susan Peterson, Cody Morrow, Emma Sandoval, Sandra Gioiosa, Guillermo Rasch, Debbie Katz, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Paymi Romero, Claudia Rasch, Danielle Edwards, Jenny Davis, Enrique Carillo, Jillian Addy, Manuel Costa, John Tartol, Lori Baker, Amy Hendricks, Mark Davis, Amber Wick, Samuel Hendricks, [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Jason Wick, Mark Addy, Ron Rosenau, Paulina Riveros, Leslie R Stanford, Daniel J. Waldron, Ryan Baker, Disney De La Concepcion, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Dennis Dowdell, Carol Rosenau, Christopher Reese, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Jorge De La Concepcion, Jennifer Micheli, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Fernando Rancel, Gabriel Sandoval, Graeme Edwards, Garrain S. Jones, Bradley Harris, Susan Peterson, Sandra Gioiosa, Emma Sandoval, Cody Morrow, Guillermo Rasch, Debbie Katz, Miriam Mejia, Alcides Mejia, Paymi Romero, Claudia Rasch, Danielle Edwards, Jenny Davis, Enrique Carillo, Jillian Addy, Manuel Costa, Lori Baker, John Tartol, Amy Hendricks, Amber Wick, Mark Davis, Samuel Hendricks. Total time in court: 1 hour and 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Todd Alan Levine, Mark T. Drooks, Jason M. Jones, Etan Mark, Lara O'Donnell, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5634 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (im)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Order on Motion to Bring Electronic EquipmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting [104] Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/20/2018. (chd)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018, Terminated: 8/20/2018 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment
                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom at the Hearing Scheduled for August 22, 2018 by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 8/31/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order on All Parties' Joint Request for Leave to Use Computer Equipment at Hearing)(Bohannon, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting [102] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/8/2018. (chd)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018, Terminated: 8/8/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time/Pretrial Deadlines by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Responses due by 8/20/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan) Modified Text on 8/7/2018 (ls).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER Setting Hearing on [62] Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and [63] Defendant's Motion to Change Venue. Motion Hearing will occur on August 22, 2018 at 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Parties should be prepared to discuss both motions and especially prepared to discuss the following issues:1) Whether an agent/principal relationship exists between Herbalife and the Individual Defendants.2) Which, if any, claims are barred by the Bostick Settlement.3) Which, if any, claims are covered by the arbitration provision included in certain Plaintiffs' Distributor Agreements. 4) Which, if any, claims are covered by the forum selection provision included in certain Plaintiffs' Distributor Agreements. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/23/2018. (chd)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring
                                                                                                                                                                            Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 99 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Reply)(Levine, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 98 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Replies due by 5/21/2018. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting [95] Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). The deadline for responding to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Complaint (ECF Nos. 68, 70) is hereby extended until 20 days after Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration is resolved. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/14/2018. (ecz)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerks Notice to Filer re [95] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss re [70] Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS [1] Complaint,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6), [68] MOT. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018, Terminated: 5/14/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [70] Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS [1] Complaint,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6), [68] MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice [1] Complaint,,,, by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Responses due by 5/24/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan) Modified Relief on 5/11/2018 (ls).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STAY AND PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PRETRIAL DEADLINES granting in part and denying in part [65] Motion to Stay( Joinder of Parties due by 6/8/2018.); granting in part and denying in part [65] Motion for Protective Order; granting [92] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/16/2018. (tm)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Responses due by 4/23/2018 (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz. Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party HERBALIFE, LTD(pty:dft). (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting [85] Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration in Excess of Twenty Pages. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/22/2018. (ecz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting [87] Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to file Defendants' Reply in further support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration. Reply due on or before March 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/21/2018. (ecz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines Per DE#88 Replies due by 3/14/2018. (cqs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 2/21/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Replies due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13)(Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018, Terminated: 2/22/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration in Excess of Twenty Pages by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Roxane Romans Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Silvia Ramirez Declaration) (Foster, Zachary) Modified on 1/19/2018 (rms1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Notice of Striking
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Striking [82] Notice (Other),,,, filed by Jason Wick, Mark Addy, Ron Rosenau, Paulina Riveros, Leslie R Stanford, Daniel J. Waldron, Ryan Baker, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, Disney De La Concepcion, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Dennis Dowdell, Carol Rosenau, Michael Katz, Christopher Reese, Mark Matika, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Jorge De La Concepcion, Jennifer Micheli, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Fernando Rancel, Gabriel Sandoval, Graeme Edwards, Garrain S. Jones, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Susan Peterson, Cody Morrow, Emma Sandoval, Sandra Gioiosa, Guillermo Rasch, Debbie Katz, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Paymi Romero, Claudia Rasch, Danielle Edwards, Jenny Davis, Enrique Carillo, Jillian Addy, Manuel Costa, John Tartol, Lori Baker, Amy Hendricks, Mark Davis, Amber Wick, Samuel Hendricks by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STRICKEN NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration Filing Supplemental Declarations in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit) (Foster, Zachary) Modified on 1/19/2018 (rms1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Notice of Striking
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Striking [79] Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, Mark Addy, HERBALIFE, LTD, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC (Defendants' Notice of Striking ECF NO. 79 As a Duplicative Filing) by Mark Addy, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD (Levine, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [65] Defendant's MOTION to Stay re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration , [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) Discovery, Pretrial Disclosures, andDefendant's MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Their Alternative Motions to Transfer Venue and to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Joint Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay) filed by Mark Addy, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. (Levine, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STRICKEN REPLY to Response to Motion re [65] Defendant's MOTION to Stay re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration , [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) Discovery, Pretrial Disclosures, andDefendant's MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Their Alternative Motions to Transfer Venue and to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Joint Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay) filed by Mark Addy, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. (Levine, Todd) Modified on 1/17/2018 (rms1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re [76] Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,. Document Replaced Due to Error; The original document contained a scrivener's error with regard to the style of the case reflected on the Order of Referral to Mediation. The correct document has been attached to this notice. (tm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 77 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *ORDER ON MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/5/2018. (mso)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 76 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: ( Jury Trial set for 9/3/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Calendar Call set for 8/28/2019 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2018., Expert Discovery due by 3/1/2019., Fact Discovery due by 11/2/2018., Joinder of Parties due by 4/9/2018., Final proposed jury instructions and verdict form Deadline 8/23/2019., In Limine Motions due by 7/19/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2018., Daubert and Markman Motions due by 6/7/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/19/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/5/2018. (tm) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Main Document 76 replaced on 1/8/2018) (tm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting [74] Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay and for Protective Order. Reply due on or before January 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/3/2018. (ecz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reset Deadlines Per DE#75. Replies due by 1/15/2018. (cqs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018, Terminated: 1/3/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay and for Protective Order re [65] Defendant's MOTION to Stay re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration , [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) Discovery, Pretrial Disclosures, andDefendant's MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Their Alternative Motions to Transfer Venue and to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 1/16/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reset Deadlines Per DE#73. See Order For additional deadlines. Responses due by 2/12/2018 (cqs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 12/30/2017, Entered: 12/30/2017 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting [71] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Also pending are [68] [70] Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, [62] Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, and [63] Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue tothe Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A).As per the parties' request, Plaintiffs will respond to the pending motions on or before the following dates: [62] Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration - February 12, 2018. [63] Joint Motion to Transfer Venue - February 12, 2018. [68] Individual Defendants' Motions to Dismiss - February 20, 2018. [70] Herbalife's Motion to Dismiss - February 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/29/2017. (ecz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [65] Defendant's MOTION to Stay re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration , [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) Discovery, Pretrial Disclosures, andDefendant's MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Their Alternative Motions to Transfer Venue and to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Replies due by 1/4/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017, Terminated: 12/30/2017 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to file responses to Defendants Motions to Dismiss [D.E. 68 and 70], Defendants Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration [D.E. 62] and Defendants Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Central District Of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) [D.E. 63] by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Responses due by 1/11/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017, Terminated: 9/24/2018 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS [1] Complaint,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. Responses due by 1/5/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order on Herbalife's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Bohannon, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD identifying Other Affiliate Credit Suisse AG, Other Affiliate Nomura Holdings, Inc. for HERBALIFE, LTD (Bohannon, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017, Terminated: 9/24/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice [1] Complaint,,,, by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 1/5/2018 (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick re [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A), [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration Defendants' Second Request to Take Judicial Notice (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Original Class Action Complaint filed 4-8-13 in Bostick v. Herbalife Int'l of America, Inc.) (Bohannon, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick re [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) of Filing Corrected Exhibit 3 to Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S. C. 1404(A) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 3 to Joint Motion to Transfer Venue) (Bohannon, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's MOTION to Stay re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration , [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) Discovery, Pretrial Disclosures, and Other Deadlines and ( Responses due by 12/28/2017), Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Their Alternative Motions to Transfer Venue and to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Joint Motion to Stay Discovery, # (2) Exhibit B to Joint Motion to Stay Discovery, # (3) Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Stay Discovery)(Bohannon, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 9/24/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to file separate motions to dismiss by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 63 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 8/23/2018 motion to change venue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 12/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 to Motion to Transfer Venue, # (2) Exhibit 2 to Motion to Transfer Venue, # (3) Exhibit 3 to Motion to Transfer Venue, # (4) Proposed Order on Motion to Transfer Venue)(Bohannon, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 62 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 8/23/2018 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 12/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick Joint Request to Take Judicial Notice. Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Jillian Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Mark Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Lori Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Ryan Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Kristopher Bickerstaff(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Enrique Carillo(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Manuel Costa(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Jenny Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Mark Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Disney De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Jorge De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Dennis Dowdell(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Danielle Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Graeme Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Sandra Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Thomas P. Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Bradley Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Amy Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Samuel Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Garrain S. Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Debbie Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Michael Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Mark Matika(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Alcides Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Miriam Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Jennifer Micheli(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Cody Morrow(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Susan Peterson(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Fernando Rancel(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Claudia Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Guillermo Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Christopher Reese(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Paulina Riveros(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Paymi Romero(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Carol Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Ron Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Emma Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Gabriel Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Leslie R Stanford(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party John Tartol(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Arquimedes G. Valencia(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Daniel J. Waldron(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Amber Wick(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Jason Wick(pty:dft). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E) (Levine, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin D. Quigley on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward A. Salanga on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian A. Howie on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S. Catlett on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Douglas Knox on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia. Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Arquimedes G. Valencia(pty:dft). (Knox, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Scott Foster on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia. Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Arquimedes G. Valencia(pty:dft). (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Attachment B, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Joint Scheduling Order)(Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice to Filer re [52] Notice (Other),,, [51] Notice (Other),,, [49] Notice (Other),,,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (rms1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick of Appearance of Kevin D. Quigley (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick of Appearance of Michael S. Catlett (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick of Appearance of Brian A. Howie (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick of Appearance of Edward A. Salanga (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting [44] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kevin D. Quiqley; granting [45] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael S. Catlett; granting [46] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Brian A. Howie; and granting [47] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Edward A. Salanga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/15/2017. (jdo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017, Terminated: 11/15/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Edward A. Salanga. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10189042 by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 11/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017, Terminated: 11/15/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian A. Howie. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10189039 by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 11/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017, Terminated: 11/15/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael S. Catlett. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10189038 by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 11/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017, Terminated: 11/15/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kevin D. Quiqley. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10189034 by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 11/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Douglas Knox on behalf of Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Jillian Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Mark Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Lori Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Ryan Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Kristopher Bickerstaff(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Enrique Carillo(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Manuel Costa(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Jenny Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Mark Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Disney De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Jorge De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Dennis Dowdell(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Danielle Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Graeme Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Sandra Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Thomas P. Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Bradley Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Amy Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Samuel Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Garrain S. Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Debbie Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Michael Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Mark Matika(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Alcides Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Miriam Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Jennifer Micheli(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Cody Morrow(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Susan Peterson(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Fernando Rancel(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Claudia Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Guillermo Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Christopher Reese(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Paulina Riveros(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Paymi Romero(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Carol Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Ron Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Emma Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Gabriel Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Leslie R Stanford(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party John Tartol(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Daniel J. Waldron(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Amber Wick(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Jason Wick(pty:dft). (Knox, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Scott Foster on behalf of Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Jillian Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Mark Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Lori Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Ryan Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Kristopher Bickerstaff(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Enrique Carillo(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Manuel Costa(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Jenny Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Mark Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Disney De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Jorge De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Dennis Dowdell(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Danielle Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Graeme Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Sandra Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Thomas P. Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Bradley Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Amy Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Samuel Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Garrain S. Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Debbie Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Michael Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Mark Matika(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Alcides Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Miriam Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Jennifer Micheli(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Cody Morrow(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Susan Peterson(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Fernando Rancel(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Claudia Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Guillermo Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Christopher Reese(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Paulina Riveros(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Paymi Romero(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Carol Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Ron Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Emma Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Gabriel Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Leslie R Stanford(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party John Tartol(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Daniel J. Waldron(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Amber Wick(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Jason Wick(pty:dft). (Foster, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: All Defendants as per DE [41]. (lk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting [30] Joint Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint. Responses due on or before December 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/2/2017. (ecz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting [38] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and permitting Jason Jones to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiffs, JEFF RODGERS, PATRICIA RODGERS, MICHAEL LAVIGNE, JENNIFER LAVIGNE, CODY PYLE, JENNIFER RIBALTA, IZAAR VALDEZ, FELIX VALDEZ, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, for all purposes relating to this case and directing the Clerk to provide notice of electronic filings to Jason Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/25/2017. (jf00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting [36] and [37] Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice and permitting Paul S. Chan and Gopi K. Panchapakesan to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendants, HERBALIFE, LTD., HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC., and HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC., for all purposes in this case and directing the Clerk to provide notice of electronic filings to Paul S. Chan and Gopi K. Panchapakesan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/25/2017. (jf00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017, Terminated: 10/25/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jason Jones. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10138810 by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Responses due by 11/8/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017, Terminated: 10/25/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gopi K. Panchapakesan. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10137661 by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. Responses due by 11/8/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017, Terminated: 10/25/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul S. Chan. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10137596 by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. Attorney Steve I. Silverman added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Steve I. Silverman added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Steve I. Silverman added to party HERBALIFE, LTD(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/8/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting [34] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mark T. Drooks may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Defendants, HERBALIFE, LTD., HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC., and HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Mark T. Drooks at mdrooks@birdmarella.com and Lisa Lambrix at llambrix@birdmarella.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/24/2017. (jf00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017, Terminated: 10/24/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark T. Drooks. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10134876 by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party HERBALIFE, LTD(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/7/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/OtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Court Practice re Joint Motions Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/23/2017. (tm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/23/2017. (tm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/23/2017. (tm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017, Terminated: 11/2/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [1] Complaint,,,, by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. Attorney Erin E Bohannon added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Erin E Bohannon added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Erin E Bohannon added to party HERBALIFE, LTD(pty:dft). (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bohannon, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Carol Rosenau served on 9/27/2017, answer due 10/18/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Ron Rosenau served on 9/27/2017, answer due 10/18/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Guillermo Rasch served on 10/2/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Claudia Rasch served on 10/2/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Miriam Mejia served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Alcides Mejia served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Jenny Davis served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Mark Davis served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Sandra Gioiosa served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Thomas P. Gioiosa served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Daniel J. Waldron served on 10/5/2017, answer due 10/26/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Leslie R Stanford served on 9/27/2017, answer due 10/18/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Michael Katz served on 9/26/2017, answer due 10/17/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Debbie Katz served on 9/26/2017, answer due 10/17/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Emma Sandoval served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Gabriel Sandoval served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Garrain S. Jones served on 10/2/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Mark Matika served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Jillian Addy served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Mark Addy served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Samuel Hendricks served on 10/4/2017, answer due 10/25/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Amy Hendricks served on 10/5/2017, answer due 10/26/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Disney De La Concepcion served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Jorge De La Concepcion served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Amended Notice of Filing Summons by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez (Attachments: # (1) Summon(s)) (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez (Attachments: # (1) Summon(s), # (2) Summon(s), # (3) Summon(s), # (4) Summon(s), # (5) Summon(s), # (6) Summon(s), # (7) Summon(s), # (8) Summon(s), # (9) Summon(s), # (10) Summon(s), # (11) Summon(s), # (12) Summon(s), # (13) Summon(s), # (14) Summon(s), # (15) Summon(s), # (16) Summon(s), # (17) Summon(s), # (18) Summon(s), # (19) Summon(s), # (20) Summon(s), # (21) Summon(s), # (22) Summon(s), # (23) Summon(s), # (24) Summon(s), # (25) Summon(s), # (26) Summon(s), # (27) Summon(s), # (28) Summon(s), # (29) Summon(s), # (30) Summon(s), # (31) Summon(s), # (32) Summon(s), # (33) Summon(s), # (34) Summon(s), # (35) Summon(s), # (36) Summon(s), # (37) Summon(s), # (38) Summon(s), # (39) Summon(s), # (40) Summon(s), # (41) Summon(s), # (42) Summon(s), # (43) Summon(s), # (44) Summon(s), # (45) Summon(s), # (46) Summon(s), # (47) Summon(s), # (48) Summon(s)) (Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Clerk's Notice of Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rms1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10037428, filed by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Civil Cover Sheet)(Mark, Etan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 818 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?